Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleThe American Civil Liberties Union of North California et al v. Federal Bureau of Investigation
DistrictNorthern District of California
CitySan Francisco
Case Number3:2010cv03759
Date Filed2010-08-24
Date Closed2015-12-08
JudgeHon. Richard Seeborg
PlaintiffThe American Civil Liberties Union of North California
PlaintiffAsian Law Caucus
PlaintiffSan Francisco Bay Guardian
DefendantFederal Bureau of Investigation
AppealNinth Circuit 16-15178
Documents
Docket
Opinion/Order [11]
Opinion/Order [26]
Opinion/Order [28]
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Opinion/Order [56]
Opinion/Order [60]
Opinion/Order [67]
Opinion/Order [74]
Opinion/Order [82]
Opinion/Order [84]
Opinion/Order [111]
Opinion/Order [113]
Opinion/Order [116]
Opinion/Order [122]
Opinion/Order [128]
FOIA Project Annotation: A federal court in California has ruled that the FBI has failed to provide a rational nexus to any law enforcement authority pertaining to its surveillance of Muslims and other ethnic groups in Northern California. The ACLU of Northern California, the San Francisco Guardian, and the Asian Law Caucus made requests to the FBI for the records. The agency granted their request for expedited processing, but after no progress had been made in seven months, the organizations filed suit. The agency located over 50,000 pages responsive to the request and withheld nearly 48,000 pages under various exemptions, primarily Exemption 7 (law enforcement records). The plaintiffs agreed to a representative sampling of the withheld documents accompanied by a detailed Vaughn index. The court recognized that the FBI had a law enforcement function. However, the FBI's explanation for withholding records stressed such techniques as "community outreach efforts [that] serve the purpose of establishing working relationships with community partners whose cooperation is essential to law enforcement missions." The court pointed out that "that this may all be true does not, without more, permit the FBI to apply Exemption 7 to withhold or redact information about such tactics. [The agency's affidavits do not] tether the activities the withheld documents concern to the enforcement of any particular law." Finding that the agency could not claim Exemption 7 under these circumstances, the court observed that "the FBI's refrain at oral argument that many of the withheld documents do not relate to particular investigations, and thus cannot be linked to any particular provision of law, only serves to emphasize the point that Exemption 7 is not the appropriate umbrella under which to shield these documents from public view."
Issues: Exemption 7 - Law enforcement records
Opinion/Order [135]
Opinion/Order [137]
Opinion/Order [148]
Opinion/Order [150]
Opinion/Order [152]
Opinion/Order [156]
Opinion/Order [157]
Opinion/Order [158]
Opinion/Order [161]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2010-08-241COMPLAINT /issued summons against Federal Bureau of Investigation ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 34611049716.). Filed byThe American Civil Liberties Union of North California, Asian Law Caucus, San Francisco Bay Guardian. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2010) (Entered: 08/26/2010)
2010-08-242Certificate of Interested Entities by Asian Law Caucus, San Francisco Bay Guardian, The American Civil Liberties Union of North California re 1 Complaint, (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2010) (Entered: 08/26/2010)
2010-08-243ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 11/25/2010. Case Management Conference set for 12/2/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/24/10. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2010) (Entered: 08/26/2010)
2010-08-24CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2010) (Entered: 08/26/2010)
2010-08-264NOTICE of Appearance by Neill Tai Tseng (Tseng, Neill) (Filed on 8/26/2010) (Entered: 08/26/2010)
2010-08-265CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re 4 by Federal Bureau of Investigation (Tseng, Neill) (Filed on 8/26/2010) Modified on 8/27/2010 (ga, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/26/2010)
2010-09-026Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Asian Law Caucus, San Francisco Bay Guardian, The American Civil Liberties Union of North California. (Svilik, Patricia) (Filed on 9/2/2010) (Entered: 09/02/2010)
2010-09-027CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (bjtS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2010) (Entered: 09/02/2010)
2010-09-308NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Tamara Ulrich (Ulrich, Tamara) (Filed on 9/30/2010) (Entered: 09/30/2010)
2010-10-059ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Richard Seeborg for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 10/4/10. (mab, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2010) (Entered: 10/05/2010)
2010-10-0510DISREGARD THIS NOTICE: CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (bjtS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2010) Modified on 10/5/2010 (bjtS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/05/2010)
2010-10-0511ORDER RE: 9 REASSIGNING CASE TO JUDGE SEEBORG. Case Management Conference set for 1/6/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom #3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/5/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2010) (Entered: 10/05/2010)
2010-10-0612CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Asian Law Caucus, San Francisco Bay Guardian, The American Civil Liberties Union of North California re 1 Complaint, (Svilik, Patricia) (Filed on 10/6/2010) (Entered: 10/06/2010)
2010-10-0713ANSWER to Complaint byFederal Bureau of Investigation. (Ulrich, Tamara) (Filed on 10/7/2010) (Entered: 10/07/2010)
2010-10-1414CLERKS NOTICE re: Failure to E-File and/or Failure to Register as an E-Filer re: 1 . (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2010) (Entered: 10/14/2010)
2010-11-0115MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Asian Law Caucus, San Francisco Bay Guardian, The American Civil Liberties Union of North California. Motion Hearing set for 12/9/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(Svilik, Patricia) (Filed on 11/1/2010) (Entered: 11/01/2010)
2010-11-0116Declaration of Julia Harumi Mass in Support of 15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byAsian Law Caucus, San Francisco Bay Guardian, The American Civil Liberties Union of North California. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. A, # 2 Exhibit Ex. B, # 3 Exhibit Ex. C, # 4 Exhibit Ex. D, # 5 Exhibit Ex. E, # 6 Exhibit Ex. F)(Related document(s) 15 ) (Svilik, Patricia) (Filed on 11/1/2010) (Entered: 11/01/2010)
2010-11-0317CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Asian Law Caucus, San Francisco Bay Guardian, The American Civil Liberties Union of North California (Svilik, Patricia) (Filed on 11/3/2010) (Entered: 11/03/2010)
2010-11-1818*** FILED IN ERROR. REFER TO DOCUMENT 19 . *** Memorandum in Opposition re 15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byFederal Bureau of Investigation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Affidavit of David Hardy)(Ulrich, Tamara) (Filed on 11/18/2010) Modified on 11/19/2010 (feriab, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/18/2010)
2010-11-1919Memorandum in Opposition re 15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byFederal Bureau of Investigation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Affidavit of David M. Hardy)(Ulrich, Tamara) (Filed on 11/19/2010) (Entered: 11/19/2010)
2010-11-1920NOTICE by Federal Bureau of Investigation of Corrected Filing (Ulrich, Tamara) (Filed on 11/19/2010) (Entered: 11/19/2010)
2010-11-2421Reply Memorandum re 15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byAsian Law Caucus, San Francisco Bay Guardian, The American Civil Liberties Union of North California. (Hasegawa, Andrea) (Filed on 11/24/2010) (Entered: 11/24/2010)
2010-11-2422Declaration of Julia Harumi Mass in Support of 21 Reply Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byAsian Law Caucus, San Francisco Bay Guardian, The American Civil Liberties Union of North California. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Related document(s) 21 ) (Hasegawa, Andrea) (Filed on 11/24/2010) (Entered: 11/24/2010)
2010-12-0323STIPULATION by Asian Law Caucus, Federal Bureau of Investigation, San Francisco Bay Guardian, The American Civil Liberties Union of North California. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Ulrich, Tamara) (Filed on 12/3/2010) (Entered: 12/03/2010)
2010-12-0924Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 12/9/2010 before Judge Richard Seeborg; Matter Submitted. (Date Filed: 12/9/2010)re 15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by San Francisco Bay Guardian, The American Civil Liberties Union of North California,Asian Law Caucus.(Court Reporter Kathy Wyatt.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/9/2010) (Entered: 12/09/2010)
2010-12-1625STIPULATION re 15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Asian Law Caucus, San Francisco Bay Guardian, The American Civil Liberties Union of North California. (Hasegawa, Andrea) (Filed on 12/16/2010) (Entered: 12/16/2010)
2010-12-1726ORDER RE: 15 DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/17/2010. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2010) (Entered: 12/17/2010)
2010-12-3027STIPULATION CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Asian Law Caucus, San Francisco Bay Guardian, The American Civil Liberties Union of North California. (Hasegawa, Andrea) (Filed on 12/30/2010) (Entered: 12/30/2010)
2011-01-0328STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 1/13/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/3/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2011) (Entered: 01/03/2011)
2011-01-0629STIPULATION to Allow Telephonic Appearance at Initial Case Management Conference by Asian Law Caucus, Federal Bureau of Investigation, San Francisco Bay Guardian, The American Civil Liberties Union of North California. (Ulrich, Tamara) (Filed on 1/6/2011) (Entered: 01/06/2011)
2011-01-0630CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (JOINT) filed by Asian Law Caucus, San Francisco Bay Guardian, The American Civil Liberties Union of North California. (Hasegawa, Andrea) (Filed on 1/6/2011) (Entered: 01/06/2011)
2011-01-0631CLERKS NOTICE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SHALL TAKE PLACE BY TELEPHONE. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2011) (Entered: 01/06/2011)
2011-01-1332Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 1/13/2011 before Judge Richard Seeborg (Date Filed: 1/13/2011). Further Case Management Conference set for 6/23/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Court Reporter Not Reported.)(cl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/13/2011) (Entered: 01/13/2011)
2011-01-1333CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Further Case Management Conference set for 6/23/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/13/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2011) (Entered: 01/13/2011)
2011-02-0434NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Katherine M. Nolan-Stevaux Notice of Substitution of Counsel (Nolan-Stevaux, Katherine) (Filed on 2/4/2011) (Entered: 02/04/2011)
2011-02-0435STATUS REPORT Plaintiffs' Updated Status Report by Asian Law Caucus, San Francisco Bay Guardian, The American Civil Liberties Union of North California. (Nolan-Stevaux, Katherine) (Filed on 2/4/2011) (Entered: 02/04/2011)
2011-02-0436PROPOSED SCHEDULE by Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Ulrich, Tamara) (Filed on 2/4/2011) Modified on 2/7/2011 (slh, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/04/2011)
2011-02-0837RESPONSE to re 36 Status Report Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant's Proposed Schedule for Completing Production in Response to Plaintiffs' FOIA Requests by Asian Law Caucus, San Francisco Bay Guardian, The American Civil Liberties Union of North California. (Nolan-Stevaux, Katherine) (Filed on 2/8/2011) (Entered: 02/08/2011)
2011-02-0938CLERKS NOTICE Status Conference set for 3/3/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2011) (Entered: 02/09/2011)
2011-02-1139AMENDED COMPLAINT Amended Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief; Violation of the Freedom of Information Act against Federal Bureau of Investigation. Filed byThe American Civil Liberties Union of North California, Asian Law Caucus, San Francisco Bay Guardian. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit G)(Nolan-Stevaux, Katherine) (Filed on 2/11/2011) (Entered: 02/11/2011)
2011-02-1140STIPULATION re 39 Amended Complaint,, Joint Stipulation Regarding Amended Complaint by Asian Law Caucus, San Francisco Bay Guardian, The American Civil Liberties Union of North California. (Nolan-Stevaux, Katherine) (Filed on 2/11/2011) (Entered: 02/11/2011)
2011-02-1641Summons Issued as to Federal Bureau of Investigation. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2011) (Entered: 02/16/2011)
2011-02-2242Request for Telephonic Appearance at Status Conference by Federal Bureau of Investigation (Ulrich, Tamara) (Filed on 2/22/2011) Modified on 2/23/2011 (slh, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/22/2011)
2011-02-2243CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Asian Law Caucus, San Francisco Bay Guardian, The American Civil Liberties Union of North California (Nolan-Stevaux, Katherine) (Filed on 2/22/2011) (Entered: 02/22/2011)
2011-02-2244SUMMONS Returned Executed (FOIA) by The American Civil Liberties Union of North California, Asian Law Caucus, San Francisco Bay Guardian. Federal Bureau of Investigation served on 8/24/2010, answer due 9/23/2010. (Nolan-Stevaux, Katherine) (Filed on 2/22/2011) (Entered: 02/22/2011)
2011-02-2245CLERKS NOTICE STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING SHALL BE CONDUCTED BY TELEPHONE.(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2011) (Entered: 02/22/2011)
2011-03-0246ANSWER to Amended Complaint byFederal Bureau of Investigation. (Ulrich, Tamara) (Filed on 3/2/2011) (Entered: 03/02/2011)
2011-03-0347Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 3/3/2011 before Judge Richard Seeborg (Date Filed: 3/3/2011). (Court Reporter Not Reported.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/3/2011) (Entered: 03/03/2011)
2011-03-0448CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Beeler for Settlement. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/3/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2011) Modified on 3/4/2011 (cl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/04/2011)
2011-03-04CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler for Settlement. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2011) (Entered: 03/04/2011)
2011-03-0949NOTICE by Federal Bureau of Investigation of Unavailability (Ulrich, Tamara) (Filed on 3/9/2011) (Entered: 03/09/2011)
2011-03-1150NOTICE AND ORDER REGARDING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Settlement Conference set for 4/4/2011 at 10:00 A.M. before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 3/11/2011. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2011) Modified on 3/14/2011 (ls, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/14/2011)
2011-03-2551MOTION Request to Excuse Attendance at Settlement Conference filed by Asian Law Caucus, San Francisco Bay Guardian, The American Civil Liberties Union of North California. (Nolan-Stevaux, Katherine) (Filed on 3/25/2011) (Entered: 03/25/2011)
2011-03-2552ORDER by Judge Beeler granting 51 Motion (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2011) (Entered: 03/25/2011)
2011-03-3153CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING Settlement Conference to 4/4/2011 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom D, 15th Floor, SAN FRANCISCO, CA before the Honorable Laurel Beeler. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2011) (Entered: 03/31/2011)
2011-04-0454Minute Entry: Settlement Conference held. (Date Filed: 4/4/2011) (ls, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/4/2011) (Entered: 04/05/2011)
2011-04-1355STIPULATION Joint Stipulation Regarding Document Production Schedule by Asian Law Caucus, San Francisco Bay Guardian, The American Civil Liberties Union of North California. (Nolan-Stevaux, Katherine) (Filed on 4/13/2011) (Entered: 04/13/2011)
2011-04-1356JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING DOCUMENT PRODUCTION SCHEDULE. Status Conference set for 6/23/2011 at 10:30 A.M. before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 4/13/2011. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2011) (Entered: 04/15/2011)
2011-04-2657Letter from Katherine Nolan-Stevaux regarding scheduling conflict . (Nolan-Stevaux, Katherine) (Filed on 4/26/2011) (Entered: 04/26/2011)
2011-05-0258*** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD. *** STIPULATION Joint Stipulation Regarding Status Conference by Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Nolan-Stevaux, Katherine) (Filed on 5/2/2011) Modified on 5/2/2011 (feriab, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/02/2011)
2011-05-0259STIPULATION Joint Stipulation Regarding Status Conference by Asian Law Caucus. (Nolan-Stevaux, Katherine) (Filed on 5/2/2011) (Entered: 05/02/2011)
2011-05-0360ORDER GRANTING 59 Stipulation filed by Asian Law Caucus. Signed by Judge Beeler on 5/3/11. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2011) (Entered: 05/03/2011)
2011-05-2661NOTICE by Federal Bureau of Investigation Regarding Production Schedule (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Ulrich, Tamara) (Filed on 5/26/2011) (Entered: 05/26/2011)
2011-06-1562MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Ulrich, Tamara) (Filed on 6/15/2011) (Entered: 06/15/2011)
2011-06-1663CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Joint Case Management Conference Statement filed by Asian Law Caucus, San Francisco Bay Guardian, The American Civil Liberties Union of North California. (Nolan-Stevaux, Katherine) (Filed on 6/16/2011) (Entered: 06/16/2011)
2011-06-1664CLERKS NOTICE CONTINUING STATUS HEARING. Status Conference set for 11/3/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2011) (Entered: 06/16/2011)
2011-06-3065Minute Entry: Telephonic Status Conference held (Date Filed: 6/30/2011). Further Status Conference set for August 25, 2011 at 10:30 a.m.(ls, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/30/2011) (Entered: 06/30/2011)
2011-08-1266STIPULATION JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING STATUS CONFERENCE by Asian Law Caucus, San Francisco Bay Guardian, The American Civil Liberties Union of North California. (Nolan-Stevaux, Katherine) (Filed on 8/12/2011) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
2011-08-1567STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING STATUS CONFERENCE: Status Conference reset to 9/8/2011 at 10:30 A.M. before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 8/15/2011. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2011) (Entered: 08/15/2011)
2011-09-0268STATUS REPORT Plaintiffs' Status Conference Statement by Asian Law Caucus, San Francisco Bay Guardian, The American Civil Liberties Union of North California. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Nolan-Stevaux, Katherine) (Filed on 9/2/2011) (Entered: 09/02/2011)
2011-09-0869CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT for Status Conference filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Ulrich, Tamara) (Filed on 9/8/2011) (Entered: 09/08/2011)
2011-09-0970Minute Entry: Telephonic Status Conference held (Date Filed: 9/9/2011). Further Telephonic Status Conference set for 11/3/2011 at 10:30 A.M. before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/9/2011) (Entered: 09/09/2011)
2011-09-2971NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Angela Elaine Kleine (Kleine, Angela) (Filed on 9/29/2011) (Entered: 09/29/2011)
2011-10-0472Statement (Joint Status Update) by Asian Law Caucus, San Francisco Bay Guardian, The American Civil Liberties Union of North California. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Kleine, Angela) (Filed on 10/4/2011) (Entered: 10/04/2011)
2011-10-1473CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING Telephonic Status Conference to 11/3/2011 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2011) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
2011-10-2774ORDER DIRECTING THE GOVERNMENT TO PRODUCE TABLE AND RE: TELEPHONIC FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR NOVEMBER 3, 2011. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 10/27/2011. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2011) (Entered: 10/27/2011)
2011-10-2875CLERKS NOTICE CONTINUING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/8/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2011) (Entered: 10/28/2011)
2011-11-0376Minute Entry: Further telephonic status conference held. (Date Filed: 11/3/2011) (ls, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/3/2011) (Entered: 11/03/2011)
2011-11-0377AMENDED Minute Entry: Telephonic Status Conference held. (Date Filed: 11/3/2011) (ls, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/3/2011) (Entered: 11/03/2011)
2011-12-0578CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 6/14/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2011) (Entered: 12/05/2011)
2011-12-2079NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Angela Elaine Kleine (Kleine, Angela) (Filed on 12/20/2011) (Entered: 12/20/2011)
2011-12-2880Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Statement Regarding Document Production Schedule and Further Meet and Confer filed by Asian Law Caucus, San Francisco Bay Guardian, The American Civil Liberties Union of North California. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration in Support of Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Kleine, Angela) (Filed on 12/28/2011) (Entered: 12/28/2011)
2011-12-2981RESPONSE (re 80 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Statement Regarding Document Production Schedule and Further Meet and Confer ) filed byFederal Bureau of Investigation. (Ulrich, Tamara) (Filed on 12/29/2011) (Entered: 12/29/2011)
2012-01-0482ORDER (1) re: the parties' obligations following the November 3, 2011 telephonic settlement conference and (2) DENYING 80 Plaintiffs' administrative motion to file under seal. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 01/03/2012. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2012) (Entered: 01/04/2012)
2012-01-1083STIPULATION (JOINT) AND [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING DOCUMENT PRODUCTION SCHEDULE by Asian Law Caucus, San Francisco Bay Guardian, The American Civil Liberties Union of North California. (Kleine, Angela) (Filed on 1/10/2012) (Entered: 01/10/2012)
2012-01-1184STIPULATION AND ORDER re: Document Production Schedule. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 01/11/2012. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2012) (Entered: 01/11/2012)
2012-05-0185CLERKS NOTICE CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 6/28/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2012) (Entered: 05/01/2012)
2012-06-2086CLERKS NOTICE RESCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference Rescheduled from 6/28/12 to 8/30/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2012) (Entered: 06/20/2012)
2012-07-1187NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Michael Andrew Zee (Zee, Michael) (Filed on 7/11/2012) (Entered: 07/11/2012)
2012-08-0888CLERKS NOTICE RESCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 11/8/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2012) (Entered: 08/08/2012)
2012-11-0289CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 1/17/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2012) (Entered: 11/02/2012)
2013-01-0990CLERKS NOTICE RESCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 2/28/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2013) (Entered: 01/09/2013)
2013-02-2191CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Joint Case Management Conference Statement filed by Asian Law Caucus, San Francisco Bay Guardian, The American Civil Liberties Union of North California. (Kleine, Angela) (Filed on 2/21/2013) (Entered: 02/21/2013)
2013-02-2892Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 2/28/2013 before Judge Richard Seeborg (Date Filed: 2/28/2013). Further Case Management Conference set for 5/30/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Court Reporter Not Reported.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/28/2013) (Entered: 02/28/2013)
2013-03-2193STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER [JOINT] REGARDING CONFERENCE filed by Asian Law Caucus, San Francisco Bay Guardian, The American Civil Liberties Union of North California. (Kleine, Angela) (Filed on 3/21/2013) (Entered: 03/21/2013)
2013-03-2694STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler: Granting 93 Stipulation. Further Settlement Conference set for May 14, 2013 at 9:30 a.m. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2013) (Entered: 03/26/2013)
2013-03-26Set/Reset Hearing: Settlement Conference set for 5/14/2013 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2013) (Entered: 03/26/2013)
2013-04-3095STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE filed by Asian Law Caucus, Federal Bureau of Investigation, San Francisco Bay Guardian, The American Civil Liberties Union of North California. (Zee, Michael) (Filed on 4/30/2013) (Entered: 04/30/2013)
2013-04-3096ORDER REGARDING TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE AT MAY 14, 2013 CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Granting 95 Stipulation. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2013) (Entered: 04/30/2013)
2013-05-1497Minute Entry: Telephonic Settlement Conference held (Date Filed: 5/14/2013). (ls, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/14/2013) (Entered: 05/14/2013)
2013-05-2398JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Asian Law Caucus, San Francisco Bay Guardian, The American Civil Liberties Union of North California. (Urteaga, Debra) (Filed on 5/23/2013) (Entered: 05/23/2013)
2013-05-2499CLERKS NOTICE Further Case Management Conference set for 7/11/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2013) (Entered: 05/24/2013)
2013-06-24100CLERKS NOTICE Further Case Management Conference set for 8/15/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2013) (Entered: 06/24/2013)
2013-08-01101CLERKS NOTICE CONTINUING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 8/22/2013. Further Case Management Conference previously set for 8/15/13 has been rescheduled to 8/29/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. This is a text only entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2013) (Entered: 08/01/2013)
2013-08-08102CLERKS NOTICE RESCHEDULING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 10/10/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/17/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. This is a text only entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2013) (Entered: 08/08/2013)
2013-09-30103CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Statement due by 1/9/2014. Case Management Conference set for 1/16/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2013) (Entered: 09/30/2013)
2013-10-29104NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Lynn Yuhee Lee (Lee, Lynn) (Filed on 10/29/2013) (Entered: 10/29/2013)
2014-01-06105CLERKS NOTICE RESCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 4/10/2014. Further Case Management Conference previously set for 1/16/14 has been rescheduled to 4/17/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. This is a text only entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2014) (Entered: 01/06/2014)
2014-04-03106CLERKS NOTICE RESCHEDULING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 5/1/2014. Further Case Management Conference previously set for 4/17/14 has been Rescheduled to 5/8/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. This is a text only entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2014) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
2014-04-28107CLERKS NOTICE RESCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 5/15/2014. Case Management Conference previously set for 5/8/14 has been rescheduled to 5/22/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. This is a text only entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2014) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
2014-05-15108CLERKS NOTICE All parties shall appear telephonically at 11:00 a.m. for their case management conference scheduled for Thursday, May 22, 2014.(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2014) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
2014-05-15109JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Asian Law Caucus, San Francisco Bay Guardian, The American Civil Liberties Union of North California. (Urteaga, Debra) (Filed on 5/15/2014) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
2014-05-22110Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 5/22/2014 before Judge Richard Seeborg (Date Filed: 5/22/2014). (Court Reporter Not Reported.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/22/2014) (Entered: 05/22/2014)
2014-05-22111CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/22/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2014) (Entered: 05/22/2014)
2014-07-16112STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Amend Briefing Schedule filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Lee, Lynn) (Filed on 7/16/2014) (Entered: 07/16/2014)
2014-07-17113STIPULATION AND ORDER AMENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/17/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2014) (Entered: 07/17/2014)
2014-09-09114MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation. Responses due by 10/7/2014. Replies due by 10/29/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration David Hardy, # 2 Appendix Exhibits A-HH, # 3 Exhibit II - Vaughn narratives, # 4 Exhibit JJ - Vaughn reference index, # 5 Proposed Order)(Lee, Lynn) (Filed on 9/9/2014) (Entered: 09/09/2014)
2014-10-02115STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO AMEND BRIEFING SCHEDULE filed by Asian Law Caucus, San Francisco Bay Guardian, The American Civil Liberties Union of North California. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Urteaga, Debra) (Filed on 10/2/2014) (Entered: 10/02/2014)
2014-10-02116ORDER AMENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/2/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2014) (Entered: 10/02/2014)
2014-10-17117STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation to Amend Briefing Schedule filed by Asian Law Caucus, San Francisco Bay Guardian, The American Civil Liberties Union of North California. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Kleine, Angela) (Filed on 10/17/2014) (Entered: 10/17/2014)
2014-10-17118ORDER AMENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Judge Richard Seeborg. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2014) (Entered: 10/17/2014)
2014-11-04119Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment AND OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES filed by Asian Law Caucus, San Francisco Bay Guardian, The American Civil Liberties Union of North California. Motion Hearing set for 2/26/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 12/12/2014. Replies due by 1/9/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Urteaga, Debra) (Filed on 11/4/2014) (Entered: 11/04/2014)
2014-11-04120Declaration of Debra Urteaga in Support of 119 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment AND OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES filed byAsian Law Caucus, San Francisco Bay Guardian, The American Civil Liberties Union of North California. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4 Part 1, # 5 Exhibit 4 Part 2, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 7-1, # 10 Exhibit 7-2, # 11 Exhibit 7-3, # 12 Exhibit 7-4, # 13 Exhibit 7-5, # 14 Exhibit 7-6, # 15 Exhibit 8, # 16 Exhibit 9, # 17 Exhibit 10)(Related document(s) 119 ) (Urteaga, Debra) (Filed on 11/4/2014) (Entered: 11/04/2014)
2014-12-10121STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Amend Briefing Schedule filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Lee, Lynn) (Filed on 12/10/2014) (Entered: 12/10/2014)
2014-12-10122JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER AMENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/10/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2014) (Entered: 12/10/2014)
2014-12-17123REPLY (re 114 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment filed byFederal Bureau of Investigation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David M. Hardy)(Lee, Lynn) (Filed on 12/17/2014) (Entered: 12/17/2014)
2015-01-14124CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING MOTIONS HEARING [Dkt. #119] Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment AND OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES , [Dkt #114] MOTION for Summary Judgment . Motion Hearing previously set for 2/26/15 continued to 3/12/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. This is a text only entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2015) (Entered: 01/14/2015)
2015-01-14125REPLY (re 119 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment AND OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES ) -- REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' CROSS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed byAsian Law Caucus, San Francisco Bay Guardian, The American Civil Liberties Union of North California. (Urteaga, Debra) (Filed on 1/14/2015) (Entered: 01/14/2015)
2015-02-06126NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Nasrina Bargzie (Bargzie, Nasrina) (Filed on 2/6/2015) (Entered: 02/06/2015)
2015-03-12127Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Richard Seeborg: Motion Hearing held on 3/12/2015 re 119 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment. Court Reporter Name: Kathy Sullivan. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/12/2015) (Entered: 03/12/2015)
2015-03-23128ORDER REGARDING CROSS MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/23/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2015) (Entered: 03/23/2015)
2015-04-08129TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Asian Law Caucus, San Francisco Bay Guardian, The American Civil Liberties Union of North California for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Kleine, Angela) (Filed on 4/8/2015) (Entered: 04/08/2015)
2015-04-09130TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Federal Bureau of Investigation for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Lee, Lynn) (Filed on 4/9/2015) (Entered: 04/09/2015)
2015-04-10131Transcript of Proceedings held on 3/12/15, before Judge Richard Seeborg. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Sullivan, Telephone number 415-794-6659. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 130 Transcript Order, 129 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 5/1/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/11/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/9/2015. (Related documents(s) 130 , 129 ) (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 4/10/2015) (Entered: 04/10/2015)
2015-04-20132STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Time to File Case Management Plan filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Lee, Lynn) (Filed on 4/20/2015) (Entered: 04/20/2015)
2015-04-20133ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting 132 Stipulation to extend time to file case management plan. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2015) (Entered: 04/20/2015)
2015-05-01134CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Lee, Lynn) (Filed on 5/1/2015) (Entered: 05/01/2015)
2015-05-15135ORDER REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/15/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2015) (Entered: 05/15/2015)
2015-06-24136STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Amend Briefing Schedule filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Lee, Lynn) (Filed on 6/24/2015) (Entered: 06/24/2015)
2015-06-24137STIPULATION AND ORDER AMENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/24/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2015) (Entered: 06/24/2015)
2015-07-10138Supplemental Brief on Exemptions 2 and 5 filed byFederal Bureau of Investigation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Hardy)(Lee, Lynn) (Filed on 7/10/2015) (Entered: 07/10/2015)
2015-07-10139Declaration of David M. Hardy (Second Supplemental) filed byFederal Bureau of Investigation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit II - Vaughn excerpts)(Lee, Lynn) (Filed on 7/10/2015) (Entered: 07/10/2015)
2015-07-14Electronic filing error. Declaration of David Hardy is a Corrupted PDF File; unable to open. [err201] Please re-file the Declaration of David Hardy. Re: 138 Supplemental Brief filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation (rcsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2015) (Entered: 07/14/2015)
2015-07-31140Supplemental Brief re 138 Supplemental Brief Plaintiffs Response to Defendants Supplemental Brief In Support of Its Motion For Summary Judgment: Exemptions 2 And 5 filed byAsian Law Caucus, San Francisco Bay Guardian, The American Civil Liberties Union of North California. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) 138 ) (Kleine, Angela) (Filed on 7/31/2015) (Entered: 07/31/2015)
2015-07-31141Declaration of Angela E. Kleine in Support of 140 Supplemental Brief, Declaration of Angela E. Kleine In Support of Plaintiffs Response to Defendants Supplemental Brief In Support of Its Motion For Summary Judgment: Exemptions 2 And 5 filed byAsian Law Caucus, San Francisco Bay Guardian, The American Civil Liberties Union of North California. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 140 ) (Kleine, Angela) (Filed on 7/31/2015) (Entered: 07/31/2015)
2015-07-31142Proposed Order re 140 Supplemental Brief, [Proposed] Order Regarding The Parties Motions for Summary Judgment: Exemptions 2 And 5 by Asian Law Caucus, San Francisco Bay Guardian, The American Civil Liberties Union of North California. (Kleine, Angela) (Filed on 7/31/2015) (Entered: 07/31/2015)
2015-08-10143STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Time for Defendant's Reply filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Lee, Lynn) (Filed on 8/10/2015) (Entered: 08/10/2015)
2015-08-10144ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting 143 stipulation extending time for defendant's reply. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2015) (Entered: 08/10/2015)
2015-08-21145Supplemental Brief - Reply re: Exemptions 2 and 5 filed byFederal Bureau of Investigation. (Lee, Lynn) (Filed on 8/21/2015) (Entered: 08/21/2015)
2015-09-09146CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT HEARING. Motion Hearing set for 10/1/2015 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2015) (Entered: 09/09/2015)
2015-09-17147STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Hearing filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Lee, Lynn) (Filed on 9/17/2015) (Entered: 09/17/2015)
2015-09-17148ORDER CONTINUING MOTION HEARING. Motion Hearing previously set for 10/1/2015 Continued to 11/5/2015 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/17/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2015) (Entered: 09/17/2015)
2015-11-05149Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Richard Seeborg: Motion Hearing held on 11/5/2015. Court Reporter: Kathy Sullivan. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/5/2015) (Entered: 11/05/2015)
2015-11-06150ORDER TO PROVIDE DOCUMENTS FOR IN CAMERA REVIEW. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/6/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2015) (Entered: 11/06/2015)
2015-11-12151NOTICE by Federal Bureau of Investigation of Lodging of Documents for In Camera Review (Lee, Lynn) (Filed on 11/12/2015) (Entered: 11/12/2015)
2015-11-17152ORDER REGARDING CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/17/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2015) (Entered: 11/17/2015)
2015-11-18153NOTICE by Asian Law Caucus, The American Civil Liberties Union of North California Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel Christie L. Yang and Order Permitting Withdrawal (Kleine, Angela) (Filed on 11/18/2015) (Entered: 11/18/2015)
2015-11-18154NOTICE by Asian Law Caucus, The American Civil Liberties Union of North California Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel Debra Urteaga and Order Permitting Withdrawal (Kleine, Angela) (Filed on 11/18/2015) (Entered: 11/18/2015)
2015-11-18155NOTICE by Asian Law Caucus, The American Civil Liberties Union of North California Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel Patricia X. Svilik and Order Permitting Withdrawal (Kleine, Angela) (Filed on 11/18/2015) (Entered: 11/18/2015)
2015-11-19156ORDER permitting withdrawal of Attorney Christie Leigh Yang. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/18/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2015) (Entered: 11/19/2015)
2015-11-19157ORDER permitting withdrawal of Attorney Debra Urteaga.. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/18/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2015) (Entered: 11/19/2015)
2015-11-19158ORDER permitting withdrawal of Attorney Patricia X Svilik. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/18/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2015) (Entered: 11/19/2015)
2015-12-07159STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Production of Documents and Entry of Judgment filed by Asian Law Caucus, The American Civil Liberties Union of North California. (Kleine, Angela) (Filed on 12/7/2015) (Entered: 12/07/2015)
2015-12-07160Proposed Order re 159 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Production of Documents and Entry of Judgment [Proposed] Judgment by Asian Law Caucus, The American Civil Liberties Union of North California. (Kleine, Angela) (Filed on 12/7/2015) (Entered: 12/07/2015)
2015-12-08161STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 159 Regarding Production of Documents and Entry of Judgment. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/8/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2015) Modified on 12/11/2015 (cl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/08/2015)
2015-12-08162JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/8/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2015) (Entered: 12/08/2015)
2016-02-05163NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Appeal fee FEE WAIVED.) (Lee, Lynn) (Filed on 2/5/2016) (Entered: 02/05/2016)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff