Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCENTER FOR PUBLIC INTEGRITY v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2010cv00942
Date Filed2010-06-08
Date Closed2014-12-16
JudgeJudge Gladys Kessler
PlaintiffCENTER FOR PUBLIC INTEGRITY
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2010-06-081COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616030244) filed by CENTER FOR PUBLIC INTEGRITY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dr) (Entered: 06/08/2010)
2010-06-08SUMMONS (3) Issued as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (dr) (Entered: 06/08/2010)
2010-06-082LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests NONE by CENTER FOR PUBLIC INTEGRITY (dr) (Entered: 06/08/2010)
2010-06-093SUMMONS Returned Executed by RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the US Attorney, served on 6/8/2010, answer due 7/8/2010 (Smith, Peter) (Entered: 06/09/2010)
2010-06-254SUMMONS Returned Executed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 6/15/2010, answer due 7/15/2010.(Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Postal Return Receipt)(Smith, Peter) (Entered: 06/25/2010)
2010-06-255RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General 6/15/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Postal Return Receipt)(Smith, Peter) (Entered: 06/25/2010)
2010-07-076Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Weinstein, Laurie) (Entered: 07/07/2010)
2010-07-07MINUTE ORDER granting 6 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time; Defendant shall have up to and including August 9, 2010, in which to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 7/7/10. (CL, ) (Entered: 07/07/2010)
2010-07-07Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 8/9/2010, (CL, ) (Entered: 07/07/2010)
2010-08-097MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Weinstein, Laurie) (Entered: 08/09/2010)
2010-08-10MINUTE ORDER granting 7 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time; Defendant shall have up to and including September 8, 2010, in which to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 8/10/10. (CL, ) (Entered: 08/10/2010)
2010-08-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 9/8/2010 (CL, ) (Entered: 08/10/2010)
2010-09-148MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Weinstein, Laurie) (Entered: 09/14/2010)
2010-09-15ORDER granting 8 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time; Defendant shall have up to and including October 7, 2010, in which to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 9/15/10. (CL, ) (Entered: 09/15/2010)
2010-09-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 10/7/2010 (CL, ) (Entered: 09/15/2010)
2010-10-079ANSWER to 1 Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Weinstein, Laurie) (Entered: 10/07/2010)
2010-10-1210ORDER setting an Initial Scheduling Order for October 28, 2010, at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 10/12/10. (CL, ) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
2010-10-12Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 10/28/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26A before Judge Gladys Kessler. (CL, ) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
2010-10-27MINUTE ORDER: The Initial Scheduling Conference scheduled for October 28, 2010, is hereby cancelled; the parties are to file a Joint Status Report on November 27, 2010. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 10/27/10. (lcgk1, ) (Entered: 10/27/2010)
2010-11-2911Joint STATUS REPORT. (Smith, Peter) Modified on 11/30/2010 to edit text (dr). (Entered: 11/29/2010)
2010-11-29MINUTE ORDER: A Status Conference is hereby set in this case for December 20, 2010, at 11:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 11/29/10. (CL, ) (Entered: 11/29/2010)
2010-11-29Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 12/20/2010 11:00 AM in Courtroom 26A before Judge Gladys Kessler. (CL, ) (Entered: 11/29/2010)
2010-12-20Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gladys Kessler: Status Conference held on 12/20/2010. Joint Status Report due by 2/1/2011. (Court Reporter Susan Tyner.) (tth) (Entered: 12/20/2010)
2011-02-0112STATUS REPORT for Both Parties by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Weinstein, Laurie) (Entered: 02/01/2011)
2011-02-02MINUTE ORDER: A Status Conference is hereby set in this case for February 22, 2011, at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 2/2/11. (CL, ) (Entered: 02/02/2011)
2011-02-02Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 2/22/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26A before Judge Gladys Kessler. (CL, ) (Entered: 02/02/2011)
2011-02-03MINUTE ORDER: The Status Conference in this case currently set for Tuesday, February 22, 2011, is hereby rescheduled to Wednesday, February 23, 2011, at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 2/3/11. (CL, ) (Entered: 02/03/2011)
2011-02-03Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 2/23/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26A before Judge Gladys Kessler. (CL, ) (Entered: 02/03/2011)
2011-02-23Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gladys Kessler: Status Conference held on 2/23/2011. Status Report due from the parties in thirty (30) days. (Court Reporter Susan Tyner.) (tth) (Entered: 02/23/2011)
2011-02-23MINUTE ORDER: As stated in the Status Conference held on this date in open court, the parties are to file a Status Report with the Court within 30 days of the date of this Minute Order. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 2/23/11. (CL, ) (Entered: 02/23/2011)
2011-02-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 3/25/2011 (CL, ) (Entered: 02/23/2011)
2011-03-2513STATUS REPORT filed with consent of Plaintiff by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Weinstein, Laurie) (Entered: 03/25/2011)
2012-10-1814ORDER: In reviewing its docket, the Court has observed that the last filing in this case was March 25, 2012, strongly suggesting that a Final Stipulation would be reached by April 1, 2011; nothing has been heard from either party since that date; therefore, the parties are to file a Status Report with the Court no later than October 18, 2012. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 10/18/12. (CL, ) (Entered: 10/18/2012)
2012-10-18Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 10/28/2012 (CL, ) (Entered: 10/18/2012)
2012-10-3115STATUS REPORT (Joint) by CENTER FOR PUBLIC INTEGRITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Weinstein, Laurie) (Entered: 10/31/2012)
2012-11-1416STATUS REPORT with Consent of Plaintiff by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Weinstein, Laurie) (Entered: 11/14/2012)
2013-01-16MINUTE ORDER: On November 14, 2012, the Defendant, with consent of Plaintiff, filed a Status Report indicating they would need another two weeks in which to continue working on resolution of this matter; the parties shall have two weeks from the date of this Order to file a further Status Report. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 1/16/13. (CL, ) (Entered: 01/16/2013)
2013-01-3017STATUS REPORT with Consent of Plaintiff by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Weinstein, Laurie) (Entered: 01/30/2013)
2013-01-3118ORDER that the parties shall have up to and including February 13, 2013, in which to finalize their discussions and inform the Court of the resolution or if other actions are necessary. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 1/31/13. (CL, ) (Entered: 01/31/2013)
2013-02-04Set/Reset Deadline: Report due to the Court by 2/13/2013 (tth) (Entered: 02/04/2013)
2013-02-1319STATUS REPORT (Joint) by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Weinstein, Laurie) (Entered: 02/13/2013)
2013-02-1420ORDER that the parties shall have up to and including February 28, 2013, in which to finalize their discussions and to inform the Court of the resolution or if other actions are necessary. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 02/14/2013. (lcgk2, ) (Entered: 02/14/2013)
2013-02-15Set/Reset Deadline: Report to the Court due by 2/28/2013 (tth) (Entered: 02/15/2013)
2013-02-2721STATUS REPORT with Consent of Plaintiff by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Weinstein, Laurie) (Entered: 02/27/2013)
2013-03-1322STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Weinstein, Laurie) (Entered: 03/13/2013)
2013-03-14MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall file a further Status Report no later than April 3, 2013. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 3/14/13. (CL, ) (Entered: 03/14/2013)
2013-03-14Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 4/3/2013 (CL, ) (Entered: 03/14/2013)
2013-04-0323STATUS REPORT on behalf of both parties by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Weinstein, Laurie) (Entered: 04/03/2013)
2013-04-0424ORDER that a further Status Report shall be filed no later than April 18, 2013. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 4/4/13. (CL, ) (Entered: 04/04/2013)
2013-04-04Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 4/18/2013 (CL, ) (Entered: 04/04/2013)
2013-04-2325ORDER: The Parties were directed to file a further Status Report in this case no later than April 18, 2013; no Status Report has been received by the Court; the Parties shall now file a Status Report with the Court no later than April 26, 2013, at 5:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 4/23/13. (CL, ) Modified on 4/24/2013 at the direction of chambers to correct text to clarify that a Status Report is due 4/26/13 at 5:00 p.m. (zmm, ). (Entered: 04/23/2013)
2013-04-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 4/26/2013 by 5:00 p.m. (CL, ) (Entered: 04/23/2013)
2013-04-2626STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Weinstein, Laurie) (Entered: 04/26/2013)
2013-05-1327STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Weinstein, Laurie) (Entered: 05/13/2013)
2013-06-0628ORDER that the Parties shall file a Status Report no later than June 10, 2013. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 6/6/13. (CL, ) (Entered: 06/06/2013)
2013-06-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 6/10/2013 (CL, ) (Entered: 06/06/2013)
2013-06-1029Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Status Report by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Weinstein, Laurie) (Entered: 06/10/2013)
2013-06-11MINUTE ORDER granting 29 , nunc pro tunc, the Motion for Extension of Time; Defendant shall have up to and including June 12, 2013, in which to file a Status Report describing progress made in this case. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 6/11/13. (CL, ) (Entered: 06/11/2013)
2013-06-11Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 6/12/2013 (CL, ) (Entered: 06/11/2013)
2013-06-1230MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Status Report by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Weinstein, Laurie) (Entered: 06/12/2013)
2013-06-13MINUTE ORDER granting 30 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time; Defendant shall have up to and including June 21, 2013, in which to file its Status Report. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 6/13/13. (CL, ) (Entered: 06/13/2013)
2013-06-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 6/21/2013 (CL, ). (Entered: 06/13/2013)
2013-06-2531ORDER that the Parties shall file a Status Report no later than June 28, 2013, at 5:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 6/25/13. (CL, ) (Entered: 06/25/2013)
2013-06-25Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/28/2013 (CL, ) (Entered: 06/25/2013)
2013-07-2232STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Weinstein, Laurie) (Entered: 07/22/2013)
2013-07-23MINUTE ORDER: A further Status Report shall be filed no later than August 6, 2013. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 7/23/13. (CL, ) (Entered: 07/23/2013)
2013-07-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 8/6/2013 (CL, ) (Entered: 07/23/2013)
2013-08-0633STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Weinstein, Laurie) (Entered: 08/06/2013)
2013-08-07MINUTE ORDER: A further Status Report shall be filed no later than August 27, 2013. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 08/07/2013. (lcgk2, ) (Entered: 08/07/2013)
2013-08-07Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 8/27/2013 (tth) (Entered: 08/07/2013)
2013-08-2734STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Weinstein, Laurie) (Entered: 08/27/2013)
2013-08-2835ORDER that the parties shall file a further Status Report, informing the Court of a possible resolution in this matter, or in the alternative, a proposed briefing schedule, no later than September 11, 2013. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 8/28/13. (CL, ) (Entered: 08/28/2013)
2013-08-28Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 9/11/2013 (CL, ) (Entered: 08/28/2013)
2013-10-0436ORDER that the Parties shall appear for a Status Conference on November 12, 2013, at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 10/4/13. (CL, ) (Entered: 10/04/2013)
2013-10-04Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 11/12/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26A before Judge Gladys Kessler. (CL, ) (Entered: 10/04/2013)
2013-10-04MINUTE ORDER: The time for the Status Conference on November 12, 2013, is 11:00 a.m. (see Order for details), not 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 10/4/13. (CL, ) (Entered: 10/04/2013)
2013-10-30MINUTE ORDER: Due to a change in the Court's Calendar, the Status Conference now set for November 12, 2013, is hereby rescheduled to November 25, 2013, at 10:15 a.m.; counsel may file a Motion for Continuance if this date proves to be inconvenient for the parties. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 10/30/13. (CL, ) (Entered: 10/30/2013)
2013-10-30Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 11/25/2013 10:15 AM in Courtroom 26A before Judge Gladys Kessler. (CL, ) (Entered: 10/30/2013)
2013-11-1537NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Jeremy S. Simon on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE Substituting for attorney Laurie Weinstein (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 11/15/2013)
2013-11-25Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gladys Kessler: Status Conference held on 11/25/2013. (Court Reporter: Scott Wallace) (tth) (Entered: 11/25/2013)
2013-11-2538ORDER that Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's latest comments on the draft sipulation no later than January 15, 2014; Plaintiff will respond, if appropriate, to Defendant's Response no later than January 31, 2014; both parties will file a Joint Status Report informing the Court of their progress by February 4, 2014. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 11/25/13. (CL, ) (Entered: 11/25/2013)
2013-11-25Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's comments due no later than 1/15/2014. Plaintiff's response to Defendant's response due no later than 1/31/2014. Joint Status Report due by 2/14/2014 (CL, ) (Entered: 11/25/2013)
2014-02-0439STATUS REPORT (Joint Status Report) by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 02/04/2014)
2014-02-0440ORDER that the Parties shall file a further Joint Status Report no later than March 6, 2014. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 2/4/14. (CL, ) (Entered: 02/04/2014)
2014-02-04Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/6/2014 (tth). (Entered: 02/04/2014)
2014-03-0641STATUS REPORT (Joint Status Report) by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 03/06/2014)
2014-03-06MINUTE ORDER that the parties shall file a further Joint Status Report no later than April 8, 2014, by 4:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 3/6/14. (CL, ) Modified event title on 3/7/2014 (znmw, ). (Entered: 03/06/2014)
2014-03-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 4/8/2014 (CL, ) (Entered: 03/06/2014)
2014-04-0842STATUS REPORT (Joint Status Report) by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 04/08/2014)
2014-04-0843ORDER that the Parties shall file a further Joint Status report no later than May 8, 2014 (see Order for details). Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 4/8/14. (CL, ) (Entered: 04/08/2014)
2014-04-08Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 5/8/2014 (CL, ) (Entered: 04/08/2014)
2014-05-0844STATUS REPORT (Joint Status Report) by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation (dated May 5, 2014))(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 05/08/2014)
2014-05-0945ORDER that the Parties shall file a further Joint Status Report no later than September 15, 2014. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 5/9/14. (CL, ) (Entered: 05/09/2014)
2014-05-09Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/15/2014 (CL, ) (Entered: 05/09/2014)
2014-09-1546STATUS REPORT (Joint Status Report) by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/15/2014)
2014-09-1647ORDER that the Parties shall file a further Joint Status Report no later than December 8, 2014. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 9/16/14. (CL, ) (Entered: 09/16/2014)
2014-09-16Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 12/8/2014 (CL, ). (Entered: 09/16/2014)
2014-12-0848Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Status Report by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 12/08/2014)
2014-12-0949ORDER granting 48 Motion for Extension of Time to File Status Report; Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 12/18/2014. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on December 9, 2014. (lcgk2, ) (Entered: 12/10/2014)
2014-12-1150STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 12/11/2014)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff