Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv00618
Date Filed2019-03-05
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Reggie B. Walton
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted four FOIA requests to the Department of Defense for records concerning then Deputy Secretary Patrick Shanahan's compliance with ethical requirements, communications with Boeing, his former employer, and calendar entries. After it became likely that Shanahan would be nominated to replace former Secretary James Mattis, AO also requested expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests. The agency provided records in response to AO's request for calendar entries, but then told AO that its search had not been complete and would continue. After hearing nothing further from the agency pertaining to any of the requests, AO filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-03-051COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5983391) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 03/05/2019)
2019-03-052LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 03/05/2019)
2019-03-06Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (zef, ) (Entered: 03/06/2019)
2019-03-063SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 03/06/2019)
2019-03-124RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/6/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/5/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3/11/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE served on 3/11/2019 (McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 03/12/2019)
2019-04-055NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Charles Abbuhl on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE (Abbuhl, Joshua) (Entered: 04/05/2019)
2019-04-056MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Abbuhl, Joshua) (Entered: 04/05/2019)
2019-04-107NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Robert Healy on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE (Healy, Christopher) (Entered: 04/10/2019)
2019-04-108NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. Attorney Joshua Charles Abbuhl terminated. (Abbuhl, Joshua) (Entered: 04/10/2019)
2019-04-199ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE.(Healy, Christopher) (Entered: 04/19/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar