Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLARDNER v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2009cv00784
Date Filed2009-04-29
Date Closed2009-12-11
JudgeJudge Ellen S. Huvelle
PlaintiffGEORGE LARDNER
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2009-04-291COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616020205) filed by GEORGE LARDNER. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jf, ) (Entered: 05/01/2009)
2009-04-29Summons (2) Issued as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, USA (jf, ) (Entered: 05/01/2009)
2009-05-272Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Natiello, Christian) (Entered: 05/27/2009)
2009-05-27MINUTE ORDER granting 2 defendant's Consent Motion to Enlarge Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint. Defendant shall file its response to plaintiff's complaint on or before June 29, 2009. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 5/27/2009. (VT) (Entered: 05/27/2009)
2009-06-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer/Response to complaint due by 6/29/2009. (gdf) (Entered: 06/01/2009)
2009-06-263Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Natiello, Christian) (Entered: 06/26/2009)
2009-06-29MINUTE ORDER granting 3 defendant's Consent Motion to Enlarge Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint. Defendant shall file its response to the complaint on or before July 13, 2009. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 6/29/2009. (VT) (Entered: 06/29/2009)
2009-07-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer/Response to complaint due by 7/13/2009, (gdf) (Entered: 07/01/2009)
2009-07-134NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret B. Kwoka on behalf of GEORGE LARDNER (Kwoka, Margaret) (Entered: 07/13/2009)
2009-07-135ANSWER to 1 Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by GEORGE LARDNER.(Natiello, Christian) (Entered: 07/13/2009)
2009-07-17MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall submit a proposed briefing schedule by August 14, 2009. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 07/17/2009. (lcesh1) (Entered: 07/17/2009)
2009-07-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed briefing schedule due by 8/14/2009. (gdf) (Entered: 07/21/2009)
2009-08-136NOTICE Proposed Briefing Schedule by GEORGE LARDNER (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kwoka, Margaret) (Entered: 08/13/2009)
2009-08-177ORDERED; Proposed Briefing Schedule; Vaughn Index due by 10/5/2009. Dispositive Motions due by 11/2/2009. Opposition and Cross Motions due by 11/30/2009. Opposition and Reply due by 12/21/2009. Reply due by 1/15/2010.. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 8/13/2009. (tr) (Entered: 08/18/2009)
2009-08-31Set/Reset Deadlines: Cross Motions due by 11/30/2009. Response to Cross Motions due by 12/21/2009. Reply to Cross Motions due by 1/15/2010. (gdf) (Entered: 08/31/2009)
2009-09-248Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Vaughn Index by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Natiello, Christian) (Entered: 09/24/2009)
2009-09-25MINUTE ORDER granting 8 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Vaughn Index. Defendant shall file its Vaughn index on or before October 23, 2009. It is further ordered that dispositive motions shall be filed on or before November 20, 2009; that an Opposition and Cross-motion shall be filed on or before December 18, 2009; that an Opposition and a Reply shall be filed onor before January 8, 2010, and that a Reply shall be filed on or before February 2, 2010. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on September 25, 2009. (AG) (Entered: 09/25/2009)
2009-09-25Set/Reset Deadlines: Vaughn Index due by 10/23/2009. Dispositive Motions due by 11/20/2009. Opposition and Cross Motions due by 12/18/2009. Opposition and Reply due by 1/8/2010. Reply due by 2/2/2010. (tr) (Entered: 09/25/2009)
2009-10-209Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File A Vaughn Index by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Natiello, Christian) (Entered: 10/20/2009)
2009-10-20MINUTE ORDER granting 9 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to file Vaughn Index and alter other deadlines: Defendant shall file its Vaughn index on or before November 20, 2009; Dispositive motions shall be filed on or before December 18, 2009; Oppositions and Cross-motions shall be filed on or before January 15, 2010; Oppositions to Cross-motions and Replies shall be filed on or before February 5, 2010; and Replies re Cross-motions shall be filed on or before March 5, 2010. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on October 20, 2009. (AG) (Entered: 10/20/2009)
2009-10-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Vaughn Index due by 11/20/2009; Dispositive Motions due by 12/18/2009. Oppositions and Cross-motions due by 1/15/2010. Oppositions to Cross-motions and Replies due by 2/5/2010.. Replies re Cross-motions due by 3/5/2010. (tr) (Entered: 10/20/2009)
2009-11-1910Consent MOTION to Dispense with the Need to File a Vaughn Index by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Natiello, Christian) (Entered: 11/19/2009)
2009-11-20MINUTE ORDER granting 10 defendant's consent motion to dispense with need to file Vaughn Index. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on November 20, 2009. (AG) (Entered: 11/20/2009)
2009-12-0811NOTICE of Proposed Order (Stipulation of Settlement and Dismissal) by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Natiello, Christian) (Entered: 12/08/2009)
2009-12-0912STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT AND DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 12/08/09. (gdf) (Entered: 12/11/2009)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff