Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv00575
Date Filed2019-03-01
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Commerce for records concerning Secretary Wilbur Ross' conflict of interests and ethics agreements. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests and for one request asked for clarification, which was provided by AO. After hearing nothing further from the agency pertaining to any of its requests, AO filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-03-011COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5975820) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons)(McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 03/01/2019)
2019-03-012LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 03/01/2019)
2019-03-01Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zef, ) (Entered: 03/01/2019)
2019-03-013SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 03/01/2019)
2019-03-114RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/4/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/3/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3/8/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE served on 3/7/2019 (McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 03/11/2019)
2019-04-035NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Todd Cohen on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 04/03/2019)
2019-04-036ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE.(Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 04/03/2019)
2019-04-09MINUTE ORDER requiring the parties to MEET AND CONFER and file a joint status report proposing a schedule for further proceedings. The status report should address the status of the plaintiff's FOIA request, including the anticipated number of documents responsive to the request and the anticipated date(s) for release of the requested documents. The parties shall file the joint status report on or before May 3, 2019. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on April 9, 2019. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 04/09/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar