Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleTALBOT et al v. CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2007cv00277
Date Filed2007-02-06
Date Closed2010-02-23
JudgeJudge Richard J. Leon
PlaintiffDAVID TALBOT
PlaintiffJEFFERSON MORLEY
Case DescriptionDavid Talbot, a journalist, submitted a FOIA request to the CIA for records concerning George Joannides, David Morales, and Gordon Campbell. The CIA told Talbot that because two of his attorney's former clients had not paid assessed fees, the agency would not process Talbot's request. The attorney paid the fees and Talbot resubmitted his request. Talbot asked for expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agency denied his request for expedited processing. Talbot then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Expedited processing, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantCENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
AppealD.C. Circuit 09-5393
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Opinion/Order [34]
FOIA Project Annotation: Judge Richard Leon has ruled that the State Department properly invoked Exemption 1 (national security) and Exemption 3 (other statutes) to withhold passport applications filed for aliases used by two former CIA agents who were tangentially involved in operations encompassed by the JFK Assassination Records Act. The agency claimed disclosure could cause damage to the national security and also claimed that Section 403-10(i)(1) of the National Security Act, allowing protection of CIA sources and methods, also applied. Leon agreed with both exemption claims. He then dismissed David Talbot's argument that the records had been officially confirmed because the CIA had released a number of aliases used by the two agents under the JFK Records Act. Leon pointed out that "mention by the CIA of a passport using an alias does not establish the existence or non-existence of State Department records under that alias. Indeed, one agency's acknowledgment of a document (no matter its origin) does not constitute an official disclosure sufficient to negate the other agency's invocation of a FOIA exemption." He also concluded that, because Talbot was asking for all aliases used by the two agents, the request was broader than the information released under the JFK Act. He noted that "such a broad request has neither the specificity, nor the sameness, required . . . Simply stated, because the plaintiffs are seeking from the State Department more information than was publicly released by another agency (as part of the JFK Act or otherwise), the Department's asserted exemptions apply, and plaintiffs' request must be denied."
Issues: Exemption 1 - Harm to national security, Exemption 3 - Limited agency discretion
Opinion/Order [48]
FOIA Project Annotation: Judge Richard Leon has ruled that neither Jefferson Morley nor David Talbot, both journalists who sued the CIA and other agencies for information about former CIA agents who they believed had a tangential involvement in the assassinations of John and Robert Kennedy are eligible for costs for their suit. Leon ruled in favor of the State Department in September 2008 and Talbot and Morley moved for voluntary dismissal of their litigation in January 2009, asking for $378.98 in costs under Rule 54(d)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. To recover costs, however, the two had to show that they had a statutory entitlement under FOIA. Leon began his analysis by indicating that the suit was brought while Buckhannon was still the standard in the D.C. Circuit, which required a plaintiff to show a court ruling in his or her favor in order to be considered the prevailing party. Noting that there was some uncertainty whether the attorneys' fees provisions in the OPEN Government Act rejecting the Buckhannon standard for the catalyst theory, which provides for a fee award if the litigation caused the government to change its position, applied retroactively, Leon pointed out that in Summers v. Dept of Justice, 569 F.3d 500 (D.C. Cir. 2009), "that issue was resolved. . .when our Circuit Court held it was not retroactive." Leon then considered whether either litigant had substantially prevailed under the Buckhannon standard. Finding that neither had prevailed, he noted that "not only did Morley not obtain any favorable relief from this Court, he actually lost a judgment on the merits when the Court granted the State Department's motion to dismiss his action. And as for Talbot, he filed the instant motion for voluntary dismissal without ever obtaining a judgment, or consent decree, in his favor."
Issues: Litigation - Recovery of Costs
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2007-02-061COMPLAINT against CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 4616002117.)filed by DAVID TALBOT, JEFFERSON MORLEY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(jf, ) (Entered: 02/07/2007)
2007-02-06SUMMONS (4) Issued as to CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jf, ) (Entered: 02/07/2007)
2007-02-062MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by DAVID TALBOT, JEFFERSON MORLEY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Delcaration of James H. Lesar)(jf, ) (Entered: 02/07/2007)
2007-02-07Set/Reset Hearings: Temporary Restraining Order Motion Hearing set for 2/7/2007 02:30 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (whb) (Entered: 02/07/2007)
2007-02-07Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon : Motion Hearing held on 2/7/2007 re 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by JEFFERSON MORLEY,, DAVID TALBOT,. Temporary Restraining Oder-Denied. (Court Reporter Catherine Jones.) (whb) (Entered: 02/07/2007)
2007-02-07MINUTE ORDER denying 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 2/7/07. (lcrjl1) (Entered: 02/07/2007)
2007-02-133NOTICE of Appearance by Rhonda C. Fields on behalf of CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Fields, Rhonda) (Entered: 02/13/2007)
2007-02-224ENTERED IN ERROR.....Amended Complaint ANSWER to Complaint by DAVID TALBOT, JEFFERSON MORLEY. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by JEFFERSON MORLEY,, DAVID TALBOT,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1--JHL-Koch (061207)# 2 Exhibit 2--Koch-JHL (071215)# 3 Exhibit 3--JHL-Koch (071223)# 4 Exhibit 4--JHL-Koch (070112)# 5 Exhibit 5--Koch-JHL (070123)# 6 Exhibit 6--JHL-Koch (070221)# 7 Exhibit 7--JHL-DOS (070112)# 8 Exhibit 8--Postal receipt# 9 Exhibit 9--JHL-DOS (070221))(Lesar, James) Modified on 2/22/2007 (jf, ). (Entered: 02/22/2007)
2007-02-22NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re 4 Answer to Complaint,, was entered in error and counsel was instructed to send pdf documents to the Court's e-mail website (dcd_cmecf@dcd.uscourts.gov) for proper filing.(jf, ) (Entered: 02/22/2007)
2007-02-225FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE filed by DAVID TALBOT, JEFFERSON MORLEY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7# 8 Exhibit 8# 9 Exhibit 9)(nmw, ) (Entered: 02/23/2007)
2007-03-136ANSWER to Amended Complaint by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. Related document: 5 Amended Complaint, filed by JEFFERSON MORLEY, DAVID TALBOT.(Fields, Rhonda) (Entered: 03/13/2007)
2007-06-01MINUTE ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to submit a joint proposed scheduling order pursuant at LCvR 16.3 by June 15, 2007. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 6/1/07. (lcrjl1) (Entered: 06/01/2007)
2007-06-017STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 6/1/2007. (CMcP, ) (Entered: 06/01/2007)
2007-06-158STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by DAVID TALBOT, JEFFERSON MORLEY. (Lesar, James) (Entered: 06/15/2007)
2007-06-169MOTION to Produce Nonexempt Materials on or Before July 22, 2007 by DAVID TALBOT, JEFFERSON MORLEY (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1--Lesar-Allen (070423))(Lesar, James) (Entered: 06/16/2007)
2007-07-0210Memorandum in opposition to re 9 MOTION to Produce Nonexempt Materials on or Before July 22, 2007 filed by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Ward Dec# 2 Talbot Declaration Exhibit A# 3 Talbot Declaration Exhibit B# 4 order op open)(Fields, Rhonda) (Entered: 07/02/2007)
2007-07-0211MOTION to Stay , Open America by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Ward Dec# 2 Talbot Declaration Exhibit A# 3 Talbot Declaration Exhibit B.# 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Fields, Rhonda) (Entered: 07/02/2007)
2007-07-0212Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 9 MOTION to Produce Nonexempt Materials on or Before July 22, 2007 by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fields, Rhonda) (Entered: 07/02/2007)
2007-07-05MINUTE ORDER granting 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 9 MOTION to Produce Nonexempt Materials on or Before July 22, 2007. It is hereby ORDERED that defendant shall file its response to plaintiffs' motion to produce by July 16, 2007. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 7/5/07. (lcrjl1) (Entered: 07/05/2007)
2007-07-1613Memorandum in opposition to re 9 MOTION to Produce Nonexempt Materials on or Before July 22, 2007 filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Fields, Rhonda) (Entered: 07/16/2007)
2007-07-1814MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant Central Intelligence Agency's Motion for an Open America Stay by DAVID TALBOT, JEFFERSON MORLEY (Lesar, James) (Entered: 07/18/2007)
2007-07-19MINUTE ORDER granting 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant Central Intelligence Agency's Motion for an Open America Stay. It is hereby ORDERED that plaintiffs submit their opposition to defendant CIA's motion to stay proceedings by July 19, 2007. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 7/19/07. (lcrjl1) (Entered: 07/19/2007)
2007-07-1915Memorandum in opposition to re 11 MOTION to Stay , Open America filed by DAVID TALBOT, JEFFERSON MORLEY. (Attachments: # 1 )(Lesar, James) (Entered: 07/19/2007)
2007-07-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Plainitff's opposition to Defendant CIA's motion to stay proceeding due by 7/19/2007. (whb) (Entered: 07/20/2007)
2007-07-3116REPLY to opposition to motion re 11 MOTION to Stay , Open America filed by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Koch Dec)(Fields, Rhonda) (Entered: 07/31/2007)
2007-08-06SCHEDULING ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that a status conference is set for 8/21/2007 at 11:30 a.m. in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 8/6/07. (lcrjl1) (Entered: 08/06/2007)
2007-08-0617MOTION for Extension of Time to file dispositive motion by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fields, Rhonda) (Entered: 08/06/2007)
2007-08-0818RESPONSE to 17 Motion of Defendandant Departament of State to File Dispositive Motion filed by DAVID TALBOT, JEFFERSON MORLEY. (Lesar, James) Modified on 8/9/2007 (td, ). (Entered: 08/08/2007)
2007-08-20MINUTE ORDER granting 17 Defendant Department of State's Motion for Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED that dispositive motions shall be filed on or before September 20, 2007. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 8/20/07. (lcrjl1) (Entered: 08/20/2007)
2007-08-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant Department of State Dispositive Motions due by 9/20/2007. (whb) (Entered: 08/21/2007)
2007-08-21Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon : Status Conference held on 8/21/2007. (Court Reporter Patty Gels.) (whb) (Entered: 08/21/2007)
2007-08-21MINUTE ORDER denying 9 Motion to Produce All Nonexempt Records. It is hereby ORDERED that plaintiffs' motion to require defendants to release all nonexempt records is DENIED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 8/21/07. (lcrjl1) (Entered: 08/21/2007)
2007-08-21MINUTE ORDER granting 11 Motion for an Open America Stay. It is hereby ORDERED that defendant CIA's motion for an Open America stay is GRANTED through December 2007 and that the defendant CIA shall file status reports on October 15, 2007 and December 15, 2007. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 8/21/07. (lcrjl1) (Entered: 08/21/2007)
2007-09-2019MOTION for Summary Judgment by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Grafeld Dec# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Fields, Rhonda) (Entered: 09/20/2007)
2007-10-0320MOTION to Continue Response to Dept. of State's Mot. for Summary Judgment Pending Completion of Discvoery by DAVID TALBOT, JEFFERSON MORLEY (Lesar, James) (Entered: 10/03/2007)
2007-10-1221STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Fields, Rhonda) (Entered: 10/12/2007)
2007-11-05MINUTE ORDER denying 20 Plaintiffs' Motion for a Continuance of Their Response to Defendant Department of State's Motion for Summary Judgment Pending Completion of Discovery. It is hereby ORDERED that defendants' motion for a continuance is DENIED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 11/5/2007. (lcrjl1) (Entered: 11/05/2007)
2007-11-1622Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant Department of Sate's Motion for Summary Judgment by DAVID TALBOT, JEFFERSON MORLEY (Lesar, James) (Entered: 11/16/2007)
2007-11-16MINUTE ORDER granting 22 Motion for Extension of Time to Oppose Defendant Department of State's Motion for Summary Judgment. It is hereby ORDERED that plaintiffs' motion is GRANTED, and plaintiffs have up to and including 11/19/2007 to file a response to the Department of State's motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 11/16/2007. (lcrjl1) (Entered: 11/16/2007)
2007-11-1923MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Defendant U.S. Department of State by DAVID TALBOT, JEFFERSON MORLEY (Attachments: # 1 Local Rule 7.1(h) Statement# 2 Affidavit Morley Declaration# 3 Exhibit Morley Decl., Atta. 1# 4 Exhibit Morley Decl., Att. 2# 5 Exhibit Morley Decl., Att. 3# 6 Exhibit Morley Decl., Att. 4)(Lesar, James) (Entered: 11/19/2007)
2007-11-3024Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 23 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Defendant U.S. Department of State by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fields, Rhonda) (Entered: 11/30/2007)
2007-12-06MINUTE ORDER granting 24 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED and that defendant Department of State has up to and including 12/17/2007 to file its response to plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment and opposition to defendant's motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 12/6/2007. (lcrjl1) (Entered: 12/06/2007)
2007-12-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Cross Motions due by 12/17/2007.,Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 12/17/2007. (whb) (Entered: 12/06/2007)
2007-12-1425STATUS REPORT , Second by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Fields, Rhonda) (Entered: 12/14/2007)
2007-12-1726Memorandum in opposition to re 23 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Defendant U.S. Department of State , 19 MOTION for Summary Judgment Opposition to plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment and reply to plaintiff's opposition to defendant's motion for summary judgment filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Grafeld Dec 2# 2 Reply Ex A [Violet ltr]# 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Fields, Rhonda) (Entered: 12/17/2007)
2007-12-2727Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Reply to Def. Dept. of State's Opp. to Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment by DAVID TALBOT, JEFFERSON MORLEY (Lesar, James) (Entered: 12/27/2007)
2007-12-3128NOTICE of Appearance by Brian P. Hudak on behalf of CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Hudak, Brian) (Entered: 12/31/2007)
2007-12-3129MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hudak, Brian) (Entered: 12/31/2007)
2008-01-03MINUTE ORDER granting 27 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Reply to Defendant Department of State's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. It is hereby ORDERED that plaintiffs motion is GRANTED and that plaintiffs have up to and including 1/16/2008 to reply to defendant's opposition to plaintiffs' pending cross-motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 1/3/2008. (lcrjl1) (Entered: 01/03/2008)
2008-01-03MINUTE ORDER granting 29 Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond. It is hereby ORDERED that defendant Central Intelligence Agency's motion is GRANTED, and that defendant shall have up to and including 1/7/2008 to respond to plaintiff's request concerning Mr. Morales as described in the Second Status Report by the Central Intelligence Agency. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 1/3/2008. (lcrjl1) (Entered: 01/03/2008)
2008-01-09Set/Reset Deadlines: Reply to Cross Motions due by 1/16/2008. (whb) (Entered: 01/09/2008)
2008-01-1630Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Reply to Department of State's Oppositon to Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment by DAVID TALBOT, JEFFERSON MORLEY (Lesar, James) (Entered: 01/16/2008)
2008-01-23MINUTE ORDER granting 30 Unopposed Motion for Further Extension of Time Within Which to Reply to Defendant Department of State's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. It is hereby ORDERED that plaintiffs motion is GRANTED and that plaintiffs shall file their reply to defendant Department of State's opposition to their cross-motion for summary judgment on or before 1/23/2008. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 1/23/2008. (lcrjl1) (Entered: 01/23/2008)
2008-01-2531Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Reply to State Dept's Opposition to Pls' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment by DAVID TALBOT, JEFFERSON MORLEY (Lesar, James) (Entered: 01/25/2008)
2008-02-18MINUTE ORDER granting 31 Unopposed Motion for Further Extension of Time Within Which to Reply to Defendant Department of Stte's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. It is hereby ORDERED that plaintiffs' motion is GRANTED and that plaintiffs reply is due on or before 2/25/2008. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 2/18/2008. (lcrjl1) (Entered: 02/18/2008)
2008-02-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Reply to Cross Motions for summary judgment due by 2/25/2008. (whb) (Entered: 02/19/2008)
2008-02-2532Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to reply to Department of State's opposition to plaintiffs' cross-motion for summary judgment by DAVID TALBOT, JEFFERSON MORLEY (Lesar, James) (Entered: 02/25/2008)
2008-02-2733REPLY to opposition to motion re 19 MOTION for Summary Judgment for Plaintiffs filed by DAVID TALBOT, JEFFERSON MORLEY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Attachment 1, # 2 Exhibit Attachment 2, # 3 Exhibit Attachment 3, # 4 Exhibit Attachment 4, # 5 Exhibit Attachment 5)(Lesar, James) (Entered: 02/27/2008)
2008-03-03MINUTE ORDER granting nunc pro tunc 32 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to reply to Department of State's opposition to plaintiffs' cross-motion for summary judgment by DAVID TALBOT, JEFFERSON MORLEY. It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiffs have up to and including 02/27/2008 to file reply to defendant Department of State's opposition to their cross-motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 03/03/2008. (lcrjl3) (Entered: 03/03/2008)
2008-09-2434MEMORANDUM OPINION granting the State Department's motion for summary judgment and denying the plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 9/23/08. (kc) (Entered: 09/24/2008)
2008-09-2435FINAL JUDGMENT granting defendant U.S. Department of State's Motion 19 for Summary Judgment and denying plaintiff's Cross - Motion 23 for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 9/23/08. (kc) (Entered: 09/24/2008)
2008-10-0636MOTION for Reconsideration of Court's 34 MEMORANDUM OPINION and 35 FINAL JUDGMENT by DAVID TALBOT, JEFFERSON MORLEY (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum of Points and Authorities)(Lesar, James) . (Entered: 10/06/2008)
2008-10-0637MOTION to Strike Declaration of Margaret P. Grafeld by DAVID TALBOT, JEFFERSON MORLEY (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support Memo P&A in Support of Motion to Strike)(Lesar, James) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
2008-10-2038Memorandum in opposition to re 37 MOTION to Strike Declaration of Margaret P. Grafeld , 36 MOTION for Reconsideration of Court's Mem. Op. and Judgment filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fields, Rhonda) (Entered: 10/20/2008)
2008-10-3039MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendant Department of State's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration and Motion to Strike by DAVID TALBOT, JEFFERSON MORLEY (Lesar, James) (Entered: 10/30/2008)
2008-10-31MINUTE ORDER granting nunc pro tunc 39 Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED, and plaintiffs have through and including 11/7/2008 to reply to defendants' opposition to plaintiffs' motion for reconsideration and motion to strike. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 10/31/2008. (lcrjl3) (Entered: 10/31/2008)
2008-11-03Set/Reset Deadlines. plaintiff's Reply to defendants' opposition to plaintiff's motion for reconsideration and motion to strike due by 11/7/2008. (kc) (Entered: 11/03/2008)
2008-11-0740REPLY to opposition to motion re 37 MOTION to Strike Declaration of Margaret P. Grafeld , 36 MOTION for Reconsideration of Court's Mem. Op. and Judgment filed by DAVID TALBOT, JEFFERSON MORLEY. (Lesar, James) (Entered: 11/07/2008)
2008-11-13MINUTE ORDER denying 36 Motion for Reconsideration and denying 37 Motion to Strike. It is hereby ORDERED that the motions are DENIED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 11/13/2008. (lcrjl3) (Entered: 11/13/2008)
2008-11-19Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 1/9/2009 11:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (lcrjl3) (Entered: 11/19/2008)
2008-12-12Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference rescheduled for 1/30/2009 10:30 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (lcrjl3) (Entered: 12/12/2008)
2008-12-1941MOTION for Summary Judgment by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Nelson Dec, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Fields, Rhonda) (Entered: 12/19/2008)
2009-01-0242MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to CIA's Motion for Summary Judgment by DAVID TALBOT, JEFFERSON MORLEY (Lesar, James) (Entered: 01/02/2009)
2009-01-05MINUTE ORDER granting 42 Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED, and plaintiffs have through and including 1/16/09 to respond to defendant Central Intelligence Agency's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 1/5/2009. (lcrjl3) (Entered: 01/05/2009)
2009-01-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Response to defendant Central Intelligence Agency's Motion for Summary Judgment due by 1/16/2009 (kc) (Entered: 01/06/2009)
2009-01-06Minute Entry: Court vacates the status conference set for 1/30/2009 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (lcrjl3) (Entered: 01/06/2009)
2009-01-1643MOTION to Dismiss Action Pursuant to Rule 41 by DAVID TALBOT, JEFFERSON MORLEY (Lesar, James) (Entered: 01/16/2009)
2009-01-2944MOTION for Extension of Time to file opposition by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fields, Rhonda) (Entered: 01/29/2009)
2009-02-02MINUTE ORDER granting 44 Motion for Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED, and defendants have through and including 2/13/09 to file their response to plaintiffs' motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 2/2/2009. (lcrjl3) (Entered: 02/02/2009)
2009-02-04Set/Reset Deadlines: defendants Responses to plaintiffs' motion to dismiss due by 2/13/2009. (kc) (Entered: 02/04/2009)
2009-02-1345Memorandum in opposition to re 43 MOTION to Dismiss Action Pursuant to Rule 41 and for costs filed by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fields, Rhonda) (Entered: 02/13/2009)
2009-02-1346Memorandum in opposition to re 43 MOTION to Dismiss Action Pursuant to Rule 41 and for costs filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fields, Rhonda) (Entered: 02/13/2009)
2009-02-2447REPLY to opposition to motion re 43 MOTION to Dismiss Action Pursuant to Rule 41 filed by DAVID TALBOT, JEFFERSON MORLEY. (Lesar, James) (Entered: 02/24/2009)
2009-09-1748MEMORANDUM OPINION granting plaintiff's motion for voluntary dismissal and denying plaintiffs' motion for costs. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 9/16/09. (kc) (Entered: 09/17/2009)
2009-09-1749FINAL JUDGMENT granting plaintiffs' Motion 43 to Dismiss with prejudice and denying plaintiffs' motion 43 for costs and denying as moot defendant C.I.A.'s Motion 41 for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 9/16/09. (kc) (Entered: 09/17/2009)
2009-11-1550NOTICE OF APPEAL by DAVID TALBOT, JEFFERSON MORLEY. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 00900000000002017584. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Lesar, James) (Entered: 11/15/2009)
2009-11-1651Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid this date re 50 Notice of Appeal. (znmw, ) (Entered: 11/16/2009)
2009-12-2252ORDER of USCA (certified copy) as to 50 Notice of Appeal filed by JEFFERSON MORLEY, DAVID TALBOT ; ORDERED that the clerk note on the docket that this case is dismissed. USCA Case Number 09-5393. (mmh, ) (Entered: 12/28/2009)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff