Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleThe New York Times Company v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2010cv02656
Date Filed2010-03-24
Date Closed2010-11-18
JudgeJudge Deborah A. Batts
PlaintiffThe New York Times Company
DefendantUnited States Department of Homeland Security
DefendantJanet Napolitano
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2010-03-241COMPLAINT against United States Department of Homeland Security, Janet Napolitano. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 898516)Document filed by The New York Times Company.(js) (ama). (Entered: 03/29/2010)
2010-03-24SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of Homeland Security, Janet Napolitano. (js) (Entered: 03/29/2010)
2010-03-24Magistrate Judge James C. Francis is so designated. (js) (Entered: 03/29/2010)
2010-03-24Case Designated ECF. (js) (Entered: 03/29/2010)
2010-03-242RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by The New York Times Company.(js) (ama). (Entered: 03/29/2010)
2010-03-303CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. United States Department of Homeland Security served on 3/25/2010, answer due 4/15/2010; Janet Napolitano served on 3/25/2010, answer due 4/15/2010. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by The New York Times Company. (McCraw, David) (Entered: 03/30/2010)
2010-04-294ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Deborah A. Batts from Ross E. Morrison dated 4/23/2010 re: Counsel for the Government request that their time to respond to the complaint be extended thirty days, from 4/23/2010, until 5/24/2010. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. United States Department of Homeland Security answer due 4/28/2010; Janet Napolitano answer due 4/28/2010. (Signed by Judge Deborah A. Batts on 4/28/2010) (tro) (Entered: 04/30/2010)
2010-05-185NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ross Eric Morrison on behalf of United States Department of Homeland Security, Janet Napolitano (Morrison, Ross) (Entered: 05/18/2010)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff