Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSENNETT v. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2012cv00495
Date Filed2012-03-30
Date Closed2014-04-30
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffLAURA SENNETT
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Opinion/Order [23]
Opinion/Order [36]
FOIA Project Annotation: Judge James Boasberg, after rejecting the FBI's third affidavit justifying the confidentiality of two witnesses who helped the agency identify vandals at a 2008 demonstration at the Four Seasons Hotel in protest of the International Monetary Fund's annual meeting, has ordered the agency to disclose the information to photojournalist Laura Sennett. Sennett was present at the demonstration taking photos. After the demonstration devolved into petty vandalism, the FBI seized 7,000 pictures from Sennett's computer. Sennett then requested her records from the FBI, which released over 1,000 pages and withheld 600 more. Sennett sued and Boasberg ruled in favor of the agency on all claims except for its invocation of Exemption 7(D) (confidential sources). Although Boasberg gave the FBI a third chance to justify its Exemption 7(D) claim, he found its argument unpersuasive. The FBI claimed one source had attended meetings to plan the IMF protests and that the source's testimony was "singular in nature." But Boasberg noted that "presumably, these statements are meant to suggest that the source would fear retaliation if the information provided were made public, as he or she could be identified from that information. But the Court cannot simply assume that this is so." He noted that "the redacted description of the confidential information, which the Court has reviewed in camera, is fairly genericâ€"in fact, it is hardly more specific than the [agency declaration] summary. The FBI's account of this source's relationship to the crimes at issue, therefore, cannot support an inference of confidentiality." Boasberg also rejected the agency's claim that disclosure would harm its ability to continue a confidential relationship with the source. He pointed out that "the agency's desire to obtain information from the informants in the future says nothing about whether the informants expect or intend to provide it." Ordering the agency to disclose the four disputed documents, Boasberg observed that "the Court is attentive to the FBI's views in relation to informants, as the policy at the heart of Exemption 7(D) is one of source protection and empowerment of law-enforcement agencies. That solicitude, however, can only carry the Court so far. The Bureau has had two chances to explain itself, or at least to say that it could not explain without providing too much detail and risking the disclosure of the very information it seeks to withhold. It did neither."
Issues: Exemption 7(D) - Assurance of confidentiality
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2012-03-301COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE filed by LAURA SENNETT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dr) (Entered: 03/30/2012)
2012-03-30SUMMONS (3) Issued as to DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (dr) (Entered: 03/30/2012)
2012-03-302MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by LAURA SENNETT (dr) (Entered: 03/30/2012)
2012-03-30FIAT ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 3/30/2012. "Leave to File without Prepayment of Costs GRANTED," Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan (dr) (Entered: 03/30/2012)
2012-04-043RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 4/4/2012, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 4/4/2012., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/4/2012. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/4/2012.) (rdj) (Entered: 04/05/2012)
2012-04-104RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/4/2012. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/4/2012. (td, ) (Entered: 04/11/2012)
2012-05-055MOTION for Entry of Default by LAURA SENNETT (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/05/2012)
2012-05-076VACATED PURSUANT TO MINUTE ORDER FILED 6/13/12. . . . .Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (td, ) Modified on 6/14/2012 (td, ). (Entered: 05/07/2012)
2012-06-097MOTION for Briefing Schedule by LAURA SENNETT (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/09/2012)
2012-06-128Consent MOTION to Vacate 6 Clerk's Entry of Default by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 06/12/2012)
2012-06-13MINUTE ORDER granting 8 Consent Motion to Vacate the Entry of Default by the Clerk on May 7, 2012. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 6/13/12. (lcjeb4) (Entered: 06/13/2012)
2012-07-109ANSWER to 1 Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 07/10/2012)
2012-07-1810ORDER pursuant to Local Rule 16.3(b)(9) requiring parties to consult and file a joint proposed briefing schedule on or before August 2, 2012. In light of this Order, Plaintiff's 7 Motion for Briefing Schedule is hereby DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 7/18/12. (lcjeb4) (Entered: 07/18/2012)
2012-07-18MINUTE ORDER: An Initial Scheduling Conference is set for 8/21/2012 at 10:30 a.m. before Judge James E. Boasberg in Courtroom 19. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 7/18/12. (lcjeb4) (Entered: 07/18/2012)
2012-07-19Set/Reset Deadline/Hearing: Parties shall consult and file a Joint Proposed Briefing schedule on or before 8/02/2012. An Initial Scheduling Conference is set for 8/21/2012 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 19 before Judge James E. Boasberg. (ad) (Entered: 07/19/2012)
2012-08-0211MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/02/2012)
2012-08-20MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to the 11 Joint Meet and Confer Statement, the Scheduling Conference set for August 21, 2012 is hereby VACATED and the briefing schedule proposed by the parties is adopted as follows: additional documents shall be produced by February 28, 2013; a Vaughn index shall be due by April 30, 2013; Summary Judgment motions shall be filed on or before May 13, 2013; Oppositions to Motions for Summary Judgment shall be filed on or before June 13, 2013; and any Reply to Motions for Summary Judgment shall be filed on or before July 8, 2013. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 8/20/12. (lcjeb4) (Entered: 08/20/2012)
2012-08-20Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Additional documents shall be produced by 2/28/2013; A Vaughn index shall be due 4/30/2013; Summary Judgment motions shall be filed on or before 5/13/2013; Oppositions to Motions for Summary Judgment shall be filed on or before 6/13/2013; And any Reply to Motions for Summary Judgment shall be filed on or before 7/08/2013. The Initial Scheduling Conference set for 8/21/2012 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 19 is hereby VACATED. (ad) (Entered: 08/21/2012)
2013-04-3012Joint MOTION to Modify the Parties' Meet and Confer Statement by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 04/30/2013)
2013-05-01MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to the 12 Joint Motion to Modify the Meet and Confer Statement, the briefing schedule is modified as follows: a Vaughn index shall be due by May 7, 2013; Summary Judgment motions shall be filed on or before May 20, 2013; Oppositions to Motions for Summary Judgment and/or Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment shall be filed on or before June 20, 2013; and any Reply to Motions for Summary Judgment or Opposition to Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment shall be filed on or before July 15, 2013; and any Reply to the Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment shall be filed on or before July 30, 2013. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 5/1/13. (lcjeb4) (Entered: 05/01/2013)
2013-05-01Set/Reset Deadlines: A Vaughn index shall be due by 5/07/2013; Summary Judgment motions shall be filed on or before 5/20/2013; Oppositions to Motions for Summary Judgment and/or Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment shall be filed on or before 6/20/2013; and any Reply to Motions for Summary Judgment or Opposition to Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment shall be filed on or before 7/15/2013; and any Reply to the Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment shall be filed on or before 7/30/2013. (ad) (Entered: 05/01/2013)
2013-05-2013Consent MOTION to Modify the Parties' Meet and Confer Statement by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 05/20/2013)
2013-05-21MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to the 13 Consent Motion to Modify the Meet and Confer Statement, the briefing schedule is modified as follows: Summary Judgment motions shall be filed on or before May 27, 2013; Oppositions to Motions for Summary Judgment and/or Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment shall be filed on or before June 20, 2013; and any Reply to Motions for Summary Judgment or Opposition to Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment shall be filed on or before July 15, 2013; and any Reply to the Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment shall be filed on or before July 30, 2013. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 5/21/13. (lcjeb4, ) (Entered: 05/21/2013)
2013-05-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motions shall be filed on or before 5/27/2013; Oppositions to Motions for Summary Judgment and/or Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment shall be filed on or before 6/20/2013l; Any Reply to Motions for Summary Judgment or Opposition to Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment shall be filed on or before 7/15/2013; Any Reply to the Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment shall be filed on or before 7/30/2013. (ad) (Entered: 05/22/2013)
2013-05-2814Consent MOTION to Modify the Parties' Meet and Confer Statement by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 05/28/2013)
2013-05-29MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to the 14 Consent Motion to Modify, the Meet and Confer Statement, the briefing schedule is modified as follows: Summary Judgment motions shall be filed on or before May 31, 2013; Oppositions to Motions for Summary Judgment and/or Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment shall be filed on or before June 20, 2013; and any Reply to Motions for Summary Judgment or Opposition to Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment shall be filed on or before July 15, 2013; and any Reply to the Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment shall be filed on or before July 30, 2013. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 5/29/13. (lcjeb4) (Entered: 05/29/2013)
2013-05-2915MOTION to Modify the Parties' Meet and Confer Statement by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 05/29/2013)
2013-05-29MINUTE ORDER: Defendant's 15 Motion to Modify the briefing schedule is GRANTED, as follows: Defendant shall file its Motion for Summary Judgment on or before June 3, 2013; Plaintiff shall file its Opposition and Cross-Motion on or before June 20, 2013; Defendant's Reply and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment shall be filed on or before July 15, 2013; and Plaintiff's Reply shall be filed on or before July 30, 2013. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 5/29/13. (lcjeb4) (Entered: 05/29/2013)
2013-05-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant shall file its Motion for Summary Judgment on or before 6/03/2013; Plaintiff shall file its Opposition and Cross-Motion on or before 6/20/2013; Defendant's Reply and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment shall be filed on or before 7/15/2013; and Plaintiff's Reply shall be filed on or before 7/30/2013. (ad) (Entered: 05/29/2013)
2013-06-0316MOTION for Summary Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts)(Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 06/03/2013)
2013-06-0417NOTICE of Submission to the Clerk and Chamber of the Declaration of David M. Hardy and attached Voluminous Vaughn Index in Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE re 16 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 06/04/2013)
2013-06-0418Declaration of David M. Hardy and attached Voluminous Vaughn Index in Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE 17 Notice. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit I (part A), # 2 Exhibit I (part B), # 3 Exhibit I (part C), # 4 Exhibit I (part D), # 5 Errata I (part E), # 6 Exhibit I (part F), # 7 Exhibit I (part G), # 8 Exhibit I (part H), # 9 Exhibit I (part I))(rdj) (Entered: 06/05/2013)
2013-06-2019Memorandum in opposition to re 16 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by LAURA SENNETT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/21/2013)
2013-07-1520Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 07/15/2013)
2013-07-16MINUTE ORDER: Defendant's 20 Consent Motion for Extension of Time is hereby GRANTED. Defendant shall file its Reply on or before 7/19/13. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 7/16/13. (lcjeb4) (Entered: 07/16/2013)
2013-07-16Set/Reset Deadline: Defendant shall file its Reply on or before 7/19/13. (ad) (Entered: 07/16/2013)
2013-07-1921REPLY to opposition to motion re 16 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Second Declaration of David M. Hardy)(Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 07/19/2013)
2013-08-2722ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant's 16 Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendant's Motion is GRANTED as to the adequacy of the search, segregability, and withholdings under Exemptions 1 and 3; Defendant's Motion is DENIED as to its withholdings under Exemption 7(D); Defendant shall release the documents withheld pursuant to Exemption 7(D) or file a subsequent summary judgment motion supported by adequate declarations; and on or before September 10, 2013, the parties shall submit a joint proposed schedule for the remainder of the case. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 08/27/2013. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 08/27/2013)
2013-08-2723MEMORANDUM OPINION to 22 Order. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 08/27/2013. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 08/27/2013)
2013-08-28Set/Reset Deadline: On or before 9/10/2013, the parties shall submit a joint proposed schedule for the remainder of the case. (ad) (Entered: 08/28/2013)
2013-09-1024Joint MOTION for Briefing Schedule by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/10/2013)
2013-09-11MINUTE ORDER granting 24 Joint Motion for Briefing Schedule by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE; As the parties have agreed, the following schedule will govern briefing in this case: (1) Defendant shall file its Renewed Summary Judgment Motion on or before October 25, 2013; (2) Plaintiff shall file her Opposition to Defendants Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment on or before November 25, 2013; (3) Defendant shall file its Reply to Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment orOpposition to Plaintiffs Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment, if any, on or before December 10, 2013; and (4) Plaintiff shall file her Reply to Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment, if any, on or before December 20, 2013. The Court advises the parties that they may not extend any deadline by stipulation; instead, parties must seek extensions by motion. Consent motions are generally looked upon with favor by the Court. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 09/11/2013. (lcjeb4) Modified on 9/11/2013 to include Joint Motion 24 (ad). (Entered: 09/11/2013)
2013-09-11Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant shall file its Renewed Summary Judgment Motion on or before 10/25/2013; Plaintiff shall file her Opposition to Defendants Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment on or before 11/25/2013; Defendant shall file its Reply to Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment or Opposition to Plaintiffs Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment, if any, on or before 12/10/2013; Plaintiff shall file her Reply to Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment, if any, on or before 12/20/2013. (ad) (Entered: 09/11/2013)
2013-10-2425Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment and Related Due Dates by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 10/24/2013)
2013-10-25MINUTE ORDER granting 25 Consent Motion for Extension of Time by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. As per the consent motion, the following schedule will now govern briefing in this case: (1) Defendant shall file its Renewed Summary Judgment Motion on or before November 4, 2013; (2) Plaintiff shall file her Opposition to Defendants Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment on or before December 4, 2013; (3) Defendant shall file its Reply to Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment or Opposition to Plaintiffs Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment, if any, on or before December 19, 2013; and (4) Plaintiff shall file her Reply to Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment, if any, on or before December 29, 2013. The Court again advises the parties that they may not extend any deadline by stipulation; instead, parties must seek extensions by motion. Consent motions are generally looked upon with favor by the Court. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 10/25/2013. (lcjeb4) (Entered: 10/25/2013)
2013-10-25Set/Reset Deadlines: Renewed Summary Judgment motion due by 11/4/2013; Cross-Motion and Opposition to Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment due by 12/4/2013; Opposition to Cross-Motion and Reply to Opposition to Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment due by 12/19/2013; Reply to Opposition to Cross Motion due by 12/29/2013. (tg, ) (Entered: 10/25/2013)
2013-11-0426Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 11/04/2013)
2013-11-05MINUTE ORDER granting 26 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. In light of Defendant's Consent Motion for Extension of Time, it is hereby ORDERED that (1) Defendant's Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment shall be filed on or before November 11, 2013; (2) Plaintiff's Cross-Motion or Opposition shall be filed on or before December 11, 2013; (3) Defendant's Reply or Opposition to Plaintiff's Cross-Motion (if any) shall be filed on or before December 26, 2013; and (4) Plaintiff's Reply to Defendant's Opposition (if any) shall be filed on or before January 2, 2014. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 11/5/2013. (lcjeb4) (Entered: 11/05/2013)
2013-11-05Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment shall be filed on or before 11/11/2013; Plaintiff's Cross-Motion or Opposition shall be filed on or before 12/11/2013; Defendant's Reply or Opposition to Plaintiff's Cross-Motion (if any) shall be filed on or before 12/26/2013; and Plaintiff's Reply to Defendant's Opposition (if any) shall be filed on or before 1/02/2014. (ad) (Entered: 11/05/2013)
2013-11-1227MOTION for Summary Judgment (Renewed) by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 11/12/2013)
2013-12-1128Memorandum in opposition to re 27 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Renewed) filed by LAURA SENNETT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/11/2013)
2013-12-1129Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by LAURA SENNETT (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Facts, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/11/2013)
2013-12-2330Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Opposition/Reply to Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 12/23/2013)
2013-12-23MINUTE ORDER granting 30 Motion for Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED that the following schedule shall govern further briefing in this case: Defendant shall submit its Opposition/Reply on or before January 15, 2014, and Plaintiff's responsive pleading shall be due on or before February 7, 2014. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 12/23/2013. (lcjeb4) (Entered: 12/23/2013)
2013-12-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant shall submit its Opposition/Reply on or before 1/15/2014, and Plaintiff's responsive pleading shall be due on or before 2/07/2014. (ad) (Entered: 12/23/2013)
2014-01-1531REPLY to opposition to motion re 27 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Renewed) filed by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 01/15/2014)
2014-01-1532Memorandum in opposition to re 29 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 01/15/2014)
2014-02-0833MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 29 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by LAURA SENNETT (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/08/2014)
2014-02-0834REPLY to opposition to motion re 29 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by LAURA SENNETT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Antignano deposition excerpts, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Sercer deposition experts, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Congressional Research Service study, # 4 Declaration James Calhoun Colgan, # 5 Declaration Jeffrey Labow)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/08/2014)
2014-02-10ORDER granting 33 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Upon consideration of the Motion, the Court hereby ORDERS that the Motion is GRANTED; Plaintiff shall file her reply to 29 Defendant's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment on or before February 8, 2014. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 2/10/2014. (lcjeb4) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
2014-02-10Set/Reset Deadline: Plaintiff shall file her reply to 29 Defendant's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment on or before 2/8/2014. (ad) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
2014-04-15MINUTE ORDER: The Court believes that an in camera review of certain documents will assist in its analysis. As a result, the Court ORDERS that by April 17, 2014, Defendant shall produce to the Court redacted and unredacted copies of the four disputed records: Sennett-5, 9-10, and 1688. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 4/15/14. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 04/15/2014)
2014-04-15Set/Reset Deadline: By 4/17/2014, Defendant shall produce to the Court redacted and unredacted copies of the four disputed records: Sennett-5, 9-10, and 1688. (ad) (Entered: 04/15/2014)
2014-04-3035ORDER: As set forth in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion, the Court ORDERS that: (1) Defendant's 27 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED; (2) Plaintiff's 29 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED; (3) Judgment is ENTERED in favor of Plaintiff; and (4) Defendant shall disclose to Plaintiff all information on Sennett-5, 9-10, and 1688 withheld only under FOIA Exemption 7(D). Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 4/30/14. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 04/30/2014)
2014-04-3036MEMORANDUM OPINION re 35 Order. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 4/30/14. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 04/30/2014)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff