Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNATIONAL SECURITY ARCHIVE v. DEFENSE INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv00529
Date Filed2019-02-28
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Trevor N. McFadden
PlaintiffNATIONAL SECURITY ARCHIVE
Case DescriptionThe National Security Archive submitted a FOIA request to the Defense Intelligence Agency for records pertaining to Lieutenant General Leonard Perroot's 1989 records on the 1983 Soviet War Scare. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told NSA that its request fell into the unusual circumstances category and would take time to process. The agency later told NSA that its request had been placed on the complex track, and further, that told NSA that DIA had 1,167 open FOIA requests and that the NSA's request was 1,133 within that queue. After hearing nothing further from the agency, NSA filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEFENSE INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-02-281COMPLAINT against DEFENSE INTELLIGENCE AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5971625) filed by NATIONAL SECURITY ARCHIVE. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil cover sheet, # 2 Summons Summonses, # 3 Exhibit All exhibits)(Guttmann, John) (Attachment 1 replaced on 2/28/2019) (zef, ). (Entered: 02/28/2019)
2019-02-28Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zef, ) (Entered: 02/28/2019)
2019-02-282SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to DEFENSE INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) Modified on 03/06/2019 to correct issuance of summons. (Entered: 02/28/2019)
2019-02-283STANDING ORDER establishing procedures for cases before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are directed to read and strictly comply with the directives in the attached order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 2/28/2019. (lctnm3) (Entered: 02/28/2019)
2019-03-06NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 2 Summons Issued Electronically, there were three summons filed and then re-docketed electronically issued to the DEFENSE INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, US ATTORNEY, and US ATTORNEY GENERAL (zef, ). (zef, ) (Entered: 03/06/2019)
2019-03-064SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEFENSE INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 03/06/2019)
2019-04-175ENTERED IN ERROR.....CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by NATIONAL SECURITY ARCHIVE . (Jacobs, Hilary) Modified on 4/18/2019 (ztth). (Entered: 04/17/2019)
2019-04-176ENTERED IN ERROR.....CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by NATIONAL SECURITY ARCHIVE . (Jacobs, Hilary) Modified on 4/18/2019 (ztth). (Entered: 04/17/2019)
2019-04-177ENTERED IN ERROR.....CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by NATIONAL SECURITY ARCHIVE . (Jacobs, Hilary) Modified on 4/18/2019 (ztth). (Entered: 04/17/2019)
2019-04-178NOTICE of Appearance by NATIONAL SECURITY ARCHIVE (Jacobs, Hilary); Modified event and text on 4/19/2019 (tth). (Entered: 04/17/2019)
2019-04-18NOTICE OF ERROR re 5 Certificate of Service; emailed to HJacobs@bdlaw.com, cc'd 1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Incorrect event used, 2. Please refile document, 3. The correct event is under the Service of Process category. (ztth, ) (Entered: 04/18/2019)
2019-04-18NOTICE OF ERROR re 6 Certificate of Service; emailed to HJacobs@bdlaw.com, cc'd 1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Incorrect event used, 2. Please refile document, 3. The correct event is under the Service of Process category. (ztth, ) (Entered: 04/18/2019)
2019-04-18NOTICE OF ERROR re 7 Certificate of Service; emailed to HJacobs@bdlaw.com, cc'd 1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Incorrect event used, 2. Please refile document, 3. The correct event is under the Service of Process category. (ztth, ) (Entered: 04/18/2019)
2019-04-189RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/10/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/10/2019. (Jacobs, Hilary) (Entered: 04/18/2019)
2019-04-1810RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEFENSE INTELLIGENCE AGENCY served on 4/15/2019 (Jacobs, Hilary) (Entered: 04/18/2019)
2019-04-1811RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 4/15/2019. (Jacobs, Hilary) (Entered: 04/18/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar