Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleKNIGHT RIDDER et al v. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2004cv01896
Date Filed2004-11-01
Date Closed2005-12-27
JudgeJudge Gladys Kessler
PlaintiffKNIGHT RIDDER
DefendantALISON YOUNG National Correspondents Knight Ridder Washington Bureau
DefendantCHRIS ADAMS National Correspondents Knight Ridder Washington Bureau
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Opinion/Order [34]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2004-11-011COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS (Filing fee $ 150) filed by CHRIS ADAMS, KNIGHT RIDDER, ALISON YOUNG.(rje, ) (Entered: 11/02/2004)
2004-11-012LCvR 7.1 - CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by Knight Ridder (rje, ) (Entered: 11/02/2004)
2004-11-01SUMMONS (3) Issued as to DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (rje, ) (Entered: 11/02/2004)
2004-11-243MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Henault, John) (Entered: 11/24/2004)
2004-11-29MINUTE ORDER granting 3 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Defendant shall have up to and including January 7, 2005 in which to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint . Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 11/29/04. (CS, ) (Entered: 11/29/2004)
2004-11-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 1/7/2005. (tth, ) (Entered: 11/29/2004)
2005-01-044MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Henault, John) (Entered: 01/04/2005)
2005-01-065MOTION to Compel and in Opposition to Defendant's Second Motion for an Extension of Time to Answer Complaint by KNIGHT RIDDER. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H# 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Eleanor) (Entered: 01/06/2005)
2005-01-06MINUTE ORDER granting 4 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Defendant shall have up to and including February 4, 2005 in which to file either an update of its progress in responding to Plaintiffs' FOIA requests together with another Motion for an Extension, or an answer or dispositive motoin . Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 1/6/05. (CS, ) (Entered: 01/06/2005)
2005-01-066Memorandum in opposition to second motion for an extension of time to answer complaint(SEE DOCUMENT NO. 5 FOR THE IMAGE OF THE PLEADING) filed by KNIGHT RIDDER. (rje, ) (Entered: 01/07/2005)
2005-01-197Memorandum in opposition to motion re 5 Compel filed by DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Transcript of Hearing, LCCR v. Ashcroft# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Henault, John) (Entered: 01/19/2005)
2005-01-268REPLY to opposition to motion re 5 to Compel filed by KNIGHT RIDDER. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Young Declaration# 2 Exhibit Exhibit I# 3 Exhibit Exhibit J# 4 Exhibit Exhibit K# 5 Exhibit Exhibit L# 6 Exhibit Exhibit M# 7 Exhibit Exhibit N# 8 Exhibit Exhibit O# 9 Exhibit Exhibit P)(Smith, Eleanor) (Entered: 01/26/2005)
2005-01-289MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response and to Set Briefing Schedule for Dispositive Motions by DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Henault, John) (Entered: 01/28/2005)
2005-01-2810Memorandum in opposition to motion re 9 for extension of time to file response and to set briefing schedule for dispositive motion filed by KNIGHT RIDDER. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Smith, Eleanor) Modified on 1/31/2005 (rje, ). (Entered: 01/28/2005)
2005-01-3111REPLY to opposition to motion re 9 Extension of Time and to Set Briefing Schedule filed by DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Exhibit)(Henault, John) (Entered: 01/31/2005)
2005-02-0112ORDER granting in part and denying in part 9 Defendant's Motion for an Extension and to Set a Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 2/1/05. (CS, ) (Entered: 02/01/2005)
2005-02-01ORDER denying 5 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel; no discovery shall take place in this action absent a subsequent order to the contrary by the Court . Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 2/1/05. (CS, ) (Entered: 02/01/2005)
2005-02-2213ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS.(Henault, John) (Entered: 02/22/2005)
2005-02-2314Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motion and to Set Briefing Schedule by DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Henault, John) (Entered: 02/23/2005)
2005-02-24MINUTE ORDER granting 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motion and to Set Briefing Schedule. The time for Defendant to file its dispositive motion is hereby enlarged to on or before March 15, 2005. Plaintiffs shall then file their opposition on or before April 7, 2005 and Defendant shall its reply on or before April 18, 2005. . Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 2/24/05. (CS, ) (Entered: 02/24/2005)
2005-03-0315Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Summary Judgment and to Set Briefing Schedule by DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Henault, John) (Entered: 03/03/2005)
2005-03-04MINUTE ORDER granting 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Summary Judgment and to Set Briefing Schedule. The time for Defendant to file its dispositive motion is hereby enlarged to on or before April 11, 2005. Plaintiffs shall then file their opposition on or before May 2, 2005 and Defendant shall file its reply on or before May 16, 2005. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 3/3/05. (CS, ) (Entered: 03/04/2005)
2005-03-04Set/Reset Deadlines: Dispositive Motions due by 4/11/2005. Response to Dispositive Motions due by 5/2/2005. Reply to Dispositive Motions due by 5/16/2005. (tth, ) (Entered: 03/09/2005)
2005-04-1116MOTION for Summary Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit Exhibit 7# 8 Exhibit Exhibit 8# 9 Exhibit Exhibit 9# 10 Exhibit Exhibit 10# 11 Text of Proposed Order)(Henault, John) (Entered: 04/11/2005)
2005-05-0217Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 16 MOTION for Summary Judgment by KNIGHT RIDDER. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Eleanor) (Entered: 05/02/2005)
2005-05-03MINUTE ORDER granting 17 Plaintiffs' Consent Motion for Extension of Time; Plaintiffs shall have up to and including May 9, 2005 to file their Response to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment . Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 5/3/05. (CS, ) (Entered: 05/03/2005)
2005-05-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 5/9/2005. (CS, ) (Entered: 05/03/2005)
2005-05-0918MOTION for Leave to File Amended and Supplemental Complaint by KNIGHT RIDDER. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order# 2 Exhibit Amended and Supplemental Complaint)(Smith, Eleanor) (Entered: 05/09/2005)
2005-05-0919MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by KNIGHT RIDDER. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Eleanor) (Entered: 05/09/2005)
2005-05-0920Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by KNIGHT RIDDER. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Statement of Facts Not in Genuine Dispute)(Smith, Eleanor) (Entered: 05/09/2005)
2005-05-0921Memorandum in opposition to motion re 16 Summary Judgment filed by KNIGHT RIDDER. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts Response to Defendant's# 2 Affidavit Second Declaration of Alison Young# 3 Affidavit Declaration of Chris Adams# 4 Affidavit Declaration of Alison Young# 5 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Exhibit List# 6 Exhibit Notice of Filing Plaintiffs' Exhibits on CD)(Smith, Eleanor) (Entered: 05/09/2005)
2005-05-0922ENTERED IN ERROR.....REPLY in support of motion 20 for summary judgment; (SEE DOCUMENT NO. 21 FOR IMAGE OF THE PLEADING) filed by KNIGHT RIDDER. (rje, ) Modified on 5/10/2005 (rje, ). (Entered: 05/10/2005)
2005-05-0923MEMORANDUM in support of re 20 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by KNIGHT RIDDER (rje, ) (Entered: 05/10/2005)
2005-05-10MINUTE ORDER granting 19 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 5/10/05. (CS, ) (Entered: 05/10/2005)
2005-05-10NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. 22 was entered in error and counsel is notified not to refile as the court will correct the error and refile pleading as a Memorandum.(rje, ) (Entered: 05/10/2005)
2005-05-1624REPLY to opposition to motion re 16 Summary Judgment filed by DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS. (Henault, John) (Entered: 05/16/2005)
2005-05-1625Memorandum in opposition to motion re 20 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment filed by DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Henault, John) (Entered: 05/16/2005)
2005-05-1926Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 25 Memorandum in Opposition to Cross Motion for Summary Judgment by KNIGHT RIDDER. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for an Extension of Time to Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Their Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment, to Stay Proceedings on Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, and for Expedited Consideration of Pl# 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed order)(Smith, Eleanor) (Entered: 05/19/2005)
2005-05-2027Consent MOTION to Withdraw 26 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 25 Memorandum in Opposition to Cross Motion for Summary Judgment (Withdrawal of Memorandum of Points and Authorities only) by KNIGHT RIDDER. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Smith, Eleanor) (Entered: 05/20/2005)
2005-05-25MINUTE ORDER granting 27 the Consent Motion to Withdraw supporting memorandum filed in support of a consent motion for extension of time 26 . Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 5/24/05. (CS, ) (Entered: 05/25/2005)
2005-05-25MINUTE ORDER granting 26 Consent Motion for Extension of Time; Defendnat shall up to and including June 6, 2006 to file an opposition to Plaintiffs' Motoin for Leave to File an Amended and Supplemental Complaint; Plaintiffs shall have up to and including June 14, 2005 to file a reply to Defendants' Opposition . Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 5/24/05. (CS, ) (Entered: 05/25/2005)
2005-05-25Set/Reset Deadlines: Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File an Amended and Supplemental Complaint due by 6/6/2005 Reply to Opposition due by 6/14/2005. (CS, ) (Entered: 05/25/2005)
2005-06-0328MEMORANDUM re 26 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 25 Memorandum in Opposition to Cross Motion for Summary Judgment filed by KNIGHT RIDDER, by KNIGHT RIDDER. (Smith, Eleanor) (Entered: 06/03/2005)
2005-06-0629Memorandum in opposition to motion re 18 Leave to File Amended and Supplemental Complaint filed by DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Henault, John) (Entered: 06/06/2005)
2005-06-0730ORDER that Plaintiffs' Motion for an Extension of Time to Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Their Cross-Claim for Summary Judgment is granted; Plaintiffs' Motion to Stay Proceedings on Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment is granted; the Motion for Expedited Consideration of Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File an Amended and Supplemental Complaint is denied, although the Court will make every effort to promptly dispose of the Motion . Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 6/7/05. (CS, ) (Entered: 06/07/2005)
2005-06-1431REPLY to opposition to motion re 18 for Leave to File Amended and Supplemental Complaint filed by KNIGHT RIDDER. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Third Declaration of Alison Young# 2 Exhibit 109# 3 Exhibit 110# 4 Exhibit 111# 5 Exhibit 112)(Smith, Eleanor) (Entered: 06/14/2005)
2005-07-0732NOTICE of Change of Address by Eleanor Huske Smith (Smith, Eleanor) (Entered: 07/07/2005)
2005-07-1433ORDER finding as moot 16 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, granting 18 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File an Amended and Supplemental Complaint, and denying 20 Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment . Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 7/14/05. (CS, ) (Entered: 07/14/2005)
2005-07-1434MEMORANDUM OPINION on Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, Plaintiffs' Motoin for Leave to File an Amended and Supplemental Complaint and Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 7/14/05. (CS, ) (Entered: 07/14/2005)
2005-07-1436AMENDED and SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRSfiled by KNIGHT RIDDER.(rje, ) (Entered: 07/29/2005)
2005-07-2635MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Amended Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Henault, John) (Entered: 07/26/2005)
2005-07-26MINUTE ORDER granting 35 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time; Defendant shall have up to and including August 15, 2005 in which to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 7/26/05. (CS, ) (Entered: 07/26/2005)
2005-07-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer to Amended Complaint due by 8/15/2005. (CS, ) (Entered: 07/26/2005)
2005-08-1537Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 36 Amended Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nebeker, William) (Entered: 08/15/2005)
2005-08-18MINUTE ORDER granting 37 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time; Defendant shall have up to and including August 29, 2005 in which to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint . Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 8/18/05. (CS, ) (Entered: 08/18/2005)
2005-08-18Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 8/29/2005. (CS, ) (Entered: 08/18/2005)
2005-08-2938ANSWER to Amended Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS.(Henault, John) (Entered: 08/29/2005)
2005-12-2239NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by KNIGHT RIDDER (Smith, Eleanor) (Entered: 12/22/2005)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff