Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleThe New York Times Company et al v. Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2009cv02645
Date Filed2009-03-23
Date Closed2009-11-30
JudgeJudge Naomi Reice Buchwald
PlaintiffThe New York Times Company
PlaintiffTimothy O'Brien
PlaintiffJo Becker
DefendantBoard of Governors of the Federal Reserve System
DefendantThe United States Department of Treasury
TERMINATED: 04/22/2009
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2009-03-231COMPLAINT against Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System, The United States Department of Treasury. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 682272)Document filed by The New York Times Company, Timothy O'Brien, Jo Becker.(ama) (Entered: 03/26/2009)
2009-03-23SUMMONS ISSUED as to Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System, The United States Department of Treasury, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (ama) (Entered: 03/26/2009)
2009-03-23Magistrate Judge Theodore H. Katz is so designated. (ama) (Entered: 03/26/2009)
2009-03-23Case Designated ECF. (ama) (Entered: 03/26/2009)
2009-03-232RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by The New York Times Company.(ama) (Entered: 03/26/2009)
2009-04-053NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Tara Marie La Morte on behalf of The United States Department of Treasury (La Morte, Tara) (Entered: 04/05/2009)
2009-04-204STIPULATION AND ORDER OF SEVERANCE that pursuant to FRCP 20 and 21, the NYT's action against the Treasury Department is severed from the NYT's action against the Federal Reserve. The respective captions of the severed actions shall be amended accordingly. The NYT has 14 days from the date of this Stipulation and Order of Severance is docketed to file an amended complaint in each of the severed actions. The Federal Reserve 's and The Treasury Department's time to respond to the NYT's amended complaint is extended to 14 days from when the NYT files its amended complaint. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 4/20/09) (cd) (Entered: 04/21/2009)
2009-04-225FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 1 Complaint against Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System. Document filed by The New York Times Company, Timothy O'Brien, Jo Becker. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by The New York Times Company, Timothy O'Brien, Jo Becker.(dle) (dle). (Entered: 04/22/2009)
2009-05-066ANSWER to Amended Complaint. Document filed by Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System. Related document: 5 Amended Complaint, filed by The New York Times Company, Timothy O'Brien, Jo Becker.(Wheatley, Katherine) (Entered: 05/06/2009)
2009-05-157NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 6/3/2009 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 21A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 5/12/09) (tro) (Entered: 05/15/2009)
2009-06-018NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Yvonne Facchina Mizusawa on behalf of Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System (Mizusawa, Yvonne) (Entered: 06/01/2009)
2009-06-089ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from David E. McCraw dated 6/3/2009 re: I write on behalf of both parties in the above referenced matter. In light of the stipulation, we ask that the Court adjourn the initial pretrial conference set for Wednesday, June 3, 2009 at 3:00 p.m. However, we respectfully request that the Court set a new date for a conference the week of August 3, 2009 so, in the event that the stipulation does not resolve the litigation, the parties can raise any outstanding issues at that time. ENDORSEMENT: A conference if necessary is set for August 12, 2009 at 3:00 p.m. SO ORDERED. ( Status Conference set for 8/12/2009 at 03:00 PM before Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald.) (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 6/4/2009) (jmi) Modified on 6/8/2009 (jmi). (Entered: 06/08/2009)
2009-06-0810STIPULATION AND ORDER By June 12, 2009, the Board will respond in full. subject to the exemptions and redactions permitted by FOIA. to NYT "FOIA Request No.3" (set forth in Para. 21 of the Complaint) and designated Request #273 by the Board. The Board will begin producing documents to NYT, subject to the exemptions and redactions permitted by FOIA, that are responsive to NYT "FOIA Request No. I" (set forth in Para. 12 of the Complaint) and designated Request #129 by the Board, within the next seven days and will complete its response to this request by July 20,2009. SO ORDERED ( Responses due by 7/20/2009) (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 6/4/2009) (jmi) (Entered: 06/08/2009)
2009-07-2911MOTION for John L. Kuray to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System.(dle) (Entered: 07/29/2009)
2009-08-0512ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION, granting 11 Motion for John L. Kuray to Appear Pro Hac Vice as counsel for the Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 7/30/09) (pl) (Entered: 08/05/2009)
2009-08-05Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: 12 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (pl) (Entered: 08/05/2009)
2009-08-0713ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from John L. Kuray dated 8/5/09 re: Counsel for the Defendant request an adjournment of the initial pretrial conference currently scheduled for 8/12/09, at 3:00 p.m. until the week of 9/7/09. ENDORSEMENT: The conference is adjourned to September 10, 2009 at 4:30 pm. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 8/6/09) (tro) (Entered: 08/07/2009)
2009-09-0814ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi R. Buchwald from John L. Kuray dated 9/3/2009 re: Counsel writes on behalf of defendant Board of Government of the Federal Reserve System (the "Board'') to request an adjournment to the week of October 12, 2009 of the initial pretrial conference currently set for September 10,2009, at 4:30 p.m. in the above-captioned matter. ENDORSEMENT: The conference is adjourned until 10/16/2009 at 4 p.m. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 9/8/2009) (tve) (Entered: 09/09/2009)
2009-11-3015ORDER: This action shall be dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs and fees; provided, however, that either side may apply to this Court within 30 days of the date of the final determination of the 13(3) Issues for restoration of this action as to the 12(3) Issues to the Court's calendar. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this case. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 11/30/09) (tro) (Entered: 11/30/2009)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff