Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleIraqi Refugee Assistance Project v. United States Department of Homeland Security
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2012cv03461
Date Filed2012-05-01
Date Closed2013-03-05
JudgeJudge P. Kevin Castel
PlaintiffIraqi Refugee Assistance Project
DefendantUnited States Department of Homeland Security
DefendantUnited States Department of State
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
Complaint attachment 16
Complaint attachment 17
Complaint attachment 18
Complaint attachment 19
Complaint attachment 20
Complaint attachment 21
Complaint attachment 22
Complaint attachment 23
Complaint attachment 24
Complaint attachment 25
Complaint attachment 26
Complaint attachment 27
Complaint attachment 28
Complaint attachment 29
Complaint attachment 30
Complaint attachment 31
Complaint attachment 32
Complaint attachment 33
Complaint attachment 34
Complaint attachment 35
Complaint attachment 36
Complaint attachment 37
Complaint attachment 38
Complaint attachment 39
Complaint attachment 40
Opinion/Order [72]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2012-05-011COMPLAINT against United States Department of Homeland Security. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 6957)Document filed by Iraqi Refugee Assistance Project.(ama) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/2/2012: # 1 ex 1, # 2 ex 2, # 3 ex 3, # 4 ex 4, # 5 ex 5, # 6 ex 6, # 7 ex 7, # 8 ex 8, # 9 ex 9, # 10 ex 10-a, # 11 ex 10b, # 12 ex 11a, # 13 ex 11b, # 14 ex 12, # 15 ex 13, # 16 ex 14, # 17 ex 15a, # 18 ex 15b, # 19 ex 15c, # 20 ex 15d, # 21 ex 15e, # 22 ex 15 f, # 23 ex15g, # 24 ex 15h, # 25 ex 15 i, # 26 ex 15k, # 27 ex 15 k, # 28 ex 15 l, # 29 ex 15m, # 30 ex 15n, # 31 ex 15 o, # 32 ex 15 p, # 33 ex 15 q, # 34 ex 15 r, # 35 ex 15 s, # 36 ex 16, # 37 ex 17, # 38 ex 18, # 39 ex 19, # 40 ex 20) (ama). (Entered: 05/01/2012)
2012-05-01SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (ama) (Entered: 05/01/2012)
2012-05-01Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck is so designated. (ama) (Entered: 05/01/2012)
2012-05-01Case Designated ECF. (ama) (Entered: 05/01/2012)
2012-05-022MOTION for Jason A. Malinsky to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Iraqi Refugee Assistance Project.(pgu) (Entered: 05/03/2012)
2012-05-033RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Iraqi Refugee Assistance Project.(D'Amore, Matthew) (Entered: 05/03/2012)
2012-05-044ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: granting 2 Motion for Jason A. Malinsky to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 5/3/2012) (js) (Entered: 05/04/2012)
2012-05-045MOTION for L. Scott Oliver to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Iraqi Refugee Assistance Project.(pgu) (Entered: 05/04/2012)
2012-05-08CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on 2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $200.00, paid on 05/02/2012, Receipt Number 1037039. (jd) (Entered: 05/08/2012)
2012-05-09CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on 5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $200.00, paid on 05/04/2012, Receipt Number 1037277. (jd) (Entered: 05/09/2012)
2012-05-106ORDER INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 7/6/2012 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 12C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge P. Kevin Castel and as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 5/10/2012) (lmb) (Entered: 05/10/2012)
2012-05-107ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting 5 Motion for L. Scott Oliver to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 5/10/2012) (lmb) (Entered: 05/10/2012)
2012-05-118SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint,,, served. United States Department of Homeland Security served on 5/8/2012, answer due 7/9/2012. Service was accepted by Charlie Johnson. Service was made by Certified Mail. Document filed by Iraqi Refugee Assistance Project. (Malinsky, Jason) (Entered: 05/11/2012)
2012-05-119SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint,,, served. United States Department of Homeland Security served on 5/2/2012, answer due 7/9/2012. Service was made by Certified Mail. Document filed by Iraqi Refugee Assistance Project. (Malinsky, Jason) (Entered: 05/11/2012)
2012-05-1410AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Order re Initial Pretrial Conference on 05/10/2012. Service was made by Certified Mail. Document filed by Iraqi Refugee Assistance Project. (Malinsky, Jason) (Entered: 05/14/2012)
2012-05-3111ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by United States Department of Homeland Security.(Daughtry, Emily) (Entered: 05/31/2012)
2012-06-0412ORDER OF WITHDRAWAL OF JASON A. MALINSKY, ESQ.: Upon consideration of the request to withdraw by Jason A. Malinsky, Esq., this Court orders that Jason A. Malinsky, Esq. be withdrawn from this case, and further orders that Mr. Malinsky be removed from the Court's electronic service list. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 6/4/2012) (mro) (Entered: 06/04/2012)
2012-06-1113ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Emily E. Daughtry dated 6/7/2012 re: Counsel for Defendant writes on behalf of both parties to respectfully request an adjournment of the initial pretrial conference in the above-referenced case. ENDORSEMENT: Counsel for the partied are directed to meet and confer to explore a consensual resolution. Conference adjourned from July 6, 2012 to July 31 at 12:30 p.m. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 6/11/2012) (pl) Modified on 6/11/2012 (pl). (Entered: 06/11/2012)
2012-06-11Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Conference set for 7/31/2012 at 12:30 PM before Judge P. Kevin Castel. (pl) (Entered: 06/11/2012)
2012-06-1214NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Seaton Brown on behalf of Iraqi Refugee Assistance Project (Brown, David) (Entered: 06/12/2012)
2012-07-31Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge P. Kevin Castel: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 7/31/2012. Next conference is scheduled for October 10, 2012 at 12:30 p.m. (Nacanther, Florence) (Entered: 07/31/2012)
2012-07-3115ORDER FOLLOWING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: As result of a pretrial conference held before the Court today, the following is ORDERED: By agreement, 12cv3480(PKC) is consolidated with 12cv3461(PKC). 12cv3480(PKC) is Administratively Closed. The parties are presently working on a stipulation which may resolve the case and require approximately 30 days to do so. The next Case Management Conference will be held on October 10, 2012 at 12:30 pm. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 7/31/2012) (pl) Modified on 8/1/2012 (pl). Modified on 8/3/2012 (pl). (Entered: 08/01/2012)
2012-07-31Set/Reset Hearings: Next Case Management Conference set for 10/10/2012 at 12:30 PM before Judge P. Kevin Castel. (pl) (Entered: 08/01/2012)
2012-10-0916ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Emily E. Daughtry dated 10/9/2012 re: I write on behalf of both parties to respectfully request a one-month adjournment of the conference that is currently scheduled for tomorrow, October 10, 2012, at 12:30pm. ENDORSEMENT: Conference Adjourned from October 10, 2012 to Nov. 14, 2012 at 12:00 p.m. (Status Conference set for 11/14/2012 at 12:00 PM before Judge P. Kevin Castel.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 10/9/2012) (djc) (Entered: 10/10/2012)
2012-11-1417ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Emily E. Daughtry dated 11/9/2012 re: Counsels jointly request a three-week adjournment of the conference that is currently scheduled for Wednesday, November 14, 2012, at 12:00. ENDORSEMENT: Conference Adjourned From: Nov. 14 To: Dec. 5 at 12:00 pm. (Status Conference set for 12/5/2012 at 12:00 PM before Judge P. Kevin Castel.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 11/14/2012) (ft) (Entered: 11/14/2012)
2012-12-05Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge P. Kevin Castel: Status Conference held on 12/5/2012. Next conference is scheduled for February 14, 2013 at 12:00 p.m. (Nacanther, Florence) (Entered: 12/05/2012)
2012-12-0518ORDER FOLLOWING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: The parties are continuing to work towards settlement. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/14/2013 at 12:00 PM before Judge P. Kevin Castel. Any conference scheduled for a date prior thereto is adjourned. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 12/5/2012) (ft) Modified on 12/5/2012 (ft). (Entered: 12/05/2012)
2013-02-1319ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Emily E. Daughtry dated 02/12/2013 re: I write on behalf of both parties to respectfully request a two-week adjournment of the conference that is currently scheduled for February 14, 2013, at 12:00 pm. ENDORSEMENT: Conference Adjourned from 02/14/2013 to 03/01/2013 at 12:30 p.m. (Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/1/2013 at 12:30 PM before Judge P. Kevin Castel.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 02/13/2013) (jcs) (Entered: 02/13/2013)
2013-03-01Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge P. Kevin Castel: Status Conference held on 3/1/2013. Next conference is scheduled for March 19, 2013 at 10:30 a.m. (Nacanther, Florence) (Entered: 03/01/2013)
2013-03-0120ORDER FOLLOWING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: The parties expect to have a signed stipulation of settlement to be presented to the Court within the next five business days. The next Case Management Conference will be held on March 19, 2013 at 10:30 a.m. Any conference scheduled for a date prior thereto is adjourned. ( Case Management Conference set for 3/19/2013 at 10:30 AM before Judge P. Kevin Castel.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 3/1/2013) (ja) (Entered: 03/01/2013)
2013-03-0521STIPULATION AND ORDER OF SETTLEMENT AND DISMISSAL: This Action, encompassing both 12 Civ. 3461 and 12 Civ. 3480, is hereby dismissed with prejudice as to DOS and without prejudice as to DHS. However, this Court shall retain jurisdiction over the matter to the extent necessary to enforce the terms of this Stipulations. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 3/5/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-03461-PKC, 1:12-cv-03480-PKC(ja) (Entered: 03/05/2013)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff