Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLEOPOLD et al v. CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2012cv00245
Date Filed2012-02-14
Date Closed2012-07-25
JudgeJudge Beryl A. Howell
PlaintiffJASON LEOPOLD
PlaintiffNATIONAL SECURITY COUNSELORS
DefendantCENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF ENERGY
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
DefendantNATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION
DefendantOFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 Corrected complaint
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2012-02-141COMPLAINT against CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY, DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616046031) filed by NATIONAL SECURITY COUNSELORS, JASON LEOPOLD. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rdj) (Entered: 02/14/2012)
2012-02-14SUMMONS (9) Issued as to CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY, DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (rdj) (Entered: 02/14/2012)
2012-02-142NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by JASON LEOPOLD, NATIONAL SECURITY COUNSELORS. Case related to Case No. 10cv202 ; 11cv445. (rdj) (Entered: 02/14/2012)
2012-02-143NOTICE of Filing of Corrected Complaint by JASON LEOPOLD, NATIONAL SECURITY COUNSELORS re 1 Complaint, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 02/14/2012)
2012-02-21MINUTE ORDER (paperless) The parties are directed to file, by February 27, 2012, a notice explaining how this case is related to Muttitt v. U.S. Central Command, et al. (10-cv-202) and National Security Counselors v. CIA, et al. (11-cv-445) as indicated in the plaintiffs' 2 Notice of Related Case. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on February 21, 2012. (lcbah1) (Entered: 02/21/2012)
2012-02-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Notice explaining how this case is related to 10-cv-202 due by 2/27/2012. (alp) (Entered: 02/21/2012)
2012-02-214NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Plaintiffs. Case related to Case No. 10-202, 11-445. (McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 02/21/2012)
2012-02-215STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on February 21, 2012. (lcbah1) (Entered: 02/21/2012)
2012-02-226NOTICE (Proof of Service) by JASON LEOPOLD, NATIONAL SECURITY COUNSELORS (McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 02/22/2012)
2012-02-227LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by NATIONAL SECURITY COUNSELORS (McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 02/22/2012)
2012-03-068NOTICE of Appearance by Marina Utgoff Braswell on behalf of CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY, DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 03/06/2012)
2012-03-169Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to the Complaint by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY, DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 03/16/2012)
2012-03-19MINUTE ORDER (paperless) granting 9 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time. The defendants shall respond to the Complaint by March 30, 2012. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on March 19, 2012. (lcbah1) (Entered: 03/19/2012)
2012-03-19Reset Deadlines: Defendant's response to the complaint shall be filed by 3/30/2012. (tj ) (Entered: 03/19/2012)
2012-03-2610Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to the Complaint by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY, DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 03/26/2012)
2012-03-26MINUTE ORDER (paperless) granting 10 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Further Enlargement of Time. The defendants shall respond to the Complaint by April 30, 2012. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on March 26, 2012. (lcbah1) (Entered: 03/26/2012)
2012-03-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 4/30/2012. (zmm, ) (Entered: 03/29/2012)
2012-04-2611Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to the Complaint by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY, DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 04/26/2012)
2012-04-27MINUTE ORDER (paperless) granting 11 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Further Enlargement of Time. The defendants shall have until May 31, 2012 to respond to the plaintiffs' Complaint. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on April 27, 2012. (lcbah1) (Entered: 04/27/2012)
2012-05-2212Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to the Complaint by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY, DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 05/22/2012)
2012-05-22MINUTE ORDER (paperless) granting 12 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Further Enlargement of Time. The defendants shall respond to the plaintiffs' Complaint by June 29, 2012. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on May 22, 2012. (lcbah1) (Entered: 05/22/2012)
2012-06-2513Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply TO THE cOMPLAINT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY, DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 06/25/2012)
2012-06-25MINUTE ORDER (paperless) granting 13 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Further Enlargement of Time. The defendants shall have until July 9, 2012 to respond to the plaintiffs' Complaint. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on June 25, 2012. (lcbah1) (Entered: 06/25/2012)
2012-06-25Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 7/9/2012. (alp) (Entered: 06/26/2012)
2012-07-0914MOTION to Dismiss Or, In the Alternative, , MOTION for Summary Judgment by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY, DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration / FBI, # 2 Declaration /Supplemental FBI, # 3 Declaration /Supplemental FBI, Exhibits, # 4 Declaration /NARA, # 5 Declaration /NARA, Attachment, # 6 Declaration /ODNI, # 7 Declaration /CIA, # 8 Declaration /DOD, # 9 Declaration /DOE, # 10 Declaration /Treasury)(Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 07/09/2012)
2012-07-1215Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct 14 MOTION to Dismiss Or, In the Alternative, MOTION for Summary Judgment by Sealing the First 3 Attachments to Defendants' Motion by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY, DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 07/12/2012)
2012-07-13MINUTE ORDER (paperless) granting 15 Defendants' Consent Motion to Seal Documents Filed at Dkt. # 14. The three requested documents, [14-1], [14-2], and [14-3] shall remain sealed until the defendants refile those documents in a form that is suitable for inclusion in the public docket. The defendants shall refile these three documents by July 18, 2012. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on July 13, 2012. (lcbah1) (Entered: 07/13/2012)
2012-07-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's to refile redacted form of the documents sealed under docket entry 14 by 7/18/2012. (tg, ) (Entered: 07/13/2012)
2012-07-1816NOTICE of Filing of Redacted Exhibits re 14 MOTION to Dismiss Or, In the Alternative,, MOTION for Summary Judgment by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY, DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE (Attachments: # 1 Hardy Declaration, Redacted, # 2 Second Hardy Declaration, Redacted)(Braswell, Marina) Modified on 7/20/2012 to add linkage(rdj). (Entered: 07/18/2012)
2012-07-2517NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 07/25/2012)
2012-07-25MINUTE ORDER (paperless) In light of the 17 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by the plaintiffs on July 25, 2012, the plaintiffs' Complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice. The Clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on July 25, 2012. (lcbah1) (Entered: 07/25/2012)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff