Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCITIZENS UNITED v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv00671
Date Filed2019-03-11
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Beryl A. Howell
PlaintiffCITIZENS UNITED
Case DescriptionCitizens United submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for emails from a variety of former State Department officials to various named individuals. Citizens United also requested expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and denied Citizens United's request for expedited processing. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Citizens United filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-03-111COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5992572) filed by CITIZENS UNITED. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Summons to the Attorney General, # 6 Summons to the State Dept, # 7 Summons to the US Attorney)(Morgan, Jeremiah) (Entered: 03/11/2019)
2019-03-112LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CITIZENS UNITED (Morgan, Jeremiah) (Entered: 03/11/2019)
2019-03-11Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zef, ) (Entered: 03/11/2019)
2019-03-113SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 03/11/2019)
2019-03-114STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on March 11, 2019. (lcbah1) (Entered: 03/11/2019)
2019-04-195NOTICE of Appearance by Marsha Wellknown Yee on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 04/19/2019)
2019-04-246ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 04/24/2019)
2019-05-087Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 05/08/2019)
2019-05-08MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING the parties, upon consideration of the 7 Joint Status Report, to file, by June 12, 2019, a joint status report regarding the defendant's response to the plaintiff's FOIA request. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on May 8, 2019. (lcbah1) (Entered: 05/08/2019)
2019-05-08Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/12/2019. (tg) (Entered: 05/08/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar