Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePhoenix Newspapers, Inc. et al v. Bureau of Indian Affairs et al
DistrictDistrict of Arizona
CityPhoenix Division
Case Number2:2009cv00859
Date Filed2009-04-23
Date Closed2010-06-04
JudgeMagistrate Judge David K Duncan
PlaintiffDennis Wagner
PlaintiffPhoenix Newspapers Incorporated an Arizona corporation
DefendantIndian Affairs, Bureau of a bureau of the U.S. Department of the Interior
DefendantUnited States Department of the Interior a department of the executive branch of the United States
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2009-04-231COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 350.00, receipt number 09700000000002763917, filed by Dennis Wagner, Phoenix Newspapers, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Bureau of Indian Affairs, # 3 Summons Dept of the Interior, # 4 Exhibit Declaration of Dennis Wagner, # 5 Exhibit Declaration of David Bodney)(Moeser, James) (Entered: 04/23/2009)
2009-04-232Corporate Disclosure Statement by Phoenix Newspapers, Inc.. (Moeser, James) (Entered: 04/23/2009)
2009-04-233MOTION to Compel Preparation of Vaughn Index by Dennis Wagner, Phoenix Newspapers, Inc.. (Moeser, James) (Entered: 04/23/2009)
2009-04-23This case has been assigned to the Honorable David K. Duncan. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 09-859-PHX-DKD. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (CMH, ) (Entered: 04/24/2009)
2009-04-234Magistrate Election Form Deadline (Attachments: # 1 Magistrate Judge Election Form.)(CMH, ) (Entered: 04/24/2009)
2009-04-245NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re 1 Complaint, filed by Dennis Wagner, Phoenix Newspapers, Inc.. Description of deficiency: (1) Document not in compliance with Local Rule 7.1(c). (2) Incorrect information added to Party Information Screen. Address, phone or email information was incorrectly added to the Party Information screen. At the Party Information screen, only the Party text field should be used when appropriate. (3) Required document(s) are incorrect. The following required documents were incorrect: Summons. The number of days to answer is incorrect.(CMH, ) (Entered: 04/24/2009)
2009-04-246Summons Issued as to Bureau of Indian Affairs, Department of the Interior. (Attachments: # 1 Bureau of Indian Affairs)(CMH, ). *** IMPORTANT: You must select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" on the print screen in order for the court seal to appear on the summons you print. (Entered: 04/24/2009)
2009-05-047Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) (Entered: 05/05/2009)
2009-05-228Notice re Appointment of Daniel D. Price by Bureau of Indian Affairs, Department of the Interior (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Letter of Authorization, # 2 Affidavit)(Price, Daniel) (Entered: 05/22/2009)
2009-05-229NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel D Price on behalf of Bureau of Indian Affairs, Department of the Interior (Price, Daniel) (Entered: 05/22/2009)
2009-05-2610STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT AND TO RESPOND TO THE MOTION TO COMPEL by Phoenix Newspapers, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order re Stipulation for Extension of Time)(Moeser, James) (Entered: 05/26/2009)
2009-05-2811ORDER granting the parties 10 Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint: that Dfts shall be granted an open extension of time to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. FURTHER ORDERED that Dfts shall be granted an open extension to respond to PNI's Motion to Compel (the "Motion to Compel"). FURTHER ORDERED that if PNI determines that the Gov's answer or other responsive pleading should be filed and served, or that the Gov's response to PNI's Motion to Compel should be filed and served, PNI shall notify the Gov in writing of such determination, and the Gov's answer or other response shall be due within 14 days of receipt of said notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge David K Duncan on 5/27/09. (KMG, ) (Entered: 05/28/2009)
2009-06-1612Ordered that Bureau of Indian Affairs, Department of the Interior show cause for failure to comply with LRCiv 3.8(a) before Judge David G Campbell. Show Cause Hearing set for 7/14/2009 04:30 PM before Judge David G Campbell. (Attachments: # 1 Instructions, # 2 Consent Form) (MAP) (Entered: 06/16/2009)
2009-06-2513Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) (Entered: 06/26/2009)
2009-06-25Consent of all parties to proceed before Magistrate Judge David K. Duncan (MAP) (Entered: 06/26/2009)
2009-06-2614Minute Order In accordance with 28 USC 636(c), all parties have voluntarily consented to have Magistrate Judge David K. Duncan conduct all further proceedings in this case, including trial and entry of final judgment, and conduct all post-judgment proceedings, with direct review by the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals, if an appeal is filed. FURTHER ORDERED that the Order to Show Cause Hearing scheduled for July 14, 2009 is hereby VACATED. (MAP) (Entered: 06/26/2009)
2009-08-1015Notice re Notice of Filing Partial Settlement Agreement and Release by Phoenix Newspapers, Inc., Dennis Wagner (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Partial Settlement Agreement and Release)(Moeser, James) (Entered: 08/10/2009)
2009-08-1416ORDER that the parties submit a status report regarding the status of the litigation no later than 10/30/09. Signed by Magistrate Judge David K Duncan on 08/13/09. (ESL, ) (Entered: 08/14/2009)
2009-10-2917ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Bureau of Indian Affairs, Department of the Interior.(Price, Daniel) (Entered: 10/29/2009)
2009-10-2918ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT - A Case Management Conference is set for 11/30/2009 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 305, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Magistrate Judge David K Duncan. Signed by Magistrate Judge David K Duncan on 10/29/09. (SAT) (Entered: 10/29/2009)
2009-10-3019STATUS REPORT (JOINT) by Phoenix Newspapers, Inc., Dennis Wagner. (Moeser, James) (Entered: 10/30/2009)
2009-11-1820REPORT re: Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Bureau of Indian Affairs, Department of the Interior, Phoenix Newspapers, Inc., Dennis Wagner. (Moeser, James) (Entered: 11/18/2009)
2009-11-3021Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David K Duncan: Scheduling Conference held on 11/30/2009. (Court Reporter COURTSMART.)(TLJ) (Entered: 12/01/2009)
2009-12-0222CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - Dispositive motions are due by 2/19/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge David K Duncan on 11/30/09. (NOTE: See Order for full details)(KMG) (Entered: 12/02/2009)
2010-02-0923STIPULATION AND JOINT REPORT RE SETTLEMENT by Bureau of Indian Affairs, Department of the Interior, Phoenix Newspapers, Inc., Dennis Wagner. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order re Joint Report and Stipulation)(Moeser, James) (Entered: 02/09/2010)
2010-02-1024ORDER re 23 Stipulation, that the deadline for filing dispositive motions in this matter shall be extended to 05/21/2010. The parties shall file a joint status report regarding the status of the litigation no later than 4/30/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge David K Duncan on 02/10/10. (ESL) (Entered: 02/10/2010)
2010-03-1725ORDER response to be filed no later than 5/21/10 re 3 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge David K Duncan on 3/17/10. (TLJ) (Entered: 03/17/2010)
2010-04-3026STATUS REPORT by Bureau of Indian Affairs, Department of the Interior, Phoenix Newspapers, Inc., Dennis Wagner. (Moeser, James) (Entered: 04/30/2010)
2010-06-0227ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re 26 Status Report: Show Cause Hearing set for 6/28/2010 10:15 AM in Courtroom 305, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Magistrate Judge David K Duncan. If a Stipulation to Dismiss is received prior to the scheduled hearing, the hearing will be vacated. Signed by Magistrate Judge David K Duncan on 6/2/10. (LAD) (Entered: 06/02/2010)
2010-06-0328STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Phoenix Newspapers, Inc., Dennis Wagner. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Moeser, James) (Entered: 06/03/2010)
2010-06-0429ORDER DISMISSING CASE, pursuant to the parties' Stipulation to Dismiss With Prejudice 28 , and good cause appearing; dismissing this action with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge David K Duncan on 6/4/10. (REW) (Entered: 06/04/2010)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff