Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFox News Network, LLC v. Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2010cv03320
Date Filed2010-04-20
Date Closed2011-03-23
JudgeJudge Alvin K. Hellerstein
PlaintiffFox News Network, LLC
DefendantBoard of Governors of the Federal Reserve System
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2010-04-201COMPLAINT against Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 901346)Document filed by Fox News Network, LLC.(mbe) (Entered: 04/23/2010)
2010-04-20SUMMONS ISSUED as to Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System. (mbe) (Entered: 04/23/2010)
2010-04-20CASE REFERRED TO Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein as possibly related to 1:09-cv-00272. (mbe) (Entered: 04/23/2010)
2010-04-20Case Designated ECF. (mbe) (Entered: 04/23/2010)
2010-04-202RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Fox Business Network as Corporate Parent. Document filed by Fox News Network, LLC.(mbe) (Entered: 04/23/2010)
2010-04-233AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System served on 4/20/2010, answer due 5/11/2010. Service was accepted by U.S. Attorney Civil Processing Clerk. Document filed by Fox News Network, LLC. (Ostensen, Paul) (Entered: 04/23/2010)
2010-04-234AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Fox News Network, LLC. (Ostensen, Paul) (Entered: 04/23/2010)
2010-05-04CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:09-cv-00272-AKH. Notice of Assignment to follow. (jnm) (Entered: 05/05/2010)
2010-05-045NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (jnm) (Entered: 05/05/2010)
2010-05-04Magistrate Judge Kevin N. Fox is so designated. (jnm) (Entered: 05/05/2010)
2010-05-076ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Tara M. Lamorte dated 5/6/10 re: counsel for defendant writes respectfully on behalf of both parties to request that the Court schedule an initial conference in this matter. ENDORSEMENT: the parties, through counsel, shall meet with me at conference May 21, 2010, at 10:00 a.m. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 5/7/10) (pl). (Entered: 05/07/2010)
2010-05-137AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 1 Complaint against Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System.Document filed by Fox News Network, LLC. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by Fox News Network, LLC.(rdz) (rdz). (Entered: 05/17/2010)
2010-05-208MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Document filed by Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Jeanne M. McLaughlin with Exhibits)(La Morte, Tara) (Entered: 05/20/2010)
2010-05-209MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction.. Document filed by Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System. (La Morte, Tara) (Entered: 05/20/2010)
2010-05-21Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein: Status Conference held on 5/21/2010. Status Conference set for 9/17/2010 at 10:00 AM before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. (tro) (Entered: 05/27/2010)
2010-06-0110ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Tara LaMorte dated 5/24/10 re: Request that the parties agreement made at the initial status conference on 5/21/10 be approved: The Board hereby withdraws its pending motion to dismiss, or in the alternative, motion for a stay, and as further set forth in this document. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System answer due 6/11/2010. ( Status Conference set for 9/17/2010 at 10:00 AM before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/1/10) (cd) Modified on 6/8/2010 (cd). (Entered: 06/01/2010)
2010-06-1111ANSWER to Amended Complaint. Document filed by Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System. Related document: 7 Amended Complaint filed by Fox News Network, LLC.(La Morte, Tara) (Entered: 06/11/2010)
2010-09-1412ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Steven G. Mintz dated 9/13/10 re: Request for an extension of time of the status conference until 10/1/10. ENDORSEMENT: The conference is adjourned to October 8, 2010, 10:00 am. (Status Conference set for 10/8/2010 at 10:00 AM before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/14/10) (db) (Entered: 09/14/2010)
2010-10-0513ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Steven G. Mintz dated 10/1/2010 re: Requesting an adjournment of the status conference scheduled for October 8, 2010. ENDORSEMENT: Conference adjourned to December 10, 2010 at 10:00 am. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 10/4/2010) (jpo) (Entered: 10/05/2010)
2011-01-3114ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Tara M. Lamorte dated 1/26/11 re: The Board's motion concerning Exemption 8, if any, would be filed on March 4, 2011. Fox's opposition would be due on March 25, 2011, and the Board's reply due on April 6, 2011. The parties would be available for oral argument the week of April 25 (except April 25th) or the week of May 2. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. Oral Argument will be held May 3, at 3:00 pm. (Motions due by 3/4/2011. Responses due by 3/25/2011. Replies due by 4/6/2011. Oral Argument set for 5/3/2011 at 03:00 PM before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 1/27/11) (db) (Entered: 01/31/2011)
2011-03-1515NOTICE: You are hereby notified that you are required to appear for a status conf. on 4/15/2011 at 10:00 am, Place: U.S. Courthouse-Southern District of New York, 500 Pearl Street, Courtroom 14D, New York, New York 10007. It is ORDERED that counsel to whom this Order is sent is responsible for faxing a copy to all counsel involved in this case and retaining verification of such in the case file. Do not fax such verification to Chambers. SO ORDERED. (Status Conference set for 4/15/2011 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 14D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 3/15/2011) (lnl) (Entered: 03/15/2011)
2011-03-2316ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Steven G. Mintz dated 3/22/2011 re: Requesting that the Court so-order the enclosed stipulations between the parties which resolve the outstanding issues in both actions and provide for the timing for Fox News's possible motions for attorney's fees, under 5 U.S.C.552 (a)(4)(E). In addition, we request that the Court cancel the status conference in Fox II that is scheduled for April 15, 2011. ENDORSEMENT: Canceled. Your filing of the stipulations ordered this date, and except for a motion regarding attorneys' fees, the Clerk shall close the file. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 3/23/2011) (jpo) (Entered: 03/23/2011)
2011-05-1017ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein, from Steven G. Mintz dated 5/9/2011 re: The parties respectfully request that Your Honor so-order the enclosed judgment in Fox I. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 5/10/2011) (jfe) Modified on 5/16/2011 (jfe). (Entered: 05/11/2011)
2011-06-1718ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Steven G. Mintz dated 6/16/11 re: Request for an extension of the deadline within which the plaintiff must file its fee motions under section 552(A)(4)(E) of FOIA. The motions are currently due to be filed on or before July 8, 2011. The parties respectfully request that the deadline be adjourned until August 11, 2011. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Motions due by 8/11/2011.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/17/11) (rjm) (Entered: 06/17/2011)
2011-08-0419STIPULATION AND ORDER OF SETTLEMENT: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the parties, through their respective counsel, as follows: The Board shall pay to Fox Business the sum of $10,000.00 in attorneys' fees and litigation costs, pursuant to 5 U.S.C. § 552(a)(4)(E), which sum Fox Business and its counsel agree to accept as full payment of any attorneys' fees and costs Fox Business has incurred with respect to this action. The Board agrees to begin processing the payment of fees immediately upon the entry of this Stipulation and Order and its receipt from Fox Business of the completed Federal Reserve Supplier Information Form and W-9, and to make payment as soon as practicable thereafter. This action is hereby dismissed with prejudice, provided that the Court shall retain jurisdiction over any issues that may arise relating to this Stipulation and Order; as further set forth in this Stipulation and Order of Settlement. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 8/2/2011) (mro) (Entered: 08/04/2011)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff