Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleInner City Press/Community on the Move v. Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2004cv08337
Date Filed2004-10-21
Date Closed2007-03-20
JudgeJudge Denise L. Cote
PlaintiffInner City Press/Community on the Move
DefendantBoard of Governors of the Federal Reserve System
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Opinion/Order [15]
Opinion/Order [22]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2004-10-211COMPLAINT against Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System. (Filing Fee $ 150.00, Receipt Number 523530)Document filed by Inner City Press/Community on the Move.(jjm, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 10/22/2004 (jjm, ). (Entered: 10/22/2004)
2004-10-21SUMMONS ISSUED as to Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System. (jjm, ) (Entered: 10/22/2004)
2004-10-21Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger is so designated. (jjm, ) (Entered: 10/22/2004)
2004-10-212RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Document filed by Inner City Press/Community on the Move.(jjm, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 10/22/2004 (jjm, ). (Entered: 10/22/2004)
2004-10-21Case Designated ECF. (jjm, ) (Entered: 10/22/2004)
2004-10-253SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System served on 10/25/2004, answer due 11/24/2004. Service was accepted by J. Price, Assistant Manager. Document filed by Inner City Press/Community on the Move. (McKewen, Richard) (Entered: 10/25/2004)
2004-10-254SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Document filed by Inner City Press/Community on the Move. Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System served on 10/25/2004, answer due 11/24/2004. Service was accepted by David Burroughs, Contractor. (McKewen, Richard) (Entered: 10/25/2004)
2004-10-255AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System served on 10/25/2004, answer due 11/24/2004. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Inner City Press/Community on the Move. (McKewen, Richard) (Entered: 10/25/2004)
2004-11-226ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System.(Mizusawa, Yvonne) (Entered: 11/22/2004)
2004-12-097ORDER RE INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 1/7/2005 03:30 PM before Judge Denise L. Cote, in courtroom 11B. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 12/9/04) (cd, ) (Entered: 12/10/2004)
2004-12-108CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of (1) Notice of Initial Pretrial Conference; (2) This Court's Individual Practices in Civil Cases served on Yvonne F. Mizusawa, Esq., Counsel for Defendant Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System on December 10, 2004. Service was made by Federal Express. Document filed by Inner City Press/Community on the Move. (McKewen, Richard) (Entered: 12/10/2004)
2004-12-159SCHEDULING ORDER:Deft's Motion for Summary Judgment due by 12/21/2004. Plntf's Cross motion and Responses due by 1/21/2005; Reply due by 2/18/2005; plntf's reply brief shall be fld by 3/4/05. The initial ptc scheduled for 1/7/05 is hereby canceled. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 12/15/04) (cd, ) (Entered: 12/16/2004)
2004-12-2110MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System. Responses due by 1/21/2005 (Attachments: # 1 # 2 # 3 )(Mizusawa, Yvonne) (Entered: 12/21/2004)
2005-01-2111CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Inner City Press/Community on the Move. Responses due by 2/18/2005 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law# 2 Rule 56.1 Statement# 3 Declaration of Matthew Lee with Exhibits)(McKewen, Richard) (Entered: 01/21/2005)
2005-01-2112MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 10 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Inner City Press/Community on the Move. (Attachments: # 1 Rule 56.1 Statement)(McKewen, Richard) (Entered: 01/21/2005)
2005-02-1713MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 11 CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Supplemental Baer Decl.# 2 Affidavit Supplemental Rizer Decl.# 3 )(Mizusawa, Yvonne) (Entered: 02/17/2005)
2005-03-0414REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 11 CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Inner City Press/Community on the Move. (McKewen, Richard) (Entered: 03/04/2005)
2005-07-1915OPINION AND ORDER 91874: the 10 summary judgment is GRANTED for defendant as to the client names, specific loan amounts and terms, and descriptions of other banking services provided to clients engaged in subprime lending, corresponding to numerals (i), (ii), and (iii) of the Board's descriprtion of the withheld contents of exhibit 3, except to the extent that information is disclosed in SEC filings. The 11 summary judgment is GRANTED for plaintiff as to data regarding aggregate exposure and loan outstandings and due diligence practices, corresponding to numerals (iv) and (v) of the Board's descrition. The Clerk of Court shall close the case. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 7/19/05) (db, ) Modified on 7/21/2005 (sao, ). (Entered: 07/20/2005)
2005-08-0216MOTION for Reconsideration of the Court's 7/19/05 Opinion and Order . Document filed by Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Motion)(Mizusawa, Yvonne) (Entered: 08/02/2005)
2005-08-1217NOTICE of Appearance by Michele Elizabeth Host on behalf of Inner City Press/Community on the Move (Host, Michele) (Entered: 08/12/2005)
2005-08-1218MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 16 MOTION for Reconsideration of the Court's 7/19/05 Opinion and Order .. Document filed by Inner City Press/Community on the Move. (Host, Michele) (Entered: 08/12/2005)
2005-08-1219NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney. Old Attorney: Richard McKewen, New Attorney: Michele Host, David C. Vladeck, Address: Vladeck, Waldman, Elias & Engelhard, P.C., 1501 Broadway, Suite 800, New York, NY, 10036, 212-403-7300. Document filed by Inner City Press/Community on the Move. (McKewen, Richard) (Entered: 08/12/2005)
2005-08-1820REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 16 MOTION for Reconsideration of the Court's 7/19/05 Opinion and Order .. Document filed by Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System. (Mizusawa, Yvonne) (Entered: 08/18/2005)
2005-10-0421ORDER tht the clerk of court shall remove Richard McKewen's appearance from this case. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 10/4/05) (dle, ) (Entered: 10/05/2005)
2005-10-1122OPINION and ORDER 92254 re: denying in its entirety 16 MOTION for Reconsideration of the Court's 7/19/05 Opinion and Order . filed by Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System,. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 10/11/05) (djc, ) Modified on 10/13/2005 (ns, ). (Entered: 10/12/2005)
2005-11-0723NOTICE OF APPEAL from 15 Memorandum & Opinion,,, 22 Memorandum & Opinion,. Document filed by Inner City Press/Community on the Move. Filing fee $ 255.00, receipt number E 560417. (nd, ) (Entered: 11/15/2005)
2005-11-15Transmission of Notice of Appeal to the District Judge re: 23 Notice of Appeal. (nd, ) (Entered: 11/15/2005)
2005-11-15Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: 23 Notice of Appeal. (nd, ) (Entered: 11/15/2005)
2005-11-15Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for 21 Order, 7 Order for Initial Pretrial Conference, 2 Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement filed by Inner City Press/Community on the Move,, 8 Certificate of Service Other, filed by Inner City Press/Community on the Move,, 15 Memorandum & Opinion,,, 9 Scheduling Order,, 3 Summons Returned Executed, filed by Inner City Press/Community on the Move,, 10 MOTION for Summary Judgment. filed by Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System,, 11 CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment. filed by Inner City Press/Community on the Move,, 16 MOTION for Reconsideration of the Court's 7/19/05 Opinion and Order . filed by Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System,, 22 Memorandum & Opinion,, 17 Notice of Appearance filed by Inner City Press/Community on the Move,, 23 Notice of Appeal filed by Inner City Press/Community on the Move,, 1 Complaint filed by Inner City Press/Community on the Move,, 4 Summons Returned Executed as to USA, filed by Inner City Press/Community on the Move,, 12 Memorandum of Law in Oppisition to Motion filed by Inner City Press/Community on the Move,, 5 Affidavit of Service as to USA filed by Inner City Press/Community on the Move,, 13 Memorandum of Law in Oppisition to Motion, filed by Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System,, 18 Memorandum of Law in Oppisition to Motion filed by Inner City Press/Community on the Move,, 6 Answer to Complaint filed by Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System,, 14 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion filed by Inner City Press/Community on the Move,, 19 Notice of Substitution of Attorney, filed by Inner City Press/Community on the Move,, 20 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion filed by Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System, were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (nd, ) (Entered: 11/15/2005)
2005-12-0624NOTICE OF APPEAL from 15 Memorandum & Opinion,,, 22 Memorandum & Opinion,. Document filed by Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System. (nd, ) (Entered: 12/07/2005)
2005-12-07Transmission of Notice of Appeal to the District Judge re: 24 Notice of Appeal. (nd, ) (Entered: 12/07/2005)
2005-12-07Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: 24 Notice of Appeal. (nd, ) (Entered: 12/07/2005)
2005-12-07Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for 21 Order, 7 Order for Initial Pretrial Conference, 2 Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement filed by Inner City Press/Community on the Move,, 8 Certificate of Service Other, filed by Inner City Press/Community on the Move,, 15 Memorandum & Opinion,,, 9 Scheduling Order,, 3 Summons Returned Executed, filed by Inner City Press/Community on the Move,, 10 MOTION for Summary Judgment. filed by Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System,, 11 CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment. filed by Inner City Press/Community on the Move,, 16 MOTION for Reconsideration of the Court's 7/19/05 Opinion and Order . filed by Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System,, 22 Memorandum & Opinion,, 17 Notice of Appearance filed by Inner City Press/Community on the Move,, 23 Notice of Appeal filed by Inner City Press/Community on the Move,, 24 Notice of Appeal filed by Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System,, 1 Complaint filed by Inner City Press/Community on the Move,, 4 Summons Returned Executed as to USA, filed by Inner City Press/Community on the Move,, 12 Memorandum of Law in Oppisition to Motion filed by Inner City Press/Community on the Move,, 5 Affidavit of Service as to USA filed by Inner City Press/Community on the Move,, 13 Memorandum of Law in Oppisition to Motion, filed by Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System,, 18 Memorandum of Law in Oppisition to Motion filed by Inner City Press/Community on the Move,, 6 Answer to Complaint filed by Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System,, 14 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion filed by Inner City Press/Community on the Move,, 19 Notice of Substitution of Attorney, filed by Inner City Press/Community on the Move,, 20 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion filed by Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System, were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (nd, ) (Entered: 12/07/2005)
2005-12-2925STIPULATION AND ORDER; that the portion of this Court's 7/19/05 Order requiring the dfts to release portions of the withheld document to the plaintiff shall be and is hereby stayed pending the disposition of the parties appeals to the U.S. court of Appeals for the second Circuit; plaintiff may file a requests for costs and reasonable attorneys' fees within 30 days of the issuance of the mandate of the court of Appeals in the appeals filed in this action. Dft. may file an opposition to plaintiff's request within 14 days after plaintiff?s filing. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 12/29/05) (pl, ) (Entered: 12/30/2005)
2006-01-18USCA SCHEDULING ORDER as to 23 Notice of Appeal filed by Inner City Press/Community on the Move,, 24 Notice of Appeal filed by Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System, USCA Case Number 05-6162-cv (L) & 05-6628-cv (Xap). Roseann B. MacKechnie, Clerk USCA. Certified: 1/11/06. Appeal Record due by 2/10/2006. Appellant Brief due by 2/17/2006. Appellee Brief due by 3/27/2006. Appellant-Cross Appellee Brief Due by 4/26/06. Appellee-Cross Appellant Brief replying to the cross-appeal may be filed on or before 5/10/06.(dt, ) (Entered: 01/19/2006)
2006-10-0526MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to 23 Notice of Appeal filed by Inner City Press/Community on the Move,, 24 Notice of Appeal filed by Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System, USCA Case Number 05-6162-cv(L), 05-6628-cv (XAP). Ordered, Adjudged and Decreed that the judgment of the District Court is AFFIRMED in Part and REMANDED in part for further proceedings in accordance with the opinion of this Court. Roseann B. MacKechnie, Clerk USCA. Certified: 10/4/2006. (nd, ) (Entered: 10/05/2006)
2006-10-05Transmission of USCA Mandate/Order to the District Judge re: 26 USCA Mandate,. (nd, ) (Entered: 10/05/2006)
2006-10-2327ORDER that a conference is set for 11/30/06 at 2:30 pm in courtroom 11B. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 10/23/06) (cd, ) (Entered: 10/24/2006)
2006-10-23Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Conference set for 11/30/2006 02:30 PM before Judge Denise L. Cote. (cd, ) (Entered: 10/24/2006)
2006-11-1328STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING STAY PENDING APPEAL AND TIME FOR REQUESTING FEES AND COSTS So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 11/13/06) (jco, ) (Entered: 11/14/2006)
2006-11-2929ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Jilian F. Mizusawa dated 11/28/06 re: the parties request an adjournment of the November 30th scheduling conference until such time as the Second Circuit has acted upon plaintiff's petition for rehearing. ENDORSEMENT: Status letter is due December 15, 2006, Nov. 30 conference is cancelled. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 11/29/06) (js, ) (Entered: 11/30/2006)
2007-01-0430ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Yvonne F. Mizusawa dated 1/3/2007 re: to we are writing to notify you that the Second Circuit denied Plaintiff Inner City Press/Community on the Move's petition for panel rehearing or rehearing en banc on December 19, 2006 and that the parties are available for status conference. ENDORSEMENT: Press Conference is scheduled for January 25 at 2:00 pm. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 1/4/2007) (jmi, ) Modified on 1/5/2007 (jmi, ). (Entered: 01/05/2007)
2007-01-3031SCHEDULING ORDER:Status Report due by 2/2/2007. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 1/30/07) (jco) (Entered: 01/31/2007)
2007-02-0232ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Cote from Yvonne F. Mizusawa dated 2/1/07 re: counsel writes jointly purs to the court's pretrial conference held Jan 25, 2007 and the Court's Scheduling Order, issued January 30, 2007. As requested by the court, the parties have conferred and have reached agreement regarding the next steps in this litigation. So Ordered. The Order of January 30, 2007 is vacated.. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 1/2/07) (djc) (Entered: 02/05/2007)
2007-03-1433ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Jillian M. Cutler dated 3/13/07 re: Status letter due 3/20/07. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 3/14/07) (db) (Entered: 03/14/2007)
2007-03-14Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 3/20/2007. (db) (Entered: 03/14/2007)
2007-03-2034STIPULATION AND ORDER that ICP dismisses with prejudice this action against the Board. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 3/20/07) (dle) (Entered: 03/21/2007)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff