Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAmerican Civil Liberties Union of Northern California et al v. U.S. Food and Drug Administration
DistrictNorthern District of California
CitySan Francisco
Case Number3:2011cv03949
Date Filed2011-08-11
Date Closed2012-07-05
JudgeHon. Samuel Conti
PlaintiffAmerican Civil Liberties Union of Northern California
PlaintiffBay Guardian
DefendantU.S. Food and Drug Administration
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Opinion/Order [16]
Opinion/Order [20]
Opinion/Order [22]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2011-08-111COMPLAINT; summons issued against U.S. Food and Drug Administration (Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 34611063324). Filed by American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California, Bay Guardian. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2011) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
2011-08-112Certificate of Interested Entities or Persons by American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California, Bay Guardian. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2011) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
2011-08-113Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California, Bay Guardian. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2011) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
2011-08-114ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 11/11/2011. Case Management Conference set for 11/18/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2011) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
2011-08-175Statement by Plaintiff Bay Guardian of Non-Governmental Party Disclosure by American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California, Bay Guardian. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Leong, Shannon) (Filed on 8/17/2011) (Entered: 08/17/2011)
2011-08-236CLERKS NOTICE To Plaintiff re: Consent or Declination. Form due by 9/6/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2011) (Entered: 08/23/2011)
2011-08-237Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by U.S. Food and Drug Administration. (Deiss, Ila) (Filed on 8/23/2011) (Entered: 08/23/2011)
2011-08-24***Deadlines terminated. Initial cmc date of 11/18/11 before Judge Spero. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2011) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
2011-08-248CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2011) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
2011-08-259ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Hon. Samuel Conti for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case.Signed by Executive Committee on 8/25/11. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2011) (Entered: 08/25/2011)
2011-08-2910CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 11/29/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2011) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
2011-08-3111SUMMONS Returned Executed (FOIA) by American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California, Bay Guardian. U.S. Food and Drug Administration served on 8/15/2011, answer due 9/14/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Leong, Shannon) (Filed on 8/31/2011) (Entered: 08/31/2011)
2011-09-0112STIPULATION re 1 Complaint, Stipulation to Extend Answer Date Pursuant to Civil L.R. 6-1(a) by U.S. Food and Drug Administration. (Deiss, Ila) (Filed on 9/1/2011) (Entered: 09/01/2011)
2011-09-0713CLERKS NOTICE re Motion to Relate Cases: The Court has reviewed the motion and has determined that no cases are related and no reassignments shall occur. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2011) (Entered: 09/07/2011)
2011-10-1414Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint for Injunctive Relief Under the Freedom of Information Act byU.S. Food and Drug Administration. (Deiss, Ila) (Filed on 10/14/2011) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
2011-11-2215JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT ; and [Proposed] Order filed by U.S. Food and Drug Administration. (Deiss, Ila) (Filed on 11/22/2011) (Entered: 11/22/2011)
2011-11-2816STIPULATION AND ORDER Cross Motions for Summary Judgment Hearing set for 5/4/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti.. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 11/28/11. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2011) (Entered: 11/28/2011)
2012-02-1017STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 16 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings, Stipulation and Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings Stipulated Request for an Order Extend Dates Pursuant to Civil L.R. 6-2; and [Proposed] Order filed by U.S. Food and Drug Administration. (Deiss, Ila) (Filed on 2/10/2012) (Entered: 02/10/2012)
2012-02-1018ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting 17 Stipulation extending dates for cross motions for summary judgment (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2012) (Entered: 02/10/2012)
2012-02-10Set/Reset Deadlines as to Cross Motion for Summary Judgment Hearing set for 7/6/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2012) (Entered: 02/10/2012)
2012-03-1419STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 18 Order on Stipulation Stipulated Request to Vacate Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date and Set A Further Case Management Conference; and [Proposed] Order filed by U.S. Food and Drug Administration. (Deiss, Ila) (Filed on 3/14/2012) (Entered: 03/14/2012)
2012-03-1420STIPULATION AND ORDER Vacating Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date and Setting a Further Case Management Conference for 7/27/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti.. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 3/14/12. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2012) (Entered: 03/14/2012)
2012-07-0321STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by U.S. Food and Drug Administration. (Deiss, Ila) (Filed on 7/3/2012) (Entered: 07/03/2012)
2012-07-0522SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 7/5/12. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2012) (Entered: 07/05/2012)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff