Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNATIONAL PUBLIC RADIO, INC. et al v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv00893
Date Filed2019-03-28
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffNATIONAL PUBLIC RADIO, INC.
PlaintiffALISON KODJAK
Case DescriptionNational Public Radio reporter Alison Kodjak submitted two FOIA requests to the Department of Health and Human Services for records concerning Roger Severino, Director of the Office of Civil Rights. Kodjak's first FOIA request asked for Severino's daily calendar. Her second FOIA request asked for emails containing keywords such as pro-life. The agency did not acknowledge either request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, NPR and Kodjak filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Failure to respond within statutory time limit

Defendant2255
UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
200 Independence Avenue, SW
Washington, DC 20201
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-03-281COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6028734) filed by NATIONAL PUBLIC RADIO, INC., Alison Kodjak. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Summons U.S. Attorney's Office, # 7 Summons Department of Justice, # 8 Summons Department of Health and Human Services)(Kelley, Matthew) (Entered: 03/28/2019)
2019-03-29Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zef, ) (Entered: 03/29/2019)
2019-03-292SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 03/29/2019)
2019-03-293MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- David J. Bodney, :Firm- Ballard Spahr LLP, :Address- 1 East Washington Street, Suite 2300, Phoenix, AZ 85004. Phone No. - 602-798-5400. Fax No. - 602-798-5595 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6029605. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ALISON KODJAK, NATIONAL PUBLIC RADIO, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David J. Bodney, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kelley, Matthew) (Entered: 03/29/2019)
2019-04-014LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by NATIONAL PUBLIC RADIO, INC. (Kelley, Matthew) (Entered: 04/01/2019)
2019-04-04MINUTE ORDER: Granting 3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. David J. Bodney is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter on behalf of Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 4/4/19. (DJS) (Entered: 04/04/2019)
2019-04-185NOTICE of Appearance by Johnny Hillary Walker, III on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 04/18/2019)
2019-04-186RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/15/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/15/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of mailing)(Kelley, Matthew) (Entered: 04/18/2019)
2019-05-137ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.(Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 05/13/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar