Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleANIMAL LEGAL DEFENSE FUND v. ANIMAL AND PLANT HEALTH INSPECTION SERVICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv00959
Date Filed2019-04-04
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffANIMAL LEGAL DEFENSE FUND
Case DescriptionThe Animal Legal Defense Fund submitted a FOIA request to the Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service for records concerning the cancellation of the Animal Welfare Act exhibitor license for Zoological De. P.R. at Mayaguez. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency told ADLF that it had searched two offices, one of which did not have any records. ADLF contacted the agency several times to check on its status, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, ADLF filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

Defendant2255
ANIMAL AND PLANT HEALTH INSPECTION SERVICE
4700 River Road
Riverdale, MD 20737
DefendantANIMAL AND PLANT HEALTH INSPECTION SERVICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-04-041COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against ANIMAL AND PLANT HEALTH INSPECTION SERVICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6041288) filed by ANIMAL LEGAL DEFENSE FUND. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Stella, Cristina) (Entered: 04/04/2019)
2019-04-042LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ANIMAL LEGAL DEFENSE FUND (Stella, Cristina) (Entered: 04/04/2019)
2019-04-05Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zsb) (Entered: 04/05/2019)
2019-04-05SUMMONS Not Issued as to ANIMAL AND PLANT HEALTH INSPECTION SERVICE.....INCORRECT SUMMONS FILED AT THE TIME COMPLAINT WAS FILED. (zsb) (Entered: 04/05/2019)
2019-04-083NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel H. Waltz on behalf of ANIMAL LEGAL DEFENSE FUND (Waltz, Daniel) (Entered: 04/08/2019)
2019-04-084REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by ANIMAL LEGAL DEFENSE FUND. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons)(Stella, Cristina) (Entered: 04/08/2019)
2019-04-085SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to ANIMAL AND PLANT HEALTH INSPECTION SERVICE, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorney. (ztd) (Entered: 04/08/2019)
2019-04-116SUMMONS (3) Reissued with court seal Electronically as to ANIMAL AND PLANT HEALTH INSPECTION SERVICE, U.S. ATTORNEY & U.S. ATTORNEY GENERAL (ztd) (Entered: 04/11/2019)
2019-05-097RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/18/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/18/2019. (Stella, Cristina) (Entered: 05/09/2019)
2019-05-098RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 4/17/19. (Stella, Cristina) (Entered: 05/09/2019)
2019-05-209Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Answer or Other Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by ANIMAL AND PLANT HEALTH INSPECTION SERVICE (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 05/20/2019)
2019-05-21MINUTE ORDER: Granting 9 Consent Motion for Extension of Deadlines. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by June 21, 2019. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 5/21/19. (DJS) (Entered: 05/21/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar