Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSea Shepherd Legal v. National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration et al
DistrictWestern District of Washington
CitySeattle
Case Number2:2019cv00463
Date Filed2019-03-28
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James L. Robart
PlaintiffSea Shepherd Legal
Case DescriptionSea Shepherd Legal submitted a FOIA request to the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration for records concerning the New Zealand Maui Dolphin. Sea Shepherd Legal also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and asked Sea Shepherd Legal to clarify its request. After failing to resolve that issue, Sea Shepherd Legal filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantNational Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration an agency of the United States
DefendantNational Marine Fisheries Service an agency of the United States
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-03-281COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-5707050) Attorney Brett Wade Sommermeyer added to party Sea Shepherd Legal(pty:pla), filed by Sea Shepherd Legal. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Civil Cover Sheet, # 10 Summons, # 11 Summons, # 12 Summons, # 13 Summons)(Sommermeyer, Brett) (Entered: 03/28/2019)
2019-03-282PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re 1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Sea Shepherd Legal (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Sommermeyer, Brett) (Entered: 03/28/2019)
2019-03-283CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Sea Shepherd Legal (Sommermeyer, Brett) (Entered: 03/28/2019)
2019-03-29Attorney Catherine E Pruett for Sea Shepherd Legal added; per 1 Complaint,. (PS) (Entered: 03/29/2019)
2019-03-29Judge James L. Robart added. (SNP) (Entered: 03/29/2019)
2019-03-294Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) National Marine Fisheries Service, National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(SNP) (Entered: 03/29/2019)
2019-04-225NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michelle R. Lambert on behalf of Defendants National Marine Fisheries Service, National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration. (Lambert, Michelle) (Entered: 04/22/2019)
2019-04-226ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge James L. Robart. Joint Status Report due by 5/28/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 5/6/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 5/20/2019. (AD) (Entered: 04/22/2019)
2019-04-297ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by National Marine Fisheries Service, National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration.(Lambert, Michelle) (Entered: 04/29/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar