Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleGerrodette v. United States Department of the Interior et al
DistrictDistrict of Arizona
CityTucson Division
Case Number4:2019cv00113
Date Filed2019-03-05
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rosemary Marquez
PlaintiffPatricia Gerrodette
Case DescriptionPatricia Gerrodette, an advocate for the San Pedro River, submitted a FOIA request to the Department of the Interior for records concerning settlement discussions for federal reserved water rights asserted for the Conservation Area in the Gila River Adjudication. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The Office of the Secretary and the Field Solicitor both responded that they had no records. The Bureau of Land Management did not respond. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Gerrodette filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of the Interior
DefendantUnited States Bureau of Land Management
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-03-051COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16603363 filed by Patricia Gerrodette. (Hardee, Alex) (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Corporate Disclosure)(ARC) (Entered: 03/06/2019)
2019-03-052SUMMONS Submitted by Patricia Gerrodette. (Hardee, Alex) (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(ARC) (Entered: 03/06/2019)
2019-03-053Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16603363. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Rosemary Marquez. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-113-TUC-RM. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (ARC) (Entered: 03/06/2019)
2019-03-064Summons Issued as to United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Department of the Interior. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(ARC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 03/06/2019)
2019-03-065SCHEDULING ORDER (FOIA): IT IS ORDERED that defendant shall serve an answer or otherwise plead within 30 days after service, unless the Court otherwise directs for good cause shown. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the deadline for filing dispositive motions is 6 months from the date the case is filed. Failure to file such a motion shall result in dismissal for lack of prosecution. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall serve Defendant with a copy of this Order. Signed by Judge Rosemary Marquez on 3/6/19.(BAC) (Entered: 03/06/2019)
2019-03-06Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Alex Hardee and Heidi McIntosh on behalf of plaintiff. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) (Entered: 03/06/2019)
2019-04-026SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Patricia Gerrodette: Proof of Service re: Complaint and Supplemental Documents upon All Defendants on 3/6/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Hardee, Alex) (Entered: 04/02/2019)
2019-04-127ANSWER to 1 Complaint by United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Department of the Interior.(Hernandez, J) (Entered: 04/12/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar