Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleThe New York Times Company et al v. United States Department of the Treasury
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2009cv10437
Date Filed2009-12-23
Date Closed2010-10-14
JudgeMagistrate Judge Frank Maas
PlaintiffThe New York Times Company
PlaintiffRon Nixon
DefendantUnited States Department of the Treasury
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2009-12-231COMPLAINT against United States Department of the Treasury. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 890004)Document filed by The New York Times Company, Ron Nixon.(mro) (Entered: 12/28/2009)
2009-12-23SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of the Treasury, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (mro) (Entered: 12/28/2009)
2009-12-23CASE REFERRED TO Judge Paul G. Gardephe as possibly similar to 08-cv8341. (mro) (Entered: 12/28/2009)
2009-12-23Case Designated ECF. (mro) (Entered: 12/28/2009)
2009-12-232RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by The New York Times Company.(mro) (Entered: 12/28/2009)
2009-12-283CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. United States Department of the Treasury served on 12/28/2009, answer due 1/19/2010. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by The New York Times Company; Ron Nixon. (McCraw, David) (Entered: 12/28/2009)
2010-01-06CASE DECLINED AS NOT SIMILAR. Case referred as similar to 1:08-cv-8341 and declined by Judge Paul G. Gardephe and returned to wheel for assignment. (ldi) (Entered: 01/06/2010)
2010-01-064NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to Judge Richard J. Holwell. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (ldi) (Entered: 01/06/2010)
2010-01-06Magistrate Judge Frank Maas is so designated. (ldi) (Entered: 01/06/2010)
2010-01-285ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Frank Maas. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 1/12/2010) (jfe) (Entered: 01/28/2010)
2010-02-056ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Holwell from Joseph N. Cordaro dated 1/28/10 re: counsel for defendant writes that at present, the Government's answer to plaintiff's complaint is due on February 1, 2010. I write respectfully to request a 30-day extension of this deadline to March 3, 2010. ENDORSEMENT: Application Granted. So Ordered. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Frank Maas on 2/4/10) (pl) (Entered: 02/05/2010)
2010-02-167ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Frank Maas from David E. McCraw dated 2/12/2010 re: The parties respectfully request that the Court set a schedule for the briefing of summary judgment. The parties have agreed to the following schedule: 3/1-plaintiff's motion for summary judgment. 4/1-Defendant's response and cross-motion. 5/3-Plaintiffs' rely and response. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. So Ordered. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Frank Maas on 2/12/2010) (jfe) (Entered: 02/16/2010)
2010-03-018FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FIRST MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by The New York Times Company, Ron Nixon. Responses due by 4/19/2010 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law, # 2 Rule 56.1 Statement, # 3 Affidavit McCraw Declaration)(McCraw, David) Modified on 3/3/2010 (jar). (Entered: 03/01/2010)
2010-03-01***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Note to Attorney David McCraw to RE-FILE Document 8 FIRST MOTION for Summary Judgment. ERROR(S): Supporting document must be filed separately. Use the event type Memorandum of Law in Support and Declaration in Support found under the event list Replies, Oppositions, Supporting Documents. NOTE: The motion must first be correctly re-filed. (jar) (Entered: 03/03/2010)
2010-03-039FIRST MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by The New York Times Company, Ron Nixon. Responses due by 4/19/2010(McCraw, David) (Entered: 03/03/2010)
2010-03-0310MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 9 FIRST MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by The New York Times Company, Ron Nixon. (McCraw, David) (Entered: 03/03/2010)
2010-03-0311DECLARATION of David E. McCraw in Support re: 9 FIRST MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by The New York Times Company, Ron Nixon. (McCraw, David) (Entered: 03/03/2010)
2010-03-0312RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by The New York Times Company, Ron Nixon. (McCraw, David) (Entered: 03/03/2010)
2010-03-0313ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by United States Department of the Treasury.(Cordaro, Joseph) (Entered: 03/03/2010)
2010-03-1714ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Consent under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) for all purposes (e.g., dispositive motion, preliminary injunction). Referred to Magistrate Judge Frank Maas. Motions referred to Frank Maas. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 3/16/2010) (tro) (Entered: 03/17/2010)
2010-04-1315ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Frank Maas from Joseph N. Cordaro dated 4/13/2010 re: The Government requests a one week extension of the response and reply deadline to Plaintiff's Summary Judgment motion. The parties jointly propose the following revised briefing schedule: April 26, 2010: Deadline for filing of the Government's opposition to plaintiff's summary judgment motion and/or a cross-motion for summary judgment. May 10, 2010: Deadline for filing of plaintiffs' reply brief and/or opposition to the Government's cross-motion for summary judgment. May 17, 2010: Deadline for filing of the Government's reply to plaintiffs' opposition to, the Government's cross-motion for summary judgment. ENDORSEMENT: APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Frank Maas on 4/13/2010) (tve) (Entered: 04/14/2010)
2010-04-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Cross Motions due by 4/26/2010. (tve) (Entered: 04/14/2010)
2010-04-2616CONSENT TO JURISDICTION BY A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by The New York Times Company, Ron Nixon, United States Department of the Treasury. (Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge) CASE ASSIGNED to Magistrate Judge Frank Maas. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 4/23/2010) (tro) (Entered: 04/26/2010)
2010-04-2617MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by United States Department of the Treasury.(Cordaro, Joseph) (Entered: 04/26/2010)
2010-04-2618DECLARATION of Marshall H. Fields, Jr. in Support re: 17 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by United States Department of the Treasury. (Cordaro, Joseph) (Entered: 04/26/2010)
2010-04-2619DECLARATION of Joseph N. Cordaro in Support re: 17 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by United States Department of the Treasury. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Cordaro, Joseph) (Entered: 04/26/2010)
2010-04-2620RESPONSE re: 12 Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by United States Department of the Treasury. (Cordaro, Joseph) (Entered: 04/26/2010)
2010-04-2621MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 17 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by United States Department of the Treasury. (Cordaro, Joseph) (Entered: 04/26/2010)
2010-05-1022MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 17 MOTION for Summary Judgment. And in Reply in Support re: 9 . Document filed by The New York Times Company, Ron Nixon. (McCraw, David) (Entered: 05/10/2010)
2010-05-1023DECLARATION of Jacob P. Goldstein in Opposition re: 17 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by The New York Times Company, Ron Nixon. (McCraw, David) (Entered: 05/10/2010)
2010-05-1724REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 17 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by United States Department of the Treasury. (Cordaro, Joseph) (Entered: 05/17/2010)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff