Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleThe New York Times Company et al v. United States Department of Justice
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2012cv03215
Date Filed2012-04-24
Date Closed2013-01-09
JudgeJudge Jed S. Rakoff
PlaintiffThe New York Times Company
PlaintiffCharlie Savage
DefendantUnited States Department of Justice
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2012-04-241COMPLAINT against United States Department of Justice. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 6323)Document filed by The New York Times Company, Charlie Savage.(ama) (Entered: 04/26/2012)
2012-04-24SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of Justice, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (ama) (Entered: 04/26/2012)
2012-04-24Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman is so designated. (ama) (Entered: 04/26/2012)
2012-04-24Case Designated ECF. (ama) (Entered: 04/26/2012)
2012-04-302RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by The New York Times Company.(McCraw, David) (Entered: 04/30/2012)
2012-05-023NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE: Judge Rakoff has ordered that counsel for all parties attend a conference, at the time and place fixed below, to report the status of this litigation and to consider other relevant matters. You are directed to furnish all attorneys in this action with copies of this notice and enclosures, and to furnish Chambers with a copy of any transmittal letter(s). If you are unaware of the identity of counsel for any of the parties, you should send a copy of the notice and rules to that party personally, informing the party that any unrepresented party is required to appear at the conference in person. Counsel are advised to review Judge Rakoffs Individual Rules of Practice, a copy of which is enclosed. May 10, 2012, AT THE UNITED STATESCOURTHOUSE, 500 PEARL STREET, NEW YORK, N.Y. IN COURTROOM 14-B AT 11:00 a.m. Status Conference set for 5/10/2012 at 11:00 PM in Courtroom 14B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 5/2/2012) (rdz) (Entered: 05/02/2012)
2012-05-10Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 5/10/2012. Defense/Gov't may file a Motion for Summary Judgment 6-14-2012; response due 6-28-2012; replies due 7-12-2012. An argument is scheduled for 7-19-2012 at 4:00 p.m. (Landers, Rigoberto) (Entered: 06/08/2012)
2012-05-244ANSWER to 1 Complaint. Document filed by United States Department of Justice.(La Morte, Tara) (Entered: 05/24/2012)
2012-06-145MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by United States Department of Justice. Responses due by 6/28/2012 Return Date set for 7/19/2012 at 04:00 PM.(La Morte, Tara) (Entered: 06/14/2012)
2012-06-146MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 5 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by United States Department of Justice. (La Morte, Tara) (Entered: 06/14/2012)
2012-06-147DECLARATION of Paul P. Colborn in Support re: 5 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by United States Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-D)(La Morte, Tara) (Entered: 06/14/2012)
2012-06-288CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Charlie Savage, The New York Times Company.(McCraw, David) (Entered: 06/28/2012)
2012-06-289MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 8 CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Charlie Savage, The New York Times Company. (McCraw, David) (Entered: 06/28/2012)
2012-06-2810DECLARATION of David McCraw in Support re: 8 CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Charlie Savage, The New York Times Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(McCraw, David) (Entered: 06/28/2012)
2012-07-1211MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 8 CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment. and in Further Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment . Document filed by United States Department of Justice. (La Morte, Tara) (Entered: 07/12/2012)
2012-07-19Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Oral Argument held on 7/19/2012 re: 6 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion filed by United States Department of Justice, 5 MOTION for Summary Judgment. filed by United States Department of Justice, 11 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion filed by United States Department of Justice, 9 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion filed by The New York Times Company, Charlie Savage, 7 Declaration in Support of Motion filed by United States Department of Justice, 8 CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment. filed by The New York Times Company, Charlie Savage, 10 Declaration in Support of Motion filed by The New York Times Company, Charlie Savage. (Kotowski, Linda) (Entered: 08/08/2012)
2012-09-21Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 9/21/2012. (Kotowski, Linda) (Entered: 10/05/2012)
2012-10-1012NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sarah Sheive Normand on behalf of United States Department of Justice (Normand, Sarah) (Entered: 10/10/2012)
2013-01-0713MEMORANDUM ORDER granting 5 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 8 Motion for Summary Judgment. Because the Goldsmith and Elwood Memoranda are protected by the deliberative process privilege, and because the government has not waived that privilege, DOJ's motion for summary judgment is hereby granted, and the New York Times' cross motion for summary judgment is hereby denied. The Clerk of the Court is directed to enter judgment for defendant and to close the case. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 1/4/2013) (ft) (Entered: 01/08/2013)
2013-01-07Transmission to Judgments and Orders Clerk. Transmitted re: 13 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment to the Judgments and Orders Clerk. (ft) (Entered: 01/08/2013)
2013-01-0914CLERK'S JUDGMENT That for the reasons stated in the Court's Memorandum Order dated January 4, 2013, DOJ's motion for summary judgment is granted, and the New York Times' cross-motion for summary judgment is denied; accordingly, judgment is entered for defendant and the case is closed. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 1/9/13) (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Right to Appeal)(ml) Modified on 1/9/2013 (ml). (Entered: 01/09/2013)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff