Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2019-03-15 | 1 | COMPLAINT against L. FRANCIS CISSNA ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6003862) filed by CATHERINE HITCH. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons for Defendant Agency, # 3 Summons for US Attorney DC, # 4 Summons US Attorney General)(Estes, Matthew) (Entered: 03/15/2019) |
2019-03-18 | | Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zef, ) (Entered: 03/18/2019) |
2019-03-18 | 2 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to L. FRANCIS CISSNA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 03/18/2019) |
2019-04-04 | 3 | STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on April 4, 2019. (lcbah2) (Entered: 04/04/2019) |
2019-05-08 | 4 | NOTICE of Appearance by Marina Utgoff Braswell on behalf of L. FRANCIS CISSNA (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 05/08/2019) |
2019-05-08 | 5 | ANSWER to Complaint by L. FRANCIS CISSNA.(Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 05/08/2019) |
2019-05-22 | 6 | Joint STATUS REPORT by L. FRANCIS CISSNA. (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 05/22/2019) |
2019-05-23 | | MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 6 Joint Status Report, the parties to file, by June 28, 2019, a joint status report advising the Court whether any disputes remain between the parties and if so, a proposed schedule to govern further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on May 23, 2019. (lcbah2) (Entered: 05/23/2019) |
2019-05-23 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/28/2019. (tg) (Entered: 05/23/2019) |
2019-06-28 | 7 | Joint STATUS REPORT by L. FRANCIS CISSNA. (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 06/28/2019) |
2019-07-01 | | MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 7 Joint Status Report, the parties to file, by August 20, 2019, a joint status report advising the Court whether any disputes remain between the parties and if so, a proposed schedule to govern further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on July 1, 2019. (lcbah2) (Entered: 07/01/2019) |
2019-07-01 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/20/2019. (tg) (Entered: 07/01/2019) |
2019-08-20 | 8 | Joint STATUS REPORT by L. FRANCIS CISSNA. (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 08/20/2019) |
2019-08-21 | | MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 8 Joint Status Report, the parties to file, by September 27, 2019, a joint status report advising the Court whether any disputes remain between the parties and, if so, a proposed schedule to govern further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on August 21, 2019. (lcbah2) (Entered: 08/21/2019) |
2019-08-22 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/27/2019. (hmc) (Entered: 08/22/2019) |
2019-09-27 | 9 | Joint STATUS REPORT by CATHERINE HITCH. (Estes, Matthew) (Entered: 09/27/2019) |
2019-09-30 | | MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 9 Joint Status Report, the parties to file, by November 1, 2019, a joint status report advising the Court whether any disputes remain between the parties and if so, a proposed schedule to govern further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on September 30, 2019. (lcbah2) (Entered: 09/30/2019) |
2019-10-01 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/1/2019. (hmc) (Entered: 10/01/2019) |
2019-10-31 | 10 | Joint STATUS REPORT by L. FRANCIS CISSNA. (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 10/31/2019) |
2019-11-01 | | MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 10 Joint Status Report, the parties to file, by December 4, 2019, a joint status report advising the Court whether any disputes remain between the parties and, if so, a proposed schedule to govern further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on November 1, 2019. (lcbah2) (Entered: 11/01/2019) |
2019-11-01 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/4/2019. (tg) (Entered: 11/01/2019) |
2019-12-04 | 11 | Joint STATUS REPORT by L. FRANCIS CISSNA. (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 12/04/2019) |
2019-12-05 | | MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 11 Joint Status Report, the parties to file, by January 14, 2020, a joint status report advising the Court whether any disputes remain between the parties and, if so, a proposed schedule to govern further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on December 5, 2019. (lcbah2) (Entered: 12/05/2019) |
2019-12-05 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/14/2020. (tg) (Entered: 12/05/2019) |
2020-01-14 | 12 | Joint STATUS REPORT by L. FRANCIS CISSNA. (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 01/14/2020) |
2020-01-14 | | MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 12 Joint Status Report, the parties to file, by February 19, 2020, a joint status report advising the Court whether any disputes remain between the parties and, if so, a proposed schedule to govern further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on January 14, 2020. (lcbah2) (Entered: 01/14/2020) |
2020-01-15 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/19/2020. (tg) (Entered: 01/15/2020) |
2020-02-19 | 13 | Joint STATUS REPORT by L. FRANCIS CISSNA. (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 02/19/2020) |
2020-02-20 | | MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 12 Joint Status Report, the parties to file, by March 19, 2020, a joint status report advising the Court whether any disputes remain between the parties and, if so, a proposed schedule to govern further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on February 20, 2020. (lcbah2) (Entered: 02/20/2020) |
2020-02-21 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint status report due by 3/19/2020. (tg) (Entered: 02/21/2020) |
2020-03-18 | 14 | NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Brenda A. Gonzalez on behalf of L. FRANCIS CISSNA Substituting for attorney Marina Utgoff Braswell (Gonzalez, Brenda) (Entered: 03/18/2020) |
2020-03-18 | 15 | Joint STATUS REPORT by L. FRANCIS CISSNA. (Gonzalez, Brenda) (Entered: 03/18/2020) |
2020-03-19 | | MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING the parties to file, by April 2, 2020, a further joint status report advising the Court whether any disputes remain between the parties and, if so, a proposed schedule to govern further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on March 19, 2020. (lcbah2) (Entered: 03/19/2020) |
2020-03-20 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint status report due by 4/2/2020. (tg) (Entered: 03/20/2020) |
2020-04-02 | 16 | Joint STATUS REPORT by L. FRANCIS CISSNA. (Gonzalez, Brenda) (Entered: 04/02/2020) |
2020-04-02 | | MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING the parties to file, by April 30, 2020, a further joint status report advising the Court whether any disputes remain between the parties and, if so, a proposed schedule to govern further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on April 2, 2020. (lcbah2) (Entered: 04/02/2020) |
2020-04-02 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/30/2020. (tg) (Entered: 04/02/2020) |
2020-04-30 | 17 | Joint STATUS REPORT by L. FRANCIS CISSNA. (Gonzalez, Brenda) (Entered: 04/30/2020) |
2020-05-01 | | MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING the parties to file, by July 1, 2020, a further joint status report advising the Court whether any disputes remain between the parties and, if so, a proposed schedule to govern further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on May 1, 2020. (lcbah2) (Entered: 05/01/2020) |
2020-05-04 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/1/2020. (tg) (Entered: 05/04/2020) |
2020-07-01 | 18 | NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Tilghman on behalf of L. FRANCIS CISSNA (Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 07/01/2020) |
2020-07-01 | 19 | Joint STATUS REPORT by L. FRANCIS CISSNA. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 07/01/2020) |
2020-07-01 | | MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING the parties to file, by September 1, 2020, a further joint status report advising the Court whether any disputes remain between the parties and, if so, a proposed schedule to govern further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on July 1, 2020. (lcbah2) (Entered: 07/01/2020) |
2020-07-02 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/1/2020. (ztg) (Entered: 07/02/2020) |
2020-09-01 | 20 | Joint STATUS REPORT by L. FRANCIS CISSNA. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 09/01/2020) |
2020-09-02 | | MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 20 Joint Status Report, that the parties to file, by November 2, 2020, a joint status report indicating whether any issues remain and, if so, a proposed schedule to govern future proceedings in this matter, unless a stipulation of dismissal is filed by then. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on September 1, 2020. (lcbah2) (Entered: 09/02/2020) |
2020-09-02 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/2/2020. (ztg) (Entered: 09/02/2020) |
2020-11-02 | 21 | Joint STATUS REPORT by L. FRANCIS CISSNA. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 11/02/2020) |
2020-11-02 | | MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING the parties to file, upon consideration of the parties' 21 Joint Status Report, a joint status report, by January 5, 2021, indicating whether any issues remain and, if so, a proposed schedule to govern future proceedings in this matter, unless a stipulation of dismissal is filed by then. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on November 2, 2020. (lcbah2) Modified deadline date on 11/3/2020 (ztg). (Entered: 11/02/2020) |
2020-11-03 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/5/2021. (ztg) (Entered: 11/03/2020) |
2020-12-14 | 22 | NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Alan Lescht on behalf of CATHERINE HITCH Substituting for attorney Matthew Estes (Lescht, Alan) (Entered: 12/14/2020) |
2020-12-17 | 23 | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to L. FRANCIS CISSNA. Attorney Brenda A. Gonzalez-Horowitz terminated. (Gonzalez-Horowitz, Brenda) (Entered: 12/17/2020) |
2021-01-04 | 24 | NOTICE of Appearance by J. Barrett Kelly on behalf of CATHERINE HITCH (Kelly, J.) (Entered: 01/04/2021) |
2021-01-05 | 25 | Joint STATUS REPORT by L. FRANCIS CISSNA. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 01/05/2021) |
2021-01-05 | | MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING the parties to file, upon consideration of the parties' 25 Joint Status Report, a joint status report, by March 5, 2021, indicating whether any issues remain and, if so, a proposed schedule to govern future proceedings in this matter, unless a stipulation of dismissal is filed by then. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on January 5, 2021. (lcbah2) (Entered: 01/05/2021) |
2021-01-06 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/5/2021. (ztg) (Entered: 01/06/2021) |
2021-03-04 | 26 | STIPULATION of Dismissal by L. FRANCIS CISSNA. (Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 03/04/2021) |
2021-03-04 | | MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DISMISSING this case, with prejudice, in light of the parties' 26 Stipulation of Dismissal, see Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on March 4, 2021. (lcbah2) (Entered: 03/04/2021) |
Hide Docket Events |