Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleHUSCH BLACKWELL LLP v. UNITED STATES SMALL BUSINESS ADMINISTRATION et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv00663
Date Filed2019-03-08
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
PlaintiffHUSCH BLACKWELL LLP
Case DescriptionThe law firm of Husch Blackwell submitted FOIA requests to the U.S. Small Business Administration and the Defense Logistics Agency for records concerning the waiver of the non-manufacturer rule. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests. The SBA responded to only two of the law firm's requests, while the DLA responded to none of the requests. After hearing nothing further from the agencies, the law firm filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES SMALL BUSINESS ADMINISTRATION
DefendantUNITED STATES DEFENSE LOGISTICS AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
Complaint attachment 16
Complaint attachment 17
Complaint attachment 18
Complaint attachment 19
Complaint attachment 20
Complaint attachment 21
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-03-081COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5991157) filed by HUSCH BLACKWELL LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Civil Cover Sheet, # 16 Summons Office of US Attorney, # 17 Summons General Counsel, DLA, # 18 Summons US Attorney General, DOJ, # 19 Summons Office of US Attorney, # 20 Summons General Counsel, SBA, # 21 Summons US Attorney General, DOJ)(Waagner, Brian) (Attachment 15 replaced on 3/11/2019) (zef, ). (Entered: 03/08/2019)
2019-03-11Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zef, ) (Entered: 03/11/2019)
2019-03-112SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEFENSE LOGISTICS AGENCY, UNITED STATES SMALL BUSINESS ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 03/11/2019)
2019-03-143REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE U.S. Defense Logistics Agency re 1 Complaint,, filed by HUSCH BLACKWELL LLP. Related document: 1 Complaint,, filed by HUSCH BLACKWELL LLP.(Waagner, Brian) (Entered: 03/14/2019)
2019-03-144REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE U. S. Small Business Administration re 1 Complaint,, filed by HUSCH BLACKWELL LLP. Related document: 1 Complaint,, filed by HUSCH BLACKWELL LLP.(Waagner, Brian) (Entered: 03/14/2019)
2019-03-145SUMMONS (2) Re-Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEFENSE LOGISTICS AGENCY, UNITED STATES SMALL BUSINESS ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(ztd) Modified text on 3/19/2019 (znmw). (Entered: 03/14/2019)
2019-03-206ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 03/20/2019. (DM) (Entered: 03/20/2019)
2019-03-277RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/15/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/14/2019. (Waagner, Brian) (Entered: 03/27/2019)
2019-03-278RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 03/13/2019. (Waagner, Brian) (Entered: 03/27/2019)
2019-03-279RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES SMALL BUSINESS ADMINISTRATION served on 3/13/2019 (Waagner, Brian) (Entered: 03/27/2019)
2019-03-2710RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEFENSE LOGISTICS AGENCY served on 3/15/2019 (Waagner, Brian) (Entered: 03/27/2019)
2019-04-1511ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEFENSE LOGISTICS AGENCY, UNITED STATES SMALL BUSINESS ADMINISTRATION.(Hair, Christopher) (Entered: 04/15/2019)
2019-04-1512NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Charles Hair on behalf of UNITED STATES DEFENSE LOGISTICS AGENCY, UNITED STATES SMALL BUSINESS ADMINISTRATION (Hair, Christopher) (Entered: 04/15/2019)
2019-04-1513ORDER. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 4/15/2019. (lcckk3) (Entered: 04/15/2019)
2019-04-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 5/10/2019. (dot) (Entered: 04/16/2019)
2019-04-2214MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Tierra Jones, :Firm- Husch Blackwell LLP, :Address- 750 17th Street NW, Suite 900, Washington, DC 20006. Phone No. - (202) 378-2392. Fax No. - (202) 378-2319 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6074684. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by HUSCH BLACKWELL LLP (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Tierra Jones in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Waagner, Brian) (Entered: 04/22/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar