Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSoutheastern Newspaper Company, LLC v. Holder et al
DistrictSouthern District of Georgia
CityAugusta
Case Number1:2011cv00004
Date Filed2011-01-11
Date Closed2012-02-17
JudgeJudge J. Randal Hall
PlaintiffSoutheastern Newspaper Company, LLC
doing business as The Augusta Chronicle
DefendantEric H. Holder, Jr. Attorney General, United States Department of Justice
DefendantUnited States Marshals Service
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Opinion/Order [17]
Opinion/Order [21]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2011-01-111COMPLAINT against Eric H. Holder, Jr, United States Marshals Service, filed by Southeastern Newspaper Company, LLC. ($350 filing fee paid) (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit)(cmr) (Entered: 01/12/2011)
2011-01-112RULE 26 INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge W. Leon Barfield on 1/11/11. (cmr) (Entered: 01/12/2011)
2011-01-123Summons Issued as to Eric H. Holder, Jr. (cmr) (Entered: 01/12/2011)
2011-01-134Summons Reissued as to Eric Holder. (thb) Modified on 1/13/2011 (thb). (Entered: 01/13/2011)
2011-01-135Summons Issued as to United States Marshals Service. (thb) (Entered: 01/13/2011)
2011-02-106Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings by Eric H. Holder, Jr, Southeastern Newspaper Company, LLC, United States Marshals Service. Responses due by 2/28/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Rule 83.4(c) Certification for Attorney Galen N. Thorp)(Thorp, Galen) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
2011-02-117ORDER granting 6 Motion to Stay; Defts shall answer the complaint, or respond by motion w/i 30 days after the announcement of the 11th Circuit's decision. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 2/11/11. (cmr) Modified on 2/14/2011 (jah). (Entered: 02/11/2011)
2011-02-188NOTICE of Appearance by Delora L. Kennebrew on behalf of Eric H. Holder, Jr, United States Marshals Service (Kennebrew, Delora) (Entered: 02/18/2011)
2011-02-189AMENDED DOCUMENT by Eric H. Holder, Jr, United States Marshals Service. Amendment to 8 Notice of Appearance. (Kennebrew, Delora) (Entered: 02/18/2011)
2011-02-2810CERTIFICATE pursuant to Local Rule 3-2 by Southeastern Newspaper Company, LLC. (Hudson, David) (Entered: 02/28/2011)
2011-04-0711MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Southeastern Newspaper Company, LLC. Responses due by 4/25/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hudson, David) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
2011-04-1212ORDER granting 11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. Answer due by 5:00 p.m., April 25, 2011. Responses due by 4/25/2011. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 04/12/2011. (thb) Modified on 4/12/2011 (thb). (Entered: 04/12/2011)
2011-04-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Eric H. Holder, Jr answer due 4/25/2011; United States Marshals Service answer due 4/25/2011. (thb) (Entered: 04/12/2011)
2011-04-2613(NUNC PRO TUNC to 04/25/2011) ANSWER to Complaint by Eric H. Holder, Jr, United States Marshals Service.(Thorp, Galen) Modified on 4/27/2011 (thb). (Entered: 04/26/2011)
2011-04-2614Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 13 Answer to Complaint by Eric H. Holder, Jr, United States Marshals Service. Responses due by 5/13/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Thorp, Galen) (Entered: 04/26/2011)
2011-04-2715ORDER granting 14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 1 Complaint, directing the Clerk to indicate in the record that Defendants' Answer has been timely filed nunc pro tunc April 25, 2011. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 04/27/2011. (thb) (Entered: 04/27/2011)
2011-05-0316Consent MOTION to Stay Further Proceedings by Southeastern Newspaper Company, LLC. Responses due by 5/20/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hudson, David) (Entered: 05/03/2011)
2011-05-0317ORDER granting 16 Motion to Stay until the Eleventh Circuit resolves Karantsalis. When that time comes, parties shall notify the Court within 14 days by by filing a motion to lift the stay and a proposed joint scheduling order that sets forth a timeline for the remainder of the case. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 05/03/2011. (thb) (Entered: 05/03/2011)
2011-06-1518MOTION to Substitute Attorney; NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth D. Crowder on behalf of Eric H. Holder, Jr (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Crowder, Kenneth) Modified on 6/21/2011 (thb). (Entered: 06/15/2011)
2011-06-21MOTION REFERRED: 18 MOTION to Substitute Attorney (thb) (Entered: 06/21/2011)
2011-06-21Motions No Longer Referred: 18 MOTION to Substitute Attorney (thb) (Entered: 06/21/2011)
2011-07-2919ORDER granting 18 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Kenneth D. Crowder for United States Marshals Service. Attorney Delora L. Kennebrew terminated. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 07/29/2011. (thb) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
2012-02-1720STIPULATION of Dismissal by Southeastern Newspaper Company, LLC. (Hudson, David) (Entered: 02/17/2012)
2012-02-1721ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE. Each party shall bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. The Clerk is directed to terminate all deadlines and motions, and close this case. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 02/17/2012. (thb) (Entered: 02/17/2012)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff