Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv00968
Date Filed2019-04-05
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted two FOIA requests to the Department of State for records concerning contacts between the U.S. Mission to the United Nations and the Commission Internacional Contra la Impunidad en Guatemala. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-04-051COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6043884) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons U.S. Department of State)(Lee, Eric) (Entered: 04/05/2019)
2019-04-052LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Lee, Eric) (Entered: 04/05/2019)
2019-04-05Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zef, ) (Entered: 04/05/2019)
2019-04-053SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 04/05/2019)
2019-04-154RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/12/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/12/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 4/12/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 4/12/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Lee, Eric) (Entered: 04/15/2019)
2019-05-025NOTICE of Appearance by Diana Viggiano Valdivia on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Valdivia, Diana) (Entered: 05/02/2019)
2019-05-136ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Valdivia, Diana) (Entered: 05/13/2019)
2019-05-13MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the parties shall confer and submit a joint proposed briefing schedule by May 28, 2019. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 5/13/2019. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 05/13/2019)
2019-05-14Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 5/28/2019 (lsj) (Entered: 05/14/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar