Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCENTER FOR PUBLIC INTERGRITY v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2009cv01878
Date Filed2009-10-02
Date Closed2010-01-27
JudgeJudge Reggie B. Walton
PlaintiffCENTER FOR PUBLIC INTERGRITY
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2009-10-021COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616024408) filed by CENTER FOR PUBLIC INTERGRITY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rdj) (Entered: 10/05/2009)
2009-10-02SUMMONS (3) Issued as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (rdj) (Entered: 10/05/2009)
2009-10-022LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CENTER FOR PUBLIC INTERGRITY identifying Corporate Parent NONE for CENTER FOR PUBLIC INTERGRITY. (rdj) (Entered: 10/05/2009)
2009-10-083SUMMONS Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney by CENTER FOR PUBLIC INTERGRITY. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 10/2/2009, answer due 11/2/2009. (Smith, Peter) Modified text on 10/9/2009 (znmw, ). (Entered: 10/08/2009)
2009-10-154RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit USPS Domestic Return Receipt)(Smith, Peter) (Entered: 10/15/2009)
2009-10-155RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General 10/08/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit USPS Return Receipt)(Smith, Peter) (Entered: 10/15/2009)
2009-10-156SUMMONS Returned Executed by CENTER FOR PUBLIC INTERGRITY. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 10/6/2009, answer due 11/5/2009; (See Docket Entry No. 4 to view document) (td, ) (Entered: 10/16/2009)
2009-10-307NOTICE of Appearance by Mitchell P. Zeff on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (znmw, ) (Entered: 11/02/2009)
2009-10-308MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(znmw, ) (Entered: 11/02/2009)
2009-11-02MINUTE ORDER granting 8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer by the U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES until 12/2/2009. Upon consideration of the defendant's motion for an extension of time, to which the plaintiff consents, the Court finds good cause to grant the motion. The defendant shall file its answer or other response to the plaintiff's complaint by December 2, 2009. In the meantime, the parties are encouraged to pursue a negotiated compromise which would resolve this case. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 11/02/09. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 11/02/2009)
2009-11-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer or respond to complaint by 12/2/2009, (mpt, ) (Entered: 11/03/2009)
2009-12-029Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Zeff, Mitchell) (Entered: 12/02/2009)
2009-12-03MINUTE ORDER granting 9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. The Court having reviewed the consent motion and finding good cause to award the relief sought, the motion is granted. The defendant's answer or other responsive pleading is due by December 16, 2009. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 12/3/09. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 12/03/2009)
2009-12-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer or responsive pleading due by 12/16/2009, (mpt, ) (Entered: 12/03/2009)
2009-12-2210MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Zeff, Mitchell) (Entered: 12/22/2009)
2009-12-28MINUTE ORDER granting 10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. The Court having reviewed the motion and finding good cause to award the relief sought, the motion is granted. The defendant's answer or other responsive pleading is due by January 8, 2010. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 12/28/09. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 12/28/2009)
2009-12-28Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer or responsive pleading due by 1/8/2010, (mpt, ) (Entered: 12/28/2009)
2010-01-0811Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Zeff, Mitchell) (Entered: 01/08/2010)
2010-01-12MINUTE ORDER granting 11 Motion for Extension of Time. Having reviewed the defendant's consent motion for an extension of time to answer or otherwise respond to the plaintiff's complaint and finding good cause to grant the relief requested therein, the motion is granted. The defendant's answer or other response to the plaintiff's complaint shall be due on Friday, January 22, 2010. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 01/12/10. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 01/12/2010)
2010-01-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer or respond to complaint due by 1/22/2010, (mpt, ) (Entered: 01/13/2010)
2010-01-2212STIPULATION of Settlement and Order of Dismissal by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Zeff, Mitchell) (Entered: 01/22/2010)
2010-01-2713STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 1/26/10. (mpt, ) (Entered: 01/27/2010)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff