Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCENTER FOR PUBLIC INTERGRITY v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2009cv01765
Date Filed2009-09-17
Date Closed2010-03-05
JudgeJudge Henry H. Kennedy
PlaintiffCENTER FOR PUBLIC INTERGRITY
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
DefendantARNE DUNCAN in his official capacity as U.S. Secretary of Education
DefendantJOANN RYAN in her official capacity as Chief FOIA Officer
DefendantROBERT WEHAUSEN in his official capacity as FOIA Public Liaison
DefendantLINDA DARBY in her official capacity as FOIA Public Liaison
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2009-09-171COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, ARNE DUNCAN, JOANN RYAN, ROBERT WEHAUSEN, LINDA DARBY ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616024053) filed by CENTER FOR PUBLIC INTERGRITY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(tr) (Entered: 09/18/2009)
2009-09-172LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CENTER FOR PUBLIC INTERGRITY identifying Corporate Parent NONE for CENTER FOR PUBLIC INTERGRITY. (tr) (Entered: 09/18/2009)
2009-09-17SUMMONS Issued(7) as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, ARNE DUNCAN, JOANN RYAN, ROBERT WEHAUSEN, LINDA DARBY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (tr) (Entered: 09/18/2009)
2009-10-053RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General 9/24/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit USPS Domestic Return Receipt)(Smith, Peter) (Entered: 10/05/2009)
2009-10-054SUMMONS Returned Executed by CENTER FOR PUBLIC INTERGRITY. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION served on 9/23/2009, answer due 10/23/2009; ARNE DUNCAN served on 9/23/2009, answer due 10/23/2009; JOANN RYAN served on 9/23/2009, answer due 10/23/2009; ROBERT WEHAUSEN served on 9/23/2009, answer due 10/23/2009; LINDA DARBY served on 9/23/2009, answer due 10/23/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit USPS Domestic Return Receipts)(Smith, Peter) (Entered: 10/05/2009)
2009-10-055SUMMONS Returned Executed by CENTER FOR PUBLIC INTERGRITY. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION served on 9/17/2009, answer due 10/23/2009. (Smith, Peter) (Entered: 10/05/2009)
2009-10-196ANSWER to 1 Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, ARNE DUNCAN, JOANN RYAN, ROBERT WEHAUSEN, LINDA DARBY. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by CENTER FOR PUBLIC INTERGRITY.(Fields, Rhonda) (Entered: 10/19/2009)
2009-10-217ORDER directing the parties to submit a joint case management report and proposed deadlines for submission of dispositive motions by November 20, 2009. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on October 21, 2009. (NP) (Entered: 10/21/2009)
2009-11-198STATUS REPORT joint case management report and proposed deadlines for submission of dispositive motions by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, ARNE DUNCAN, JOANN RYAN, ROBERT WEHAUSEN, LINDA DARBY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fields, Rhonda) (Entered: 11/19/2009)
2009-11-209SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on November 20, 2009. (NP) (Entered: 11/20/2009)
2009-11-20Reset Deadlines: Dispositive Motions due by 1/20/2010. Response to Dispositive Motions due by 2/19/2010. Reply to Dispositive Motions due by 3/22/2010. Replies due by 4/13/2010. (tj ) (Entered: 11/20/2009)
2010-01-2010MOTION for Summary Judgment by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION (Attachments: # 1 Bergeron dec., # 2 Darby dec., # 3 Kallem dec, # 4 Moore dec., # 5 Osgood dec., # 6 Wehausen dec., # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Fields, Rhonda) (Entered: 01/20/2010)
2010-01-2011EXHIBITS re: 10 MOTION for Summary Judgment by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION (Attachments: # 1 Appellate Determination (3)., # 2 09-00930-A, # 3 \09-00930-B, # 4 09-00930-C, # 5 09-00930-D, # 6 09-00930-F)(Fields, Rhonda) Modified event title on 1/21/2010 (znmw, ). (Entered: 01/20/2010)
2010-01-2012EXHIBITS re: 10 MOTION for Summary Judgment final batch of exhibits by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION (Attachments: # 1 09-01522-A, # 2 09-01522-B, # 3 09-01522-C, # 4 09-01522-D, # 5 09-01609-A, # 6 09-01609-B, # 7 09-01609-C, # 8 09-01609-D, # 9 09-01609-E, # 10 09-01717-A, # 11 09-01717-B, # 12 09-01717-C, # 13 09-01717-D, # 14 09-01717-E, # 15 \09-01717-F)(Fields, Rhonda) Modified event title on 1/21/2010 (znmw, ). (Entered: 01/20/2010)
2010-01-21NOTICE OF ERROR re 12 Motion for Summary Judgment; emailed to rhonda.fields@usdoj.gov, cc'd 1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Some exhibits are upside down; please refile corrected exhibits with an Errata. (znmw, ) (Entered: 01/21/2010)
2010-01-2213ERRATA by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION 11 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, 12 MOTION for Summary Judgment final batch of exhibits filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 09-00930-A, # 2 Exhibit 09-00930-B, # 3 Exhibit 09-00930-C, # 4 Exhibit 09-00930-D, # 5 Exhibit 09-00930-F, # 6 Exhibit 09-01522-A, # 7 Exhibit 09-01522-B, # 8 Exhibit 09-01522-C, # 9 Exhibit 09-01522-D, # 10 Exhibit 09-1609-A, # 11 Exhibit 09-1609-B, # 12 Exhibit 09-1609-C, # 13 Exhibit 09-1609-D, # 14 Exhibit 09-1609-E, # 15 Exhibit 09-01717-A, # 16 Exhibit 09-01717-B, # 17 Exhibit 09-01717-C, # 18 Exhibit 09-01717-D, # 19 Exhibit 09-01717-E, # 20 Exhibit 09-01717-F, # 21 Exhibit Appellate Determination (3))(Fields, Rhonda) (Entered: 01/22/2010)
2010-02-1914MOTION to Dismiss by CENTER FOR PUBLIC INTERGRITY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Peter) (Entered: 02/19/2010)
2010-03-0515ORDER granting 14 Plaintiff's Motion for Voluntary Dismissal. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on March 5, 2010. (NP) (Entered: 03/05/2010)
2010-03-1216Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Attorneys' Fees by CENTER FOR PUBLIC INTERGRITY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Peter) (Entered: 03/12/2010)
2010-03-15MINUTE ORDER granting 16 Plaintiff's Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Attorneys' Fees. Accordingly, any motion for attorneys' fees and costs shall be filed by March 19, 2010. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on March 15, 2010. (NP) (Entered: 03/15/2010)
2010-03-1917MOTION for Attorney Fees by CENTER FOR PUBLIC INTERGRITY (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Peter Newbatt Smith, # 2 Exhibit Time Record, # 3 Exhibit FOIA Response 09-01717-F, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Peter) (Entered: 03/19/2010)
2010-04-0518Memorandum in opposition to re 17 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by LINDA DARBY, ARNE DUNCAN, JOANN RYAN, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, ROBERT WEHAUSEN. (Fields, Rhonda) (Entered: 04/05/2010)
2010-04-1519REPLY to opposition to motion re 17 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by CENTER FOR PUBLIC INTERGRITY. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kristen Lombardi, # 2 Exhibit 1 (Determination Letter), # 3 Exhibit 2 (Administrative Appeal))(Smith, Peter) (Entered: 04/15/2010)
2011-03-3120ORDER denying 17 plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on March 31, 2011. (lchhk3) (Entered: 03/31/2011)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff