Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleThe New York Times Company et al v. The United States Department of Treasury
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2009cv03993
Date Filed2009-04-22
Date Closed2009-11-17
JudgeJudge Naomi Reice Buchwald
PlaintiffThe New York Times Company
PlaintiffTimothy O'Brien
PlaintiffJo Becker
DefendantThe United States Department of Treasury
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2009-04-222FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against The United States Department of Treasury. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 686059)Document filed by The New York Times Company, Timothy O'Brien, Jo Becker.(rdz) Modified on 4/22/2009 (rw). Modified on 4/22/2009 (kkc). Modified on 4/22/2009 (kkc). Modified on 4/22/2009 (kkc). (rw). (Entered: 04/22/2009)
2009-04-22SUMMONS ISSUED as to The United States Department of Treasury, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (rdz) (Entered: 04/22/2009)
2009-04-22CASE REFERRED TO Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald as possibly Related to 09-cv-2645. (rdz) (Entered: 04/22/2009)
2009-04-22Case Designated ECF. (rdz) (Entered: 04/22/2009)
2009-04-223RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by The New York Times Company, Timothy O'Brien, Jo Becker.(rdz) Modified on 4/22/2009 (kkc). Modified on 4/22/2009 (kkc). (Entered: 04/22/2009)
2009-04-221STIPULATION AND ORDER OF SEVERANCE that pursuant to FRCP 20 and 21, the NYT's action against the Treasury Department is severed from the NYT's action against the Federal Reserve. The respective captions of the severed actions shall be amended accordingly. The NYT has 14 days from the date of this Stipulation and Order of Severance is docketed to file an amended complaint in each of the severed actions. The Federal Reserve 's and The Treasury Department's time to respond to the NYT's amended complaint is extended to 14 days from when the NYT files its amended complaint. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 4/20/09). Originally filed on 4/20/2009 as document number 4 in 09 cv 2645 (NRB). (rw) Modified on 4/22/2009 (kkc). (Entered: 04/22/2009)
2009-04-30CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:09-cv-02645-NRB. Notice of Assignment to follow. (ldi) (Entered: 04/30/2009)
2009-04-304NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (ldi) (Entered: 04/30/2009)
2009-04-30Magistrate Judge Theodore H. Katz is so designated. (ldi) (Entered: 04/30/2009)
2009-05-065ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by The United States Department of Treasury.(La Morte, Tara) (Entered: 05/06/2009)
2009-05-156NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 6/3/2009 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 21A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 5/12/09) (tro) (Entered: 05/15/2009)
2009-06-087ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from David E. McCraw dated 6/3/2009 re: I write on behalf of both plaintiffs and defendant in the above-referenced action. Pursuant to the direction of chambers, we are submitting this letter requesting that Your Honor adjourn the initial pretrial conference set for Wednesday, June 3, 2009 at 3:30 p.m. and reschedule the conference for the week of July 20, 2009. ENDORSEMENT: A conference if necessary is scheduled for July 21, 2009 at 3:00 p.m. SO ORDERED. ( Status Conference set for 7/21/2009 at 03:00 PM before Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald.) (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 6/4/2009) (jmi) (Entered: 06/08/2009)
2009-07-178ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Tara M. LaMorte dated 7/15/2009 re: I am the Assistant United States Attorney assigned to represent the United States Department of the Treasury in the above-captioned action, brought by the New York Company, Timothy O'Brien, and Jo Beckerd pursuant to the Freedom of Information Act, 5 U.S.C. 552. I write respectfully on behalf of both the Times and Treasury to seek an adjournment of the status conference that is current set for July 21, 2009, at 3:30 p.m. The parties respectfully request that the conference be rescheduled for the week of August 17, 2009. ENDORSEMENT: The Conference is adjourned until August 17, 2009 at 4:00 pm. SO ORDERED. ( Status Conference set for 8/17/2009 at 04:00 PM before Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald.) (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 7/17/2009) (jmi) (Entered: 07/17/2009)
2009-08-189ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from David E. McCraw dated 8/11/2009 re: Requesting that the initial conference currently scheduled for August 17, 2009 be adjourned until September 16, 17, or 18, 2009. ENDORSEMENT: The conference is adjourned until September 22, 2009 at 4:30 p.m. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 8/17/2009) (jpo) (Entered: 08/18/2009)
2009-08-18***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 10 STIPULATION AND ORDER. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (jpo) (Entered: 08/18/2009)
2009-09-22Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald: Initial Conference held on 9/22/2009. (mro) (Entered: 09/30/2009)
2009-09-2310SCHEDULING ORDER: Defendant shall file any motion for summary judgment by 11/25/09; Plaintiff shall file any cross-motion for summary judgment and/or opposition memorandum to Defendant's motion for summary judgment by December 11, 2009; Defendant shall file any opposition to Plaintiff's cross motion for summary judgment and/or reply memorandum in further support of its motion for summary judgment by 12/30/09; Plaintiff shall file any reply memorandum in support of its cross motion for summary judgment by 1/8/10; (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 9/22/09) (djc) (Entered: 09/23/2009)
2009-11-1211FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING FOR NON-ECF DOCUMENT - STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) all defendants and without costs to either party pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by The New York Times Company, Timothy O'Brien, Jo Becker.(McCraw, David) Modified on 11/13/2009 (dt). (Entered: 11/12/2009)
2009-11-13***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO E-MAIL PDF. Note to Attorney David McCraw for noncompliance with Section (18.4) of the S.D.N.Y. Electronic Case Filing Rules & Instructions. E-MAIL the PDF for Document 11 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal, to: judgments@nysd.uscourts.gov. (dt) (Entered: 11/13/2009)
2009-11-1712STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL, that the First Amended Complaint shall be dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a), with each party to bear its own costs and fees. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 11/16/09) (pl) (Entered: 11/17/2009)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff