Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleALLIED PROGRESS v. CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv00582
Date Filed2019-03-04
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffALLIED PROGRESS
Case DescriptionAllied Progress, a consumer watchdog organization, submitted five FOIA requests to the Consumer Financial Protection Bureau for records concerning communications received or sent by Eric Blankenstein, John Czwartacki, or Mick Mulvaney and including a number of keywords. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests and asked Allied Progress to clarify some of its requests. Allied Progress did so. CFPB disclosed some records, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Allied Progress filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantCONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-03-041COMPLAINT against CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5977835) filed by ALLIED PROGRESS. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(France, Elizabeth) Modified on 3/4/2019 (zef, ). (Entered: 03/04/2019)
2019-03-042LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ALLIED PROGRESS (France, Elizabeth) (Entered: 03/04/2019)
2019-03-04Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zef, ) (Entered: 03/04/2019)
2019-03-043SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 03/04/2019)
2019-03-064MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Katherine M. Anthony, :Firm- American Oversight, :Address- 1030 15th St. NW, B255, Washington, DC 20005. Phone No. - (202) 897-3918. Fax No. - (202) 871-6523 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5986061. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ALLIED PROGRESS (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(France, Elizabeth) (Entered: 03/06/2019)
2019-03-07MINUTE ORDER granting the plaintiff's 4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that Katherine M. Anthony may enter an appearance pro hac vice for the purpose of representing the plaintiff in this action. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on March 7, 2019. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 03/07/2019)
2019-03-075NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Marie Anthony on behalf of ALLIED PROGRESS (Anthony, Katherine) (Entered: 03/07/2019)
2019-03-186RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/4/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/3/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3/8/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU served on 3/7/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Clay M. Goode)(Anthony, Katherine) (Entered: 03/18/2019)
2019-04-037ANSWER to Complaint by CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU.(Clark, Denise) (Entered: 04/03/2019)
2019-04-03MINUTE ORDER requiring the parties to MEET AND CONFER and file a joint status report proposing a schedule for further proceedings. The parties shall file the joint status report on or before April 24, 2019. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on April 3, 2019. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 04/03/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar