Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleOSM MEDIA, LLC v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2011cv01151
Date Filed2011-06-22
Date Closed2012-01-23
JudgeJudge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
PlaintiffOSM MEDIA, LLC
doing business as PAJAMAS MEDIA AND PJTV
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2011-06-221COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616039901) filed by OSM MEDIA, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jf, ) (Entered: 06/23/2011)
2011-06-22SUMMONS (3) Issued as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jf, ) (Entered: 06/23/2011)
2011-06-222LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests NONE by OSM MEDIA, LLC (jf, ) (Entered: 06/23/2011)
2011-06-233ORDER Establishing Procedures for Electronic Filing for Cases Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly, signed on June 23, 2011. (SM) (Entered: 06/23/2011)
2011-06-284RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/27/2011. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/27/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 06/28/2011)
2011-06-285RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE served on 6/27/2011, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 6/27/2011. (See Docket Entry 4 to view document). (znmw, ) (Entered: 06/29/2011)
2011-06-296RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 06/27/11. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 06/29/2011)
2011-07-087NOTICE of Appearance by Laurie J. Weinstein on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE (Weinstein, Laurie) (Entered: 07/08/2011)
2011-07-278ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE.(Weinstein, Laurie) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
2011-08-039ORDER. The parties shall confer and propose a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule should address the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, etc. The parties shall file the schedule not later than August 12, 2011. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on August 3, 2011. (lcckk1) (Entered: 08/03/2011)
2011-08-1210STATUS REPORT by the Parties by OSM MEDIA, LLC, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Weinstein, Laurie) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
2011-08-12MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to the Parties' request in the Joint Status Report filed on August 12, 2011, the Parties shall file a further Joint Status by no later than September 20, 2011. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on August 12, 2011. (SM) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
2011-09-2011STATUS REPORT (JOINT) by OSM MEDIA, LLC, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Weinstein, Laurie) (Entered: 09/20/2011)
2011-10-12MINUTE ORDER (paperless) Pursuant to the Parties' request in the Joint Status Report filed on September 20, 2011, the Parties shall file a further Joint Status by no later than October 20, 2011.Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on October 12, 2011. (SM) (Entered: 10/12/2011)
2011-10-2012STATUS REPORT and Proposed Scheduling Order by OSM MEDIA, LLC, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Weinstein, Laurie) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
2011-10-2013SCHEDULING AND PROCEDURES ORDER. The parties shall adhere to the following schedule: Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment shall be due on or before November 21, 2011; Plaintiff's Opposition shall be due on or before December 22, 2011; Defendant's Reply shall be due on or before January 5, 2012. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 10/20/11. (lcckk2) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
2011-10-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Summary Judgment motions due by 11/21/2011. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 12/22/2011. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 1/5/2012. (dot ) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
2011-11-2114Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Scheduling Order by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE (Weinstein, Laurie) (Entered: 11/21/2011)
2011-11-21MINUTE ORDER (paperless). Upon consideration of Defendant's 14 Consent Motion to Amend Scheduling Order, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall have up to and including December 5, 2011 to file its Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's Opposition shall be due no later than January 9, 2012. Defendant's Reply shall be due no later than January 23, 2012. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 11/21/11. (lcckk2) (Entered: 11/21/2011)
2011-12-0515Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Brief by Two Days by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE (Weinstein, Laurie) (Entered: 12/05/2011)
2011-12-05MINUTE ORDER (paperless). Before the Court is Defendant's 15 Consent Motion for Two Additional Days for Defendant to File its Brief. Defendant's Motion is hereby GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Defendant shall have up to and including December 6, 2011 in which to file its Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's opposition shall be due no later than January 10, 2012. Defendant's Reply shall be due no later than January 24, 2012. NO FURTHER EXTENSIONS SHALL BE GRANTED. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 12/5/11. (lcckk2) (Entered: 12/05/2011)
2011-12-0616MOTION for Summary Judgment by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Exhibit A Rodgers Declaration, # 3 Exhibit B Final Letter September 9, 2011, # 4 Exhibit C Ulmer Declaration, # 5 Exhibit D Exhibits to Ulmer Declaration)(Weinstein, Laurie) (Entered: 12/06/2011)
2012-01-0917Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings to Finalize Settlement by OSM MEDIA, LLC, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE (Weinstein, Laurie) (Entered: 01/09/2012)
2012-01-09MINUTE ORDER (paperless). Upon consideration of the parties' 17 Joint Motion to Stay Proceedings, the parties' motion is hereby GRANTED. This case is stayed until January 23, 2012 to allow the parties time to reach a possible settlement, including as to the issue of attorney's fees. If the parties fail to reach a settlement, Plaintiff shall file its opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by no later than January 23, 2012. Defendant's reply shall be due no later than February 6, 2012. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 1/9/12. (lcckk2) (Entered: 01/09/2012)
2012-01-2318STIPULATION of Dismissal by OSM MEDIA, LLC, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 01/23/2012)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff