Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv00777
Date Filed2019-03-20
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Kelly
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning communications between agency officials and former Secretary of State John Kerry pertaining to the Iran nuclear deal and any meetings Kerry had with Iranian officials to discuss the deal. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-03-201COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6012042) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons U.S. Department of State)(Peterson, James) (Entered: 03/20/2019)
2019-03-202LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Peterson, James) (Entered: 03/20/2019)
2019-03-21Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zef, ) (Entered: 03/21/2019)
2019-03-213SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 03/21/2019)
2019-03-274RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/26/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/25/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3/26/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 3/26/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Peterson, James) (Entered: 03/27/2019)
2019-04-255ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 04/25/2019)
2019-04-29MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by May 28, 2019. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 4/29/2019. (lctjk2) (Entered: 04/29/2019)
2019-04-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule or Disclosure due by 5/28/2019. (kh) (Entered: 04/29/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar