Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleOSM MEDIA, LLC v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
City
Case Number1:2011cv00103
Date Filed2011-01-18
Date Closed2011-09-01
Judge
PlaintiffOSM MEDIA, LLC
doing business as PAJAMAS MEDIA AND PJTV
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2011-01-181COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616035710) filed by OSM MEDIA, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rdj) (Entered: 01/18/2011)
2011-01-18SUMMONS (3) Issued as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (rdj) (Entered: 01/18/2011)
2011-01-182LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by OSM MEDIA, LLC identifying Corporate Parent NONE for OSM MEDIA, LLC. (rdj) (Entered: 01/18/2011)
2011-01-193MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Nina Yablok, :Firm- Law Office of Nina Yablok, :Address- 1313 N. Milpitas Blvd., Ste. 139. Phone No. - 408-955-9100. Fax No. - 408-955-9191 by OSM MEDIA, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hodes, Scott) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
2011-01-19MINUTE ORDER granting 3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Nina Yablok is granted leave to appear pro hac vice in the above-captioned case. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on January 19, 2011. (lcegs5) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
2011-02-014RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed in a FOIA Case as to the U.S. Attorney for DC; UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 1/21/2011, answer due 2/20/2011 for U.S. Attorney. (Hodes, Scott) (Entered: 02/01/2011)
2011-02-015RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General 1/21/2011. (Hodes, Scott) (Entered: 02/01/2011)
2011-02-016RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed . UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 1/21/2011 (Hodes, Scott) Modified on 2/2/2011 to enhance docket text (jf, ). (Entered: 02/01/2011)
2011-02-227NOTICE of Appearance by Ethan Price Davis on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Davis, Ethan) (Entered: 02/22/2011)
2011-02-228ANSWER to 1 Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Davis, Ethan) (Entered: 02/22/2011)
2011-05-24MINUTE ORDER directing the parties to submit a proposed briefing schedule by no later than June 8, 2011. In the event that counsel are unable to agree on a joint recommendation, each party shall file an individual recommendation by that time. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on May 24, 2011. (lcegs1) (Entered: 05/24/2011)
2011-05-24Set/Reset Deadlines: parties proposed briefing schedule due by 6/8/2011 (clv, ) (Entered: 05/24/2011)
2011-06-089Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to submit proposed briefing schedule by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Ethan) (Entered: 06/08/2011)
2011-06-10MINUTE ORDER granting 9 the parties' joint motion for extension of time. The parties are directed to submit a proposed briefing schedule by no later than June 22, 2011. In the event that counsel are unable to agree on a joint recommendation, each party shall file an individual recommendation by that time. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on June 10, 2011. (lcegs1) (Entered: 06/10/2011)
2011-06-13Set/Reset Deadlines: parties proposed briefing schedule due by 6/22/2011. (clv, ) (Entered: 06/13/2011)
2011-06-2010NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Bekesha on behalf of OSM MEDIA, LLC (Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 06/20/2011)
2011-06-2211Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Proposed Briefing Schedule by OSM MEDIA, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 06/22/2011)
2011-06-23MINUTE ORDER granting 11 the parties' joint motion for extension of time. The parties are directed to submit a proposed briefing schedule by no later than July 6, 2011. In the event that counsel are unable to agree on a joint recommendation, each party shall file an individual recommendation by that time. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on June 23, 2011. (lcegs1) (Entered: 06/23/2011)
2011-06-2312NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to OSM MEDIA, LLC. Attorney Scott Allan Hodes terminated. (Hodes, Scott) (Entered: 06/23/2011)
2011-06-24Set/Reset Deadlines: Parties proposed briefing schedule due by 7/6/2011 (clv, ) (Entered: 06/24/2011)
2011-06-2813NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to OSM MEDIA, LLC. Attorney Nina Yablok terminated. (Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 06/28/2011)
2011-07-0614Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit a Joint Status Report by OSM MEDIA, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 07/06/2011)
2011-07-07MINUTE ORDER granting 14 the parties' joint motion for extension of time. The parties are directed to file a joint status report, including a recommendation for further proceedings, by no later than August 5, 2011. In the event that counsel are unable to agree on a joint recommendation, each party shall file an individual recommendation by that time. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on July 7, 2011. (lcegs1) (Entered: 07/07/2011)
2011-07-08Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 8/5/2011 (clv, ) (Entered: 07/08/2011)
2011-08-0515Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Second Joint Status Report by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Ethan) (Entered: 08/05/2011)
2011-08-05MINUTE ORDER granting 15 the parties' joint motion for extension of time to file second joint status report. The parties are directed to file a joint status report, including a recommendation for further proceedings and a proposed briefing schedule, if necessary, by no later than September 6, 2011. In the event that counsel are unable to agree on a joint recommendation, each party shall file an individual recommendation by that time. If this case settles in whole or in part before September 6, 2011, counsel shall advise the Court of the settlement by filing a stipulation. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on August 5, 2011. (lcegs6) (Entered: 08/05/2011)
2011-08-05Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 9/6/2011 (clv, ) (Entered: 08/05/2011)
2011-09-0116STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by OSM MEDIA, LLC, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 09/01/2011)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff