Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMORLEY v. BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv00797
Date Filed2019-03-21
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
PlaintiffJEFFERSON MORLEY
Case DescriptionReporter Jefferson Morley submitted a FOIA request to the Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System for records. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Morley filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

Defendant2255
BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM
20th C Street, NW
Washington, DC 20551
DefendantBOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-03-211COMPLAINT against BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6015044) filed by JEFFERSON MORLEY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons USADC, # 3 Summons USAG, # 4 Summons Fed)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 03/21/2019)
2019-03-22Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zef, ) (Entered: 03/22/2019)
2019-03-222SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 03/22/2019)
2019-03-283ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 03/27/19. (DM) (Entered: 03/28/2019)
2019-04-044RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 4/1/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit USAG receipt)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 04/04/2019)
2019-04-045RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/29/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/28/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit USADC receipt)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 04/04/2019)
2019-04-296NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Patrick Schaefer on behalf of BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM (Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 04/29/2019)
2019-04-297ANSWER to Complaint by BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM.(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 04/29/2019)
2019-04-298ORDER. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 4/29/2019. (lcckk3) (Entered: 04/29/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar