Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION et al v. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2008cv01157
Date Filed2008-07-01
Date Closed2010-03-26
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffAMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION
PlaintiffAMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
AppealD.C. Circuit 10-5159
AppealD.C. Circuit 10-5167
AppealD.C. Circuit 13-5064
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Opinion/Order [39]
Opinion/Order [66]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2008-07-011COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616013446) filed by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(tg, ) (Entered: 07/03/2008)
2008-07-01Summons (3) Issued as to DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (tg, ) (Entered: 07/03/2008)
2008-07-032NOTICE of Appearance by David L. Sobel on behalf of all plaintiffs (Sobel, David) (Entered: 07/03/2008)
2008-07-073MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Catherine Crump, :Firm- American Civil Liberties Union, :Address- 125 Broad Street, New York, NY 10004. Phone No. - 212-519-7806. Fax No. - 212-549-2651 by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Catherine Crump)(Spitzer, Arthur) (Entered: 07/07/2008)
2008-07-094ORDER granting only upon condition plaintiffs' motion for pro hac vice appearance of Catherine Crump 3 . Signed by Judge James Robertson on July 9, 2008. (MT) (Entered: 07/09/2008)
2008-07-115SUMMONS Returned Executed by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 7/8/2008, answer due 8/7/2008. (Spitzer, Arthur) (Entered: 07/11/2008)
2008-07-116RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General 07/07/2008. (Spitzer, Arthur) (Entered: 07/11/2008)
2008-07-117RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the US Attorney. (Spitzer, Arthur) (Entered: 07/11/2008)
2008-08-078NOTICE of Appearance by David Michael Glass on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Glass, David) (Entered: 08/07/2008)
2008-08-079ANSWER to 1 Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION.(Glass, David) (Entered: 08/07/2008)
2008-08-2110ORDER that defendant may have 30 days from the date of this order within which to file a dispositive motion, or in the alternative, to file a report setting forth a document production schedule. Signed by Judge James Robertson on August 21, 2008. (MT) (Entered: 08/21/2008)
2008-09-1011NOTICE of Certification regarding pro hac vice admission of Catherine Crump by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION re 4 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Spitzer, Arthur) (Entered: 09/10/2008)
2008-09-1112MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Amended Complaint, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Crump, Catherine) (Entered: 09/11/2008)
2008-09-1613RESPONSE to 12 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint (Notice of Non-Opposition) filed by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Glass, David) Modified to correct entry on 9/17/2008 (tg, ). (Entered: 09/16/2008)
2008-09-1714Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Scheduling Report by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Glass, David) (Entered: 09/17/2008)
2008-09-19MINUTE ORDER granting plaintiffs' motion for leave to file an amended complaint 12 and granting defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time 14 for 30 days after filing response to the amended complaint to file a scheduling report. Signed by Judge James Robertson on September 19, 2008. (MT) (Entered: 09/19/2008)
2008-09-1915AMENDED COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE filed by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION.(tg, ) (Entered: 09/22/2008)
2008-10-0316ANSWER to 15 Amended Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. Related document: 15 Amended Complaint filed by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION.(Glass, David) (Entered: 10/03/2008)
2008-11-0317STATUS REPORT (Defendant's Scheduling Report) by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Glass, David) (Entered: 11/03/2008)
2008-11-2018ORDER that the defendant's scheduling report 17 and the deadlines it proposes are approved. Signed by Judge James Robertson on November 20, 2008. (MT) (Entered: 11/20/2008)
2009-01-1519NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by David Michael Glass on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE Substituting for attorney Elizabeth J. Shapiro (Glass, David) (Entered: 01/15/2009)
2009-01-1520STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Glass, David) (Entered: 01/15/2009)
2009-01-16NOTICE OF ERROR re 19 Substitution of Counsel; emailed to david.glass@usdoj.gov, cc'd 6 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Attorney Tyler is directed to file his notice of apperance using his own login and password. (tg, ) (Entered: 01/16/2009)
2009-01-1621NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by John Russell Tyler on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE Substituting for attorney Elizabeth J. Shapiro (Tyler, John) (Entered: 01/16/2009)
2009-02-2722ORDER that unless an appropriate motion is filed by plaintiff by 3/6/09, this case will be held as moot and dismissed. Signed by Judge James Robertson on February 27, 2009. (MT) (Entered: 02/27/2009)
2009-03-0523Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Court Order of February 27 by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spitzer, Arthur) (Entered: 03/05/2009)
2009-03-09MINUTE ORDER granting plaintiffs' consented motion for extension of time 23 to March 20, 2009. Signed by Judge James Robertson on March 9, 2009. (MT) (Entered: 03/09/2009)
2009-03-2024Consent MOTION Set Briefing Schedule by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Crump, Catherine) (Entered: 03/20/2009)
2009-03-26MINUTE ORDER approving and so ordering plaintiffs' consented briefing schedule 24 . Signed by Judge James Robertson on March 26, 2009. (MT) (Entered: 03/26/2009)
2009-05-2625NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Vikas K. Desai on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE Substituting for attorney David M. Glass (Desai, Vikas) (Entered: 05/26/2009)
2009-05-2926MOTION for Summary Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 5 (cont.), # 8 Statement of Facts, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Desai, Vikas) (Entered: 05/29/2009)
2009-06-0327Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 26 MOTION for Summary Judgment by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spitzer, Arthur) (Entered: 06/03/2009)
2009-06-04MINUTE ORDER granting joint motion for extension of time 27 to 7/20/09 for the opposition and to 8/19/09 for the reply. Signed by Judge James Robertson on June 4, 2009. (MT) (Entered: 06/04/2009)
2009-07-1528Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 26 MOTION for Summary Judgment by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Crump, Catherine) (Entered: 07/15/2009)
2009-07-15MINUTE ORDER granting plaintiffs' consented motion for extension of time 28 to July 24, 2009 for an opposition and to August 24, 2009 for a reply. Signed by Judge James Robertson on July 15, 2009. (MT) (Entered: 07/15/2009)
2009-07-2429Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Affidavit Declaration, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit, # 16 Exhibit, # 17 Exhibit, # 18 Exhibit, # 19 Exhibit, # 20 Exhibit)(Crump, Catherine) (Entered: 07/24/2009)
2009-07-2430Memorandum in opposition to re 26 MOTION for Summary Judgment and in support of Plaintiffs' Cross-motion for Summary Judgment filed by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit 10, # 13 Exhibit 11, # 14 Exhibit 12, # 15 Exhibit 13, # 16 Exhibit 14, # 17 Exhibit 15, # 18 Exhibit 16, # 19 Exhibit 17, # 20 Exhibit 18)(Crump, Catherine) (Entered: 07/24/2009)
2009-08-1731MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Desai, Vikas) (Entered: 08/17/2009)
2009-08-18MINUTE ORDER granting defendant's motion for extension of time 31 to August 31, 2009. Signed by Judge James Robertson on August 18, 2009. (MT) (Entered: 08/18/2009)
2009-08-3132REPLY to opposition to motion re 26 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Desai, Vikas) Modified on 9/1/2009 to correct linkage (rdj). (Entered: 08/31/2009)
2009-09-0133Memorandum in opposition to re 29 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Desai, Vikas) (Entered: 09/01/2009)
2009-09-0234Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 29 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Crump, Catherine) (Entered: 09/02/2009)
2009-09-08MINUTE ORDER granting plaintiff's consented motion for extension of time 34 to September 25, 2009. Signed by Judge James Robertson on September 8, 2009. (MT) Modified on 9/8/2009 to correct date (rdj). (Entered: 09/08/2009)
2009-09-2535REPLY to opposition to motion re 29 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION. (Crump, Catherine) (Entered: 09/25/2009)
2009-10-1536SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re 29 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION. (Crump, Catherine) (Entered: 10/15/2009)
2009-11-1737NOTICE of Change of Address by David L. Sobel (Sobel, David) (Entered: 11/17/2009)
2010-01-1438SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re 29 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment, 26 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION. (Crump, Catherine) (Entered: 01/14/2010)
2010-03-2639MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge James Robertson on March 26, 2010. (MT) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
2010-03-2640ORDER granting in part and denying in part defendant's motion for summary judgment 26 ; granting in part and denying in part plaintiffs' cross-motion for summary judgment 29 . Signed by Judge James Robertson on March 26, 2010. (MT) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
2010-05-2441NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 40 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0090-2188944. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Crump, Catherine) (Entered: 05/24/2010)
2010-05-2442Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid this date re 41 Notice of Appeal. (rdj) (Entered: 05/24/2010)
2010-05-2543NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 40 by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Desai, Vikas) Modified on 5/26/2010 to add linkage (rdj). (Entered: 05/25/2010)
2010-05-26USCA Case Number 10-5159 for 41 Notice of Appeal, filed by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION. (rdj) (Entered: 05/26/2010)
2010-05-2644Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals docketing fee was not paid because the fee was an Appeal by the Government re 43 Notice of Appeal. (rdj) (Entered: 05/26/2010)
2010-05-28USCA Case Number 10-5167 for 43 Notice of Appeal filed by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (rdj) (Entered: 05/28/2010)
2011-11-2945NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Jonathan Gordon Cooper on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE Substituting for attorney Vikas Desai (Cooper, Jonathan) (Entered: 11/29/2011)
2011-11-3046MANDATE of USCA (certified copy) as to 43 Notice of Appeal filed by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. Ordered and Adjudged that the judgment of the District Court appealed from in these causes is hereby affirmed in part, vacated in part, and the case is remanded, in accordance with the opinion of the court filed herein this date. USCA Case Number 10-5159. (ls) (Entered: 12/01/2011)
2011-11-3048MANDATE of USCA (certified copy) as to 43 Notice of Appeal filed by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ; USCA Case Number 10-5159. ORDERED and Adjudged that the judgment of the District Court appealed from in these causes is hereby affirmed in part, vacated in part, and the case is remamded, in accordance with the opinion of the court filed herein this date. (ls, ) (Entered: 12/13/2011)
2011-12-02Case randomly reassigned to Judge Ellen S. Huvelle. Judge James Robertson no longer assigned to the case. (ds) (Entered: 12/02/2011)
2011-12-0547Case randomly reassigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. Judge Ellen S. Huvelle no longer assigned to the case. (ds) (Entered: 12/05/2011)
2011-12-15MINUTE ORDER. The parties are ORDERED to submit a joint status report by January 11, 2012 at 5:00 pm setting forth their joint position on whether they intend to pursue the settlement option described in the D.C. Circuit's opinion and on how and according to what schedule they would propose to proceed in light of the opinion. If the parties are unable to reach a joint position, they may set forth their respective separate positions. A status conference is scheduled for January 18, 2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Amy Berman Jackson. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 12/15/11. (lcabj1) (Entered: 12/15/2011)
2011-12-19Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 1/11/2012 at 5:00 PM If the parties are unable to reach a joint position, they may set forth their respective separate positions. A Status Conference is scheduled for 1/18/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (jth) (Entered: 12/19/2011)
2011-12-1949MOTION to Enforce Mandate by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spitzer, Arthur) (Entered: 12/19/2011)
2011-12-1950ERRATA - Omitted attachment to Motion to Enforce Mandate - Copy of Court of Appeals decision - by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION 49 MOTION to Enforce Mandate filed by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION. (Spitzer, Arthur) (Entered: 12/19/2011)
2011-12-2351Memorandum in opposition to re 49 MOTION to Enforce Mandate filed by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cooper, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/23/2011)
2012-01-1052Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Status Report and To Reset Date of Status Conference by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cooper, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/10/2012)
2012-01-11MINUTE ORDER granting 52 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Status Report and To Reset Status Conference. The status report will be due 1/24/2012 and the status conference will be rescheduled for 1/25/2012. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/11/2012. (MT) (Entered: 01/11/2012)
2012-01-12Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Status Report is due by 1/24/2012. The Status Conference is rescheduled for 1/25/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (jth) (Entered: 01/12/2012)
2012-01-2453STATUS REPORT and Request To Reschedule January 25 Status Conference by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Cooper, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/24/2012)
2012-01-24Set/Reset Hearings: The Status Conference presently scheduled for 1/25/2012 at 10:00 AM is rescheduled for 2/8/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (jth) (Entered: 01/24/2012)
2012-01-2454MOTION to Continue Status Conference scheduled for January 25, 2012 by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (See Docket Entry 53 to view document) (jf, ) (Entered: 01/25/2012)
2012-01-25MINUTE ORDER Granting 54 Motion to Continue Status Conference, which was contained in the Status Report filed on 1/24/2012. The Status Conference is rescheduled for Wednesday, 2/8/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Amy Berman Jackson. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/25/2012. (jth) (Entered: 01/25/2012)
2012-02-08Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amy Berman Jackson: Status Conference held on 2/8/2012. Defendant's completion of document production and In Camera submissions to the Court due by 2/24/2012; Plaintiffs notice of the contesting of withheld documents due by 3/9/2012; Joint Status Report and proposed briefing schedule due by 3/16/2012. (Court Reporter Pat Kaneshiro-Miller) (jth) (Entered: 02/08/2012)
2012-02-2455NOTICE of Filing Documents for In Camera Inspection and Status Report by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Cooper, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/24/2012)
2012-03-0956RESPONSE re Status Conference, Set Deadlines,, filed by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION. (Crump, Catherine) (Entered: 03/09/2012)
2012-03-1657STATUS REPORT and Proposed Briefing Schedule by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Cooper, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/16/2012)
2012-03-19MINUTE ORDER re 57 Status Report and Proposed Briefing Schedule filed by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. Defendant's dispositive motion will be due 4/27/2012. The opposition to the dispositive motion and a cross-motion will be due 5/25/2012. The reply to the opposition to the dispositive motion and the opposition to the cross-motion will be due 6/22/12. The reply to the opposition to the cross-motion will be due 7/13/2012. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 3/19/2012. (MT, ) (Entered: 03/19/2012)
2012-03-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Dispositive Motion is due by 4/27/2012; Opposition to Dispositive Motion and Cross Motion is due by 5/25/2012; Reply to Dispositive Motion and Opposition to Cross Motion is due by 6/22/2012; Reply to the Cross Motion is due by 7/13/2012. (jth) (Entered: 03/19/2012)
2012-04-12MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 49 Motion to Enforce Mandate. In light of the Court's Minute Order dated March 19, 2012 setting out a briefing schedule, it is ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to enforce mandate is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 4/12/12. (lcabj1) (Entered: 04/12/2012)
2012-04-2758MOTION for Summary Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Facts, # 3 Declaration, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Cooper, Jonathan) Modified on 5/29/2012 (jf, ). (Entered: 04/27/2012)
2012-05-2559Memorandum in opposition to re 58 Second MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Spitzer, Arthur) (Entered: 05/25/2012)
2012-05-2560Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Spitzer, Arthur) Modified on 5/29/2012 (jf, ). (Entered: 05/25/2012)
2012-06-1561MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 60 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment, 58 MOTION for Summary Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cooper, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/15/2012)
2012-06-15MINUTE ORDER granting 61 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply re 58 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Response re 60 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment. The reply to the motion for summary judgment and opposition/response to the cross-motion for summary judgment will be due 6/29/2012. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 6/15/2012. (MT) (Entered: 06/15/2012)
2012-06-2962Memorandum in opposition to re 60 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Cooper, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/29/2012)
2012-06-2963REPLY to opposition to motion re 60 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Cooper, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/29/2012)
2012-07-1364REPLY to opposition to motion re 60 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION. (Spitzer, Arthur) (Entered: 07/13/2012)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar