Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSUNLIGHT FOUNDATION et al v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv00659
Date Filed2019-03-08
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Emmet G. Sullivan
PlaintiffSUNLIGHT FOUNDATION
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionThe Sunlight Foundation and American Oversight submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Health and Human Services for records concerning communications to or from the law firm Hager Sharp. The Sunlight Foundation and American Oversight also submitted two FOIA requests to the agency for records concerning communications sent to or received by officials of the Office of Women's Health, listing names and keywords. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the Sunlight Foundation and American Oversight filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-03-081COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5990284) filed by THE SUNLIGHT FOUNDATION, AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet, # 7 Summons, # 8 Summons, # 9 Summons)(Creighton, Sara) (Entered: 03/08/2019)
2019-03-082LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by THE SUNLIGHT FOUNDATION (Creighton, Sara) (Entered: 03/08/2019)
2019-03-083LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Creighton, Sara) (Entered: 03/08/2019)
2019-03-08Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (zef, ) (Entered: 03/08/2019)
2019-03-084SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 03/08/2019)
2019-03-145STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 03/14/19. (Attachment: # Exhibit 1) (mac) (Entered: 03/14/2019)
2019-03-156RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/8/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/7/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 03/12/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 3/11/2019 (Creighton, Sara) (Entered: 03/15/2019)
2019-03-197NOTICE of Appearance by Rhonda Lisa Campbell on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 03/19/2019)
2019-04-088ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.(Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 04/08/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar