Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAguirre v. United States Nuclear Regulatory Commission et al
DistrictSouthern District of California
CitySan Diego
Case Number3:2019cv00495
Date Filed2019-03-14
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Cynthia Bashant
PlaintiffMichael J. Aguirre
Case DescriptionMichael Aguirre submitted FOIA requests to the Nuclear Regulatory Commission for records concerning the storage of nuclear waste at a beach near San Diego. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Aguirre filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Nuclear Regulatory Commission
DefendantDOES 1 to 10 inclusive
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-03-141COMPLAINT against DOES 1 to 10, United States Nuclear Regulatory Commission ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12302023), filed by Michael J. Aguirre. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) The new case number is 3:19-cv-00495-BAS-BLM. Judge Cynthia Bashant and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major are assigned to the case. (Severson, Maria)(cdw) (jao). (Entered: 03/15/2019)
2019-03-152Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (cdw) (jao). (Entered: 03/15/2019)
2019-04-023SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael J. Aguirre. United States Nuclear Regulatory Commission served. (Severson, Maria). (jah). (Entered: 04/02/2019)
2019-04-154NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Michael J. Aguirre of case(s) 19cv0587-H-KSC. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Severson, Maria). Modified on 4/16/2019 - Proposed Low Number Transfer Order prepared and forwarded (jah). (Entered: 04/15/2019)
2019-05-175MOTION for Status Conference by Michael J. Aguirre. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Maria Severson, # 2 Proof of Service by mail)(Severson, Maria). Modified on 5/20/2019 - Edited text (jah). (Entered: 05/17/2019)
2019-05-216ORDER Requesting Response re 5 MOTION for Status Conference filed by Michael J. Aguirre. Court is not inclined to hold a status conference for this issues but it is unclear to Court why the US Attorney does not deem the United States Nuclear Regulatory Commission (NRC) to be a United States Government Agency. Court orders the US Attorney to respond to Plaintiff's Motion by 5/31/2019. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 5/21/2019. (jah). Modified on 5/21/2019 - Corrected text. Regenerated NEF (jah). (Entered: 05/21/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar