Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWeigel Broadcasting Co. v. Federal Communications Commission
DistrictNorthern District of Illinois
CityChicago
Case Number1:2011cv00236
Date Filed2011-01-13
Date Closed2012-07-16
JudgeHonorable Ronald A. Guzman
PlaintiffWeigel Broadcasting Co. an Illinois corporation
DefendantFederal Communications Commission
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Opinion/Order [38]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2011-01-131COMPLAINT filed by Weigel Broadcasting Co.; Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0752-5605875. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Rabinowitz, Mark) (Entered: 01/13/2011)
2011-01-132CIVIL Cover Sheet (Rabinowitz, Mark) (Entered: 01/13/2011)
2011-01-133ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Weigel Broadcasting Co. by Mark A. Rabinowitz (Rabinowitz, Mark) (Entered: 01/13/2011)
2011-01-134LOCAL Rule 3.2 disclosure statement by Weigel Broadcasting Co. (Rabinowitz, Mark) Modified on 1/14/2011 (vmj, ). (Entered: 01/13/2011)
2011-01-13CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Morton Denlow. (mh, ) (Entered: 01/13/2011)
2011-01-1353 SUMMONS Issued as to Federal Communications Commission, U.S. Attorney's Office and U.S. Attorney General (vmj, ) (Entered: 01/13/2011)
2011-01-246MINUTE entry before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: The Court orders the parties to appear for an initial status hearing. All parties shall refer to and comply with Judge Guzman's requirements for the initial appearance as outlined in Judge Guzman's case management procedures, which can be found at: www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Status hearing set for 3/21/2011 at 09:30 AM. Mailed notice (cjg, ) (Entered: 01/24/2011)
2011-01-247SUMMONS Returned Executed by Weigel Broadcasting Co. as to Federal Communications Commission served on 1/19/2011, answer due 3/21/2011 (Rabinowitz, Mark) (Entered: 01/24/2011)
2011-01-248DESIGNATION of Abigail Lynn Peluso as U.S. Attorney for Defendant Federal Communications Commission (Peluso, Abigail) (Entered: 01/24/2011)
2011-01-279AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Weigel Broadcasting Co. regarding Summons and Complaint served on Federal Communications Commission on January 20, 2011 (Rabinowitz, Mark) (Entered: 01/27/2011)
2011-01-2810SUMMONS Returned Executed by Weigel Broadcasting Co. as to Federal Communications Commission served on 1/20/2011, answer due 3/21/2011 (Rabinowitz, Mark) (Entered: 01/28/2011)
2011-02-1611MOTION by Defendant Federal Communications Commission for extension of time to file answer (Peluso, Abigail) (Entered: 02/16/2011)
2011-02-1612NOTICE of Motion by Abigail Lynn Peluso for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer 11 before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 2/22/2011 at 09:30 AM. (Peluso, Abigail) (Entered: 02/16/2011)
2011-02-1613MINUTE entry before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman:Defendant's motion for extension of time to 3/21/2011 to answer or otherwise plead 11 is granted. Mailed notice (jms, ) (Entered: 02/16/2011)
2011-03-1614STATUS Report by Federal Communications Commission, Weigel Broadcasting Co. (Rabinowitz, Mark) (Entered: 03/16/2011)
2011-03-1815ANSWER to Complaint by Federal Communications Commission(Peluso, Abigail) (Entered: 03/18/2011)
2011-03-2116MINUTE entry before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman:Status hearing held on 3/21/2011. Index as stated in open court to be filed by 4/18/11. Initial filing of cross motions for summary judgment to begin on or before 5/9/11. Judge Guzman's standing order regarding cross motions for summary judgment is posted on the Court's website: www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed notice (cjg, ) (Entered: 03/21/2011)
2011-04-1817NOTICE by Federal Communications Commission of Filing (Peluso, Abigail) (Entered: 04/18/2011)
2011-04-1818DECLARATION of David Brown (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Peluso, Abigail) (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office) (Entered: 04/18/2011)
2011-05-0919MOTION by Defendant Federal Communications Commission for summary judgment (Peluso, Abigail) (Entered: 05/09/2011)
2011-05-0920MEMORANDUM by Federal Communications Commission in support of motion for summary judgment 19 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Peluso, Abigail) (Entered: 05/09/2011)
2011-05-0921RULE 56.1 Statement by Federal Communications Commission regarding motion for summary judgment 19 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, B, C)(Peluso, Abigail) (Entered: 05/09/2011)
2011-05-2022MOTION by Plaintiff Weigel Broadcasting Co. for summary judgment (Rabinowitz, Mark) (Entered: 05/20/2011)
2011-05-2023MEMORANDUM motion for summary judgment 19 , motion for summary judgment 22 by Weigel Broadcasting Co. in Support of Weigel Broadcasting's Motion for Summary Judgment and in Opposition to Federal Communications Commission's Motion for Summary Judgment (Rabinowitz, Mark) (Entered: 05/20/2011)
2011-05-2024RULE 56.1 Statement by Weigel Broadcasting Co. regarding motion for summary judgment 22 (Rabinowitz, Mark) (Entered: 05/20/2011)
2011-05-2025RESPONSE by Plaintiff Weigel Broadcasting Co. to Rule 56 statement 21 (Rabinowitz, Mark) (Entered: 05/20/2011)
2011-05-2726MOTION by Defendant Federal Communications Commission for extension of time to file response/reply as to motion for summary judgment 22 (Peluso, Abigail) (Entered: 05/27/2011)
2011-05-2727NOTICE of Motion by Abigail Lynn Peluso for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply, motion for relief 26 before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 6/2/2011 at 09:30 AM. (Peluso, Abigail) (Entered: 05/27/2011)
2011-05-2728RESPONSE by Weigel Broadcasting Co.in Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Federal Communications Commission for extension of time to file response/reply as to motion for summary judgment 22 26 (Rabinowitz, Mark) (Entered: 05/27/2011)
2011-06-0129MINUTE entry before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Notice of motion set for 6/2/11 is stricken. Motion y Defendant Federal Communications Commission for extension of time to file reply as to motion by Plaintiff Weigel Broadcasting Co. for summary judgment 22 26 is granted. Reset deadlines as to motion by Plaintiff Weigel Broadcasting Co. for summary judgment 22 : Responses due by 6/21/2011 Replies due by 7/8/2011. Mailed notice (cjg, ) (Entered: 06/01/2011)
2011-06-2030RESPONSE by Defendant Federal Communications Commission to Weigel's Rule 56.1 Statement of Fact (Peluso, Abigail) (Entered: 06/20/2011)
2011-06-2031RESPONSE by Defendant Federal Communications Commission to Weigel's Statement of Additional Facts (Peluso, Abigail) (Entered: 06/20/2011)
2011-06-2032RULE 56.1 Statement of Additional Uncontested Fact (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Peluso, Abigail) (Entered: 06/20/2011)
2011-06-2033MEMORANDUM by Federal Communications Commission in Opposition to motion for summary judgment 22 and Reply in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment (Peluso, Abigail) (Entered: 06/20/2011)
2011-07-0734REPLY memorandum by Plaintiff in support of its motion for summary judgment 22 (Rabinowitz, Mark) (Text modified by clerk's office) (Entered: 07/07/2011)
2011-07-0735REPLY by Plaintiff Weigel Broadcasting Co. to Response 30 to Weigel Broadcasting Co.'s Rule 56.1 Statement of Fact (Rabinowitz, Mark) (Entered: 07/07/2011)
2011-07-0736RESPONSE by Plaintiff Weigel Broadcasting Co. to Rule 56 statement 32 (Rabinowitz, Mark) (Entered: 07/07/2011)
2012-02-1737MINUTE entry before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Pursuant to Memorandum Opinion and Order dated 2/17/12, the Court grants in part and denies in part the FCC's motion for summary judgment 19 and denies plaintiff's motion for summary judgment 22 . The Court orders the FCC to produce documents 10 and 11 to the Court for in camera review within fourteen days of the date of this order. Thereafter, the Court will issue a ruling by mail with respect to those documents. Mailed notice (cjg, ) (Entered: 02/21/2012)
2012-02-1738MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 2/17/2012. Mailed notice(cjg, ) (Entered: 02/21/2012)
2012-03-0239NOTICE by Federal Communications Commission of Submission of Records For In Camera Review (Peluso, Abigail) (Entered: 03/02/2012)
2012-03-0840MOTION by Plaintiff Weigel Broadcasting Co. for reconsideration regarding memorandum opinion and order 38 (Rabinowitz, Mark) (Entered: 03/08/2012)
2012-03-0841MEMORANDUM by Weigel Broadcasting Co. in support of motion for reconsideration, motion for relief 40 (Rabinowitz, Mark) (Entered: 03/08/2012)
2012-03-0842NOTICE of Motion by Mark A. Rabinowitz for presentment of motion for reconsideration, motion for relief 40 before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 3/13/2012 at 09:30 AM. (Rabinowitz, Mark) (Entered: 03/08/2012)
2012-03-0943MINUTE entry before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Notice of motion set for 3/13/12 is stricken. Set deadlines as to motion by Plaintiff Weigel Broadcasting Co. for reconsideration regarding memorandum opinion and order 38 40 : Response due by 3/30/2012. Reply due by 4/13/2012. Ruling to be by mail. Mailed notice (cjg, ) (Entered: 03/09/2012)
2012-03-3044RESPONSE by defendant to plaintiff's motion to reconsider 40 . (Peluso, Abigail) (Text modified by clerk's office) (vmj, ). (Entered: 03/30/2012)
2012-04-0545REPLY Memorandum in support by Plaintiff of its motion for reconsideration of 2/17/2012 ruling 40 . (Rabinowitz, Mark) (Text modified by clerk's office) (vmj, ). (Entered: 04/05/2012)
2012-07-1646MINUTE entry before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Plaintiff's motion to reconsider 40 is granted in part to correct an error in the Court's Memorandum Opinion and Order entered February 21, 2012 ("Order"). The Court hereby amends the second sentence of the first full paragraph on page eight of the Order to state: "Documents 1-9, 12-26 and 29-32 are draft decisions and orders on plaintiff's applications, internal memoranda and emails discussing the agency's possible decisions on the applications, its procedures with respect to the possible decisions and its response to an inquiry about the status of the review." The motion to reconsider, which otherwise reiterates arguments plaintiff previously made, is denied. Mailed notice (cjg, ) Mailed notice (cjg, ) (Entered: 07/16/2012)
2012-07-1647MINUTE entry before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: In accordance with its February 21, 2012 Memorandum Opinion and Order ("Order"), the Court has reviewed in camera documents 10 and 11, which defendant withheld from production under the Freedom of Information Act ("FOIA"). The documents are draft decisions in letter form that were prepared before plaintiff withdrew its applications in September 2009. As such, for the reasons discussed in the Order, documents 10 and 11 are subject to the deliberative process privilege and FOIA exemption 5. Having determined that defendant properly withheld under FOIA documents 1-26 and 29-32, the only documents still at issue in this case, the Court hereby enters judgment for defendant and against plaintiff and terminates this case. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (cjg, ) (Entered: 07/16/2012)
2012-07-1648ENTERED JUDGMENT Signed by Deputy Clerk on 7/16/2012. Mailed notice (cjg, ) (Entered: 07/16/2012)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff