Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleDEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv00633
Date Filed2019-03-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffDEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION
Case DescriptionDemocracy Forward Foundation submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning Katherine Gorka, who worked at the agency as an adviser and played a role in terminating the agency's domestic terrorism investigation unit. DFF also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and conditionally granted DFF's request for a fee waiver. However, after hearing nothing further from the agency, DFF filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-03-071COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5986773) filed by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Exhibit)(Dubner, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/07/2019)
2019-03-07Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zef, ) (Entered: 03/07/2019)
2019-03-072SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 03/07/2019)
2019-03-073LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION (Dubner, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/07/2019)
2019-03-114RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/11/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/10/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3/11/19., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 3/8/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Dubner, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/11/2019)
2019-04-105NOTICE of Appearance by Brian J. Field on behalf of All Defendants (Field, Brian) (Entered: 04/10/2019)
2019-04-106ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY.(Field, Brian) (Entered: 04/10/2019)
2019-04-117ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of Local Civil Rule 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure appear to be inapplicable. Defendant shall file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule for the completion of its production of documents to plaintiff, on or before May 9, 2019. See Order for complete details. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 4/11/2019. (lcabj2) (Entered: 04/11/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar