Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCENTER FOR PUBLIC INTEGRITY v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2010cv00591
Date Filed2010-04-15
Date Closed2010-06-04
JudgeJudge Henry H. Kennedy
PlaintiffCENTER FOR PUBLIC INTEGRITY
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2010-04-151COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616029042) filed by CENTER FOR PUBLIC INTEGRITY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dr) (Entered: 04/15/2010)
2010-04-15SUMMONS (3) Issued as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (dr) (Entered: 04/15/2010)
2010-04-152LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests NONE by CENTER FOR PUBLIC INTEGRITY (dr) (Entered: 04/15/2010)
2010-04-153NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by CENTER FOR PUBLIC INTEGRITY. Case related to Case No. 09-1765. (dr) (Entered: 04/15/2010)
2010-04-264NOTICE of Appearance by Rhonda C. Fields on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION (Fields, Rhonda) (Entered: 04/26/2010)
2010-05-055SUMMONS Returned Executed by CENTER FOR PUBLIC INTEGRITY. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION served on 4/15/2010, answer due 5/17/2010., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the US Attorney. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION served on 4/15/2010, answer due 5/17/2010 (Smith, Peter) (Entered: 05/05/2010)
2010-05-056SUMMONS Returned Executed by CENTER FOR PUBLIC INTEGRITY. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION served on 4/23/2010, answer due 5/24/2010., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION served on 4/23/2010, answer due 5/24/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit USPS Domestic Return Receipt)(Smith, Peter) (Entered: 05/05/2010)
2010-05-057SUMMONS Returned Executed by CENTER FOR PUBLIC INTEGRITY. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION served on 4/26/2010, answer due 5/26/2010., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General 04/26/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit USPS Domestic Return Receipt)(Smith, Peter) (Entered: 05/05/2010)
2010-05-128ANSWER to 1 Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION.(Fields, Rhonda) (Entered: 05/12/2010)
2010-05-139ORDER directing the parties to submit a joint case management report. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on May 13, 2010. (NP) (Entered: 05/13/2010)
2010-06-0110STIPULATION of Dismissal by CENTER FOR PUBLIC INTEGRITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Peter) (Entered: 06/01/2010)
2010-06-0311ORDER of DISMISSAL per 10 the parties' stipulation. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on June 3, 2010. (NP) (Entered: 06/03/2010)
2010-07-1212ENTERED IN ERROR.....ORDER of DISMISSAL per 43 Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on July 12, 2010. (NP) Modified on 7/12/2010 to enter in error (dr). (Entered: 07/12/2010)
2010-07-12NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 12 Order was entered in error (in the wrong case), and will be refiled in the correct case.(dr) (Entered: 07/12/2010)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff