Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleRosenfeld v. Federal Bureau of Investigation et al
DistrictNorthern District of California
CitySan Francisco
Case Number3:2011cv02131
Date Filed2011-04-29
Date Closed2015-04-23
JudgeMagistrate Judge Maria-Elena James
PlaintiffSeth Rosenfeld
DefendantFederal Bureau of Investigation
DefendantUnited States Department of Justice
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
Complaint attachment 16
Complaint attachment 17
Complaint attachment 18
Complaint attachment 19
Complaint attachment 20
Complaint attachment 21
Complaint attachment 22
Complaint attachment 23
Complaint attachment 24
Complaint attachment 25
Complaint attachment 26
Complaint attachment 27
Complaint attachment 28
Complaint attachment 29
Opinion/Order [8]
Opinion/Order [10]
Opinion/Order [13]
Opinion/Order [22]
Opinion/Order [27]
Opinion/Order [30]
Opinion/Order [31]
Opinion/Order [37]
Opinion/Order [45]
Opinion/Order [47]
Opinion/Order [48]
Opinion/Order [51]
Opinion/Order [67]
Opinion/Order [76]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2011-04-291COMPLAINT /no process against Federal Bureau of Investigation, United States Department of Justice ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 34611059257.). Filed bySeth Rosenfeld. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2011) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/2/2011: # 1 Complaint, # 2 Exhibit A-1, # 3 Exhibit A-2, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G) (ga, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/2/2011: # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J, # 13 Exhibit K, # 14 Exhibit L) (ga, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/2/2011: # 15 M, # 16 Exhibit N, # 17 Exhibit O, # 18 Exhibit P, # 19 Exhibit Q, # 20 Exhibit R, # 21 Exhibit S, # 22 Exhibit T, # 23 Exhibit U) (ga, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/2/2011: # 24 Exhibit V, # 25 Exhibit W, # 26 Exhibit X, # 27 Exhibit Y, # 28 Exhibit Z, # 29 Exhibit AA to EE) (ga, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/02/2011)
2011-04-292ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 8/4/2011. Case Management Conference set for 8/11/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/29/11. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2011) (Entered: 05/02/2011)
2011-04-29CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2011) (Entered: 05/02/2011)
2011-05-133CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Seth Rosenfeld Proof of Service on U.S. Department of Justice (Stein, Benjamin) (Filed on 5/13/2011) (Entered: 05/13/2011)
2011-05-134CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Seth Rosenfeld Proof of Service on Federal Bureau of Investigation (Stein, Benjamin) (Filed on 5/13/2011) (Entered: 05/13/2011)
2011-05-135CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Seth Rosenfeld Proof of Service on U.S. Attorneys Office (Stein, Benjamin) (Filed on 5/13/2011) (Entered: 05/13/2011)
2011-05-13SUMMONS Returned Executed by Seth Rosenfeld. Federal Bureau of Investigation served on 5/6/2011, answer due 7/5/2011; United States Department of Justice served on 5/6/2011, answer due 7/5/2011,United States Attorneys Office served on 5/9/11, answer due 7/8/11 per 3 4 5 . (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2011) (Entered: 05/16/2011)
2011-06-066Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint byFederal Bureau of Investigation, United States Department of Justice. (Deiss, Ila) (Filed on 6/6/2011) (Entered: 06/06/2011)
2011-07-067STIPULATION TO EXTEND DATE OF INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE and [proposed] ORDER by Seth Rosenfeld. (Stein, Benjamin) (Filed on 7/6/2011) (Entered: 07/06/2011)
2011-07-078ORDER Case Management Statement due by 9/15/2011. Case Management Conference set for 9/22/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 7/7/2011. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2011) (Entered: 07/07/2011)
2011-09-029STIPULATION Joint Motion To Be Excused From the Formal ADR Process and [Proposed] Order by Federal Bureau of Investigation, United States Department of Justice. (Deiss, Ila) (Filed on 9/2/2011) (Entered: 09/02/2011)
2011-09-0610ORDER GRANTING Motion To Be Excused From the Formal ADR Process. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/6/2011. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2011) (Entered: 09/06/2011)
2011-09-1411CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 9/29/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2011) (Entered: 09/14/2011)
2011-09-1512JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT ; and [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation, United States Department of Justice. (Deiss, Ila) (Filed on 9/15/2011) (Entered: 09/15/2011)
2011-09-2113ORDER Cross Motions due by 12/1/2011. Motions due by 11/17/2011. Replies due by 12/15/2011. Responses due by 12/1/2011. Motion Hearing set for 1/12/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/21/2011. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2011) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
2011-11-1714MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant's Notice of Motion; Motion for Summary Judgment with Memorandum of Points and Authorities and Declaration of David M. Hardy filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation, United States Department of Justice. Motion Hearing set for 1/12/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Responses due by 12/1/2011. Replies due by 12/8/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David M. Hardy, # 2 Exhibit A - II, # 3 Exhibit JJ - LL, # 4 Exhibit Continue LL, # 5 Exhibit Continue LL, # 6 Exhibit MM)(Deiss, Ila) (Filed on 11/17/2011) (Entered: 11/17/2011)
2011-11-1715Proposed Order re 14 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant's Notice of Motion; Motion for Summary Judgment with Memorandum of Points and Authorities and Declaration of David M. Hardy by Federal Bureau of Investigation, United States Department of Justice. (Deiss, Ila) (Filed on 11/17/2011) (Entered: 11/17/2011)
2011-11-3016STIPULATION STIPULATED REQUEST FOR AN ORDER CHANGING TIME by Seth Rosenfeld. (Stein, Benjamin) (Filed on 11/30/2011) (Entered: 11/30/2011)
2011-12-0217ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 14 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Cross Motions due by 12/21/2011. Replies due by 1/5/2012. Responses due by 12/7/2011. Motion Hearing set for 1/19/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/2/2011. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2011) (Entered: 12/02/2011)
2011-12-0618CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing as to 14 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Motion Hearing set for 1/26/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2011) (Entered: 12/06/2011)
2011-12-0819Statement of Non-Opposition Unopposed Request for Order Extending Time filed bySeth Rosenfeld. (Stein, Benjamin) (Filed on 12/8/2011) (Entered: 12/08/2011)
2011-12-0820First MOTION for Summary Judgment Cross-Motion and Opposition filed by Seth Rosenfeld. Motion Hearing set for 1/26/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Responses due by 12/21/2011. Replies due by 12/21/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of M. Wesley Swearingen, # 2 Declaration Declaration of Benjamin W. Stein, # 3 Declaration Declaration of Seth Rosenfeld, # 4 Exhibit Exhs. A-R, # 5 Exhibit Exhs. S-T, # 6 Exhibit Exhs. V-FF, # 7 Exhibit Exh. GG-QQ, # 8 Exhibit Exh. U)(Stein, Benjamin) (Filed on 12/8/2011) (Entered: 12/08/2011)
2011-12-0821Proposed Order Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition by Seth Rosenfeld. (Stein, Benjamin) (Filed on 12/8/2011) (Entered: 12/08/2011)
2011-12-1522ORDER re 19 Unopposed Request for Order Extending Time filed by Seth Rosenfeld. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge MARIA-ELENA JAMES on 12/15/11. (bjtS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2011) (Entered: 12/15/2011)
2011-12-2123RESPONSE (re 20 First MOTION for Summary Judgment Cross-Motion and Opposition ) Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment; and Second Declaration of David M. Hardy filed byFederal Bureau of Investigation, United States Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Second Declaration of David M. Hardy)(Deiss, Ila) (Filed on 12/21/2011) (Entered: 12/21/2011)
2011-12-2224MOTION Defendants' Administrative Motion for Leave to Present Classified Declaration in Camera and Under Seal; and Proposed Order filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation, United States Department of Justice. Responses due by 1/5/2012. Replies due by 1/12/2012. (Deiss, Ila) (Filed on 12/22/2011) (Entered: 12/22/2011)
2011-12-3025ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting 24 Motion for Leave to Present Classified Declaration in Camera and Under Seal (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2011) (Entered: 12/30/2011)
2011-12-3126RESPONSE to re 25 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Plaintiff's Response to Court's Order Defendants' Motion for Leave to Present Classified Declaration In Camera and Under Seal by Seth Rosenfeld. (Stein, Benjamin) (Filed on 12/31/2011) (Entered: 12/31/2011)
2012-01-0327ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO RECONSIDER ORDER re 26 Response ( Non Motion ), filed by Seth Rosenfeld. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/3/2012. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2012) (Entered: 01/03/2012)
2012-01-0528REPLY (re 14 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant's Notice of Motion; Motion for Summary Judgment with Memorandum of Points and Authorities and Declaration of David M. Hardy ) filed bySeth Rosenfeld. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exh A - D, # 2 Exhibit Exh E, # 3 Exhibit Exh F - G, # 4 Declaration of Seth Rosenfeld (Second))(Stein, Benjamin) (Filed on 1/5/2012) (Entered: 01/05/2012)
2012-01-1729STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 20 First MOTION for Summary Judgment Cross-Motion and Opposition Stipulation to Reset Hearing Date and [Proposed] Order filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation, United States Department of Justice. (Deiss, Ila) (Filed on 1/17/2012) (Entered: 01/17/2012)
2012-01-1930STIPULATION AND ORDER re 29 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 20 First MOTION for Summary Judgment Cross-Motion and Opposition. Stipulation to Reset Hearing Date and [Proposed] Order filed by United States Department of Justice, Federal Bureau of Investigation. Motion Hearing Rescheduled to 2/9/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge MARIA-ELENA JAMES on 1/19/12. (bjtS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2012) (Entered: 01/19/2012)
2012-01-19Motion Reset as to 20 First MOTION for Summary Judgment. Cross-Motion and Opposition, 14 MOTION for Summary Judgment.Defendant's Notice of Motion; Motion for Summary Judgment with Memorandum of Points and Authorities and Declaration of David M. Hardy. Motion Hearing set for 2/9/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Chief Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. (bjtS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2012) (Entered: 01/19/2012)
2012-01-2331ORDER REQUESTING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING; ORDER VACATING 2/9/12 SUMMARY JUDGMENT HEARING. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/23/2012. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2012) (Entered: 01/23/2012)
2012-01-3032Brief re 31 Order, Terminate Hearings Defendants' Supplemental Brief in Response to the Court's January 23, 2012 Request; Third Declaration of David M. Hardy; and Revised [Proposed] Order filed byFederal Bureau of Investigation, United States Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration David M. Hardy, # 2 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 31 ) (Deiss, Ila) (Filed on 1/30/2012) (Entered: 01/30/2012)
2012-02-0633Brief re 31 Order, Terminate Hearings Supplemental Brief filed bySeth Rosenfeld. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Revised Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 31 ) (Stein, Benjamin) (Filed on 2/6/2012) (Entered: 02/06/2012)
2012-02-2234STATUS REPORT by Federal Bureau of Investigation, United States Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Deiss, Ila) (Filed on 2/22/2012) (Entered: 02/22/2012)
2012-02-2435Brief re 34 Status Report Plaintiff's Response filed bySeth Rosenfeld. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Third Declaration of Seth Rosenfeld, # 2 Exhibit Exh A)(Related document(s) 34 ) (Stein, Benjamin) (Filed on 2/24/2012) (Entered: 02/24/2012)
2012-06-1436Brief Status Report filed bySeth Rosenfeld. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Fourth Declaration of Seth Rosenfeld, # 2 Exhibit A-C, # 3 Exhibit D-E, # 4 Exhibit F-G)(Stein, Benjamin) (Filed on 6/14/2012) (Entered: 06/14/2012)
2012-07-0237ORDER RE CROSS MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re 20 First MOTION for Summary Judgment Cross-Motion and Opposition filed by Seth Rosenfeld, 14 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant's Notice of Motion; Motion for Summary Judgment filed by United States Department of Justice, Federal Bureau of Investigation. Status Report due by 7/13/2012.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 7/2/2012. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2012) (Entered: 07/02/2012)
2012-07-1338JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Joint Case Management Statment filed by Seth Rosenfeld. (Stein, Benjamin) (Filed on 7/13/2012) (Entered: 07/13/2012)
2012-08-0739MOTION to Unseal Document 24 MOTION Defendants' Administrative Motion for Leave to Present Classified Declaration in Camera and Under Seal; and Proposed Order filed by United States Department of Justice, Federal Bureau of Investigation, 25 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Motion to Unseal Classified Declaration filed by Seth Rosenfeld. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exh A-B, # 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Stein, Benjamin) (Filed on 8/7/2012) (Entered: 08/07/2012)
2012-08-07Set/Reset Hearing re 39 MOTION to Unseal Document. Motion Hearing set for 9/20/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2012) (Entered: 08/23/2012)
2012-08-2040RESPONSE (re 39 MOTION to Unseal Document 24 MOTION Defendants' Administrative Motion for Leave to Present Classified Declaration in Camera and Under Seal; and Proposed Order filed by United States Department of Justice, Federal Bureau of Investigation ) filed byFederal Bureau of Investigation, United States Department of Justice. (Deiss, Ila) (Filed on 8/20/2012) (Entered: 08/20/2012)
2012-09-0441REPLY (re 39 MOTION to Unseal Document 24 MOTION Defendants' Administrative Motion for Leave to Present Classified Declaration in Camera and Under Seal; and Proposed Order filed by United States Department of Justice, Federal Bureau of Investigation ) Reply Motion filed bySeth Rosenfeld. (Stein, Benjamin) (Filed on 9/4/2012) (Entered: 09/04/2012)
2012-09-2042ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James denying without prejudice 39 Motion to Unseal Document ; denying without prejudice 14 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying without prejudice 20 Motion for Summary Judgment (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2012) (Entered: 09/20/2012)
2012-09-2043Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 9/20/2012 before Chief Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James (Date Filed: 9/20/2012) re 39 MOTION to Unseal Document 24 MOTION Defendants' Administrative Motion for Leave to Present Classified Declaration in Camera and Under Seal; and Proposed Order filed by United States Department of Justice, Federal Bureau of Investigation filed by Seth Rosenfeld. Court to issue Order. (Court Reporter Debra Pas.) (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/20/2012) (Entered: 09/20/2012)
2012-10-0444STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Seth Rosenfeld. (Stein, Benjamin) (Filed on 10/4/2012) (Entered: 10/04/2012)
2012-11-0145ORDER TO MEET AND CONFER. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 11/1/2012. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2012) (Entered: 11/01/2012)
2012-11-0646STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 45 Order Stipulation To Extend Date of Meet and Confer; and [Proposed] Order filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation, United States Department of Justice. (Deiss, Ila) (Filed on 11/6/2012) (Entered: 11/06/2012)
2012-11-0747ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 46 Stipulation To Extend Date of Meet and Confer. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2012) (Entered: 11/07/2012)
2013-08-3048ORDER - Status Report due by 9/19/2013. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/30/2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2013) (Entered: 08/30/2013)
2013-09-1949STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Federal Bureau of Investigation, United States Department of Justice. (Deiss, Ila) (Filed on 9/19/2013) (Entered: 09/19/2013)
2013-09-1950STATUS REPORT Supplemental Status Report and [Proposed Order] by Seth Rosenfeld. (Stein, Benjamin) (Filed on 9/19/2013) (Entered: 09/19/2013)
2013-09-2351ORDER FOR PARTIES TO CONTINUE MEET AND CONFER EFFORTS. Status Report due by 10/10/2013. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/23/2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2013) (Entered: 09/23/2013)
2013-10-0352Ex Parte Application Defendant's Ex Parte Application For Stay During Lapse Appropriation filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation, United States Department of Justice. (Deiss, Ila) (Filed on 10/3/2013) (Entered: 10/03/2013)
2013-10-0353Proposed Order re 52 Ex Parte Application Defendant's Ex Parte Application For Stay During Lapse Appropriation by Federal Bureau of Investigation, United States Department of Justice. (Deiss, Ila) (Filed on 10/3/2013) (Entered: 10/03/2013)
2013-10-0454ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting 52 Defendant's Ex Parte Application For Stay During Lapse Appropriation (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2013) (Entered: 10/04/2013)
2013-11-0755STATUS REPORT by Federal Bureau of Investigation, United States Department of Justice. (Deiss, Ila) (Filed on 11/7/2013) (Entered: 11/07/2013)
2013-11-0756STATUS REPORT Plaintiff's Supplemental Status Report by Seth Rosenfeld. (Stein, Benjamin) (Filed on 11/7/2013) (Entered: 11/07/2013)
2013-11-0857STATUS REPORT ORDER - Status Report due by 12/31/2013. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 11/8/2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2013) (Entered: 11/08/2013)
2013-11-0858Filed in error - please disregard. (Entered: 11/08/2013)
2013-12-3159STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Seth Rosenfeld. (Stein, Benjamin) (Filed on 12/31/2013) (Entered: 12/31/2013)
2014-01-1760STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Seth Rosenfeld. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exh A)(Stein, Benjamin) (Filed on 1/17/2014) (Entered: 01/17/2014)
2014-01-2361ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Settlement. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/23/2014. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2014) (Entered: 01/23/2014)
2014-01-24CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte for Settlement (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2014) (Entered: 01/24/2014)
2014-02-0562Order Setting Settlement Conference before Magistrate Judge Settlement Conference set for 3/26/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 2/5/14. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2014) (Entered: 02/05/2014)
2014-03-2763Minute Entry: Settlement Conference- case did not settle. (Date Filed: 3/27/2014). Further Settlement Conference set for 6/11/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Court Reporter N/A.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/27/2014) (Entered: 03/27/2014)
2014-04-24CLERKS NOTICE RE: CHAMBERS COPIES This is a text-only entry. There is no document associated with this notice The parties are hereby advised that they do not need to submit chambers copies, with the exception of documents that (1) are related to a pending motion and/or discovery dispute and (2) exceed 10 pages when combined. (For example, if there is a 20-page stipulation and proposed order, no chambers copy is required.) For these documents only, the submitting party shall comply with Civil Local Rule 5-1(e)(7). All chambers copies should be double-sided (when possible) and include (1) the ECF running header at the top of each page, and (2) exhibits, if any, that are clearly delineated with tabbed dividers. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2014) (Entered: 04/24/2014)
2014-06-1264Minute Entry: Further Settlement Conference conducted by Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on June 10, 2014 (Date Filed: 6/12/2014). (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/12/2014) Modified on 11/3/2014 (shyS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/12/2014)
2014-06-1265NOTICE AND ORDER Setting Further Settlement Conference by Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Further Settlement Conference set for 8/7/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Updated confidential settlement conference statements shall be lodged with the Court by July 28, 2014. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2014) (Entered: 06/12/2014)
2014-06-12Set/Reset Hearing Settlement Conference set for 8/7/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2014) (Entered: 06/12/2014)
2014-08-0866Minute Entry: Settlement Conference conducted by Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 8/7/14 (Date Filed: 8/8/2014). (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/8/2014) (Entered: 08/08/2014)
2014-11-0467NOTICE of Further Settlement Conference and Settlement Conference Order by Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Further Settlement Conference set for 1/7/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco.(shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2014) (Entered: 11/04/2014)
2015-01-0868Minute Entry for settlement conference conducted by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 1/7/2015. The parties have a tentative settlement and will have a final written signed agreement by 1/16/2015. Plaintiff Attorney: Ben Stein. Defendant Attorney: Illa C. Deiss. This is a text only Minute Entry (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/8/2015) (Entered: 01/08/2015)
2015-01-2869STATUS REPORT ORDER: Status Report due by 2/5/2015. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/28/2015. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2015) (Entered: 01/28/2015)
2015-02-0570STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Seth Rosenfeld. (Stein, Benjamin) (Filed on 2/5/2015) (Entered: 02/05/2015)
2015-03-0571CLERK'S NOTICE A hearing regarding settlement agreement is set for 3/10/2015 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. This is a text only docket entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2015) Modified on 3/10/2015 (shyS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/05/2015)
2015-03-1072Minute Entry for proceedings held on 3/10/2015 before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte regarding the parties' settlement agreement. A recitation that pertains to the settlement agreement is placed on the record. (Court Reporter Name: Lydia Zinn) Plaintiff Attorney :Ben Stein Defendant Attorney: Ila Deiss This is a text only Minute Entry (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/10/2015) (Entered: 03/10/2015)
2015-03-1373TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Seth Rosenfeld for Court Reporter Lydia Zinn. (Stein, Benjamin) (Filed on 3/13/2015) (Entered: 03/13/2015)
2015-04-0674Transcript of Proceedings held on 3/10/2015, before Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn, Telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 73 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/6/2015. (Related documents(s) 73 ) (Zinn, Lydia) (Filed on 4/6/2015) (Entered: 04/06/2015)
2015-04-2275STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation of Dismissal; [Proposed] Order filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation, United States Department of Justice. (Deiss, Ila) (Filed on 4/22/2015) (Entered: 04/22/2015)
2015-04-2376ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 75 Stipulation of Dismissal. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2015) (Entered: 04/23/2015)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff