Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleInternational Refugee Assistance Project v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2019cv02042
Date Filed2019-03-05
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Edgardo Ramos
PlaintiffInternational Refugee Assistance Project
Case DescriptionThe International Refugee Assistance Project submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services for records concerning the agency's policies on the adjudication of humanitarian parole applications. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency subsequently told IRAP that its request was being transferred to another component of the Department of Homeland Security for response. After hearing nothing further from the agency, IRAP filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of Homeland Security
DefendantUnited States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-03-051COMPLAINT against United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16446184)Document filed by International Refugee Assistance Project.(Ramos-Mrosovsky, Carlos) (Entered: 03/05/2019)
2019-03-052DECLARATION of Betsy Fisher in Support re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by International Refugee Assistance Project. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Ramos-Mrosovsky, Carlos) (Entered: 03/05/2019)
2019-03-053CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Ramos-Mrosovsky, Carlos) (Entered: 03/05/2019)
2019-03-054FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Department of Homeland Security, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by International Refugee Assistance Project. (Ramos-Mrosovsky, Carlos) Modified on 3/6/2019 (sj). (Entered: 03/05/2019)
2019-03-055FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Citizenship & Immigration Services, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by International Refugee Assistance Project. (Ramos-Mrosovsky, Carlos) Modified on 3/6/2019 (sj). (Entered: 03/05/2019)
2019-03-056RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by International Refugee Assistance Project.(Ramos-Mrosovsky, Carlos) (Entered: 03/05/2019)
2019-03-067NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian David Burton on behalf of International Refugee Assistance Project. (Burton, Brian) (Entered: 03/06/2019)
2019-03-06***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Carlos Ramos-Mrosovsky to RE-FILE Document No. 5 Request for Issuance of Summons, 4 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; Caption error; caption must correspond with pleading, if all names do not fit, list leading defendant followed by "et al". Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj) (Entered: 03/06/2019)
2019-03-06CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php . (sj) (Entered: 03/06/2019)
2019-03-06Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php . (sj) (Entered: 03/06/2019)
2019-03-06Case Designated ECF. (sj) (Entered: 03/06/2019)
2019-03-068REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Department of Homeland Security, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by International Refugee Assistance Project. (Ramos-Mrosovsky, Carlos) (Entered: 03/06/2019)
2019-03-069REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by International Refugee Assistance Project. (Ramos-Mrosovsky, Carlos) (Entered: 03/06/2019)
2019-03-0610NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alexander Athan Yanos on behalf of International Refugee Assistance Project. (Yanos, Alexander) (Entered: 03/06/2019)
2019-03-0711ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of Homeland Security. (dnh) (Entered: 03/07/2019)
2019-03-0712ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (dnh) (Entered: 03/07/2019)
2019-03-2013SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. United States Department of Homeland Security served on 3/15/2019, answer due 4/5/2019. Service was accepted by Ms. Clark, Clerk. Document filed by International Refugee Assistance Project. (Ramos-Mrosovsky, Carlos) (Entered: 03/20/2019)
2019-03-2014SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019. Service was accepted by Haojun Li, Civil Clerk. Document filed by International Refugee Assistance Project. (Ramos-Mrosovsky, Carlos) (Entered: 03/20/2019)
2019-04-0515CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Dominika Tarczynska dated April 5, 2019. Document filed by United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security.(Tarczynska, Dominika) (Entered: 04/05/2019)
2019-04-0816ORDER granting 15 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 1 Complaint. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services answer due 5/8/2019; United States Department of Homeland Security answer due 5/8/2019. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (jar) (Entered: 04/08/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar