Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCENTER FOR PUBLIC INTEGRITY v. FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2004cv02112
Date Filed2004-12-06
Date Closed2007-07-17
JudgeJudge Emmet G. Sullivan
PlaintiffCENTER FOR PUBLIC INTEGRITY
DefendantFEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2004-12-061COMPLAINT against FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION (Filing fee $ 150) filed by CENTER FOR PUBLIC INTEGRITY.(lc, ) (Entered: 12/17/2004)
2004-12-062LCvR 7.1 - CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CENTER FOR PUBLIC INTEGRITY (lc, ) (Entered: 12/17/2004)
2004-12-06SUMMONS Issued as to FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (lc, ) (Entered: 12/17/2004)
2004-12-173SUMMONS Returned Executed by CENTER FOR PUBLIC INTEGRITY. FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION served on 12/7/2004, answer due 1/6/2005. (Smith, Peter) (Entered: 12/17/2004)
2005-01-064MOTION to Dismiss by FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Exhibit Declaration of David R. Dickey)(Johnson, Madelyn) (Entered: 01/06/2005)
2005-01-195Memorandum in opposition to motion re 4 to dismiss Complaint filed by CENTER FOR PUBLIC INTEGRITY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Exhibit 1)(Smith, Peter) (Entered: 01/19/2005)
2005-01-286ANSWER to Complaint by FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION.(Johnson, Madelyn) (Entered: 01/28/2005)
2005-01-287NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION re 4 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Exhibit 1# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Madelyn) (Entered: 01/28/2005)
2005-01-288Consent MOTION for Order Setting Briefing Schedule by FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Exhibit 1# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Madelyn) (Entered: 01/28/2005)
2005-01-31MINUTE ORDER granting 8 Motion for Entry of Briefing Schedule. Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and supporting Vaughn index due by 4/5/05; plaintiff's Opposition due by 5/5/05; defendant's reply by 5/19/05. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on January 31, 2005. (lcegs2) (Entered: 01/31/2005)
2005-01-31Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Summary Judgment motions due by 4/5/2005. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 5/5/2005. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 5/19/2005. (clv, ) (Entered: 02/01/2005)
2005-04-059MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment by FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Madelyn) (Entered: 04/05/2005)
2005-04-06MINUTE ORDER granting 9 Defendant's Motion for one-day Extension of Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on April 6, 2005. (lcegs2) (Entered: 04/06/2005)
2005-04-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motions due by 4/6/2005. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 5/6/2005. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 5/20/2005. (lcegs2) (Entered: 04/06/2005)
2005-04-0610MOTION for Summary Judgment by FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Exhibit Declaration of J. McLane Layton with exhibits# 3 Statement of Material Facts Not In Genuine Dispute)(Johnson, Madelyn) (Entered: 04/06/2005)
2005-05-0511Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 10 MOTION for Summary Judgment by CENTER FOR PUBLIC INTEGRITY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Peter) (Entered: 05/05/2005)
2005-05-06MINUTE ORDER granting 11 Consent Motion for Extend Briefing Schedule. Plaintiff's opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and any cross-motion shall be due by no later than May 13, 2005. Defendant's reply and opposition due by June 10, 2005. Plaintiff's reply due by June 24, 2005. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on May 6, 2005. (lcegs2) (Entered: 05/06/2005)
2005-05-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Opposition and Cross Summary Judgment motions due by 5/13/2003. defendant's reply and Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 6/10/2005. Plaintiff's Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 6/24/2005. (clv, ) (Entered: 05/10/2005)
2005-05-1312Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by CENTER FOR PUBLIC INTEGRITY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Peter) (Entered: 05/13/2005)
2005-05-1313Memorandum in opposition to motion re 10 summary judgment filed by CENTER FOR PUBLIC INTEGRITY. (Smith, Peter) (Entered: 05/13/2005)
2005-06-1014Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to file consolidated reply in support of defendant's motion for summary judgment and opposition to plaintiff's cross-motion by FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Madelyn) (Entered: 06/10/2005)
2005-06-13MINUTE ORDER granting 14 Defendant's Consent Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's consolidated reply and opposition is due by June 13, 2005. Plaintiff's reply in support of its cross-motion for summary judgment is due by June 27, 2005. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on June 13, 2005. (lcegs2) (Entered: 06/13/2005)
2005-06-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's reply and Responses to cross-motion for summary judgment due by 6/13/2005; Plaintiff's Replies due by 6/27/2005. (clv, ) (Entered: 06/13/2005)
2005-06-1315REPLY to opposition to motion re 10 summary judgment filed by FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION. (Johnson, Madelyn) (Entered: 06/13/2005)
2005-06-1316Memorandum in opposition to motion re 12 Plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment filed by FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Decl. of Robert J. Cupina# 2 Exhibit Exhibit J to Cupina Decl.# 3 Statement of Facts Response to Plaintiff's Statement of Material Fact# 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Madelyn) (Entered: 06/13/2005)
2005-06-2717REPLY to opposition to motion re 12 summary judgment filed by CENTER FOR PUBLIC INTEGRITY. (Smith, Peter) (Entered: 06/27/2005)
2006-03-14MINUTE ORDER. Defendant is hereby ORDERED to deliver to the Court by no later than 5:00 PM on March 17, 2006, all email messages and other documents that are currently being withheld by defendant pursuant to FOIA Exemption 5 and 7(F) for in camera review by the Court. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on March 14, 2006. (lcegs2) (Entered: 03/14/2006)
2006-03-1718NOTICE Of Submission of Documents for In Camera Inspection by FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION (Johnson, Madelyn) (Entered: 03/17/2006)
2006-09-2719MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying without prejudice 10 defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, and granting in part and denying in part without prejudice 12 plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on September 27, 2006. (lcegs2) (Entered: 09/27/2006)
2006-10-1220Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to 19 Court's Order dated September 27, 2006 by FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Madelyn) Modified on 10/13/2006 (zlc, ). (Entered: 10/12/2006)
2006-10-13ORDER granting 20 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to respond to the Court's September 27, 2006 Memorandum Opinion and Order. Defendant has until November 6, 2006 to respond. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on October 13, 2006. (lcegs2) (Entered: 10/13/2006)
2006-10-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 11/6/2006 (clv, ) (Entered: 10/17/2006)
2006-11-0621NOTICE of Submission of Redacted Documents Pursuant to the Court's Order of September 27, 2006 by FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION (Johnson, Madelyn) (Entered: 11/06/2006)
2006-11-0622MOTION for Extension of Time to SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD REGARDING FOIA EXEMPTION (b)(7)(F) by FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Madelyn) (Entered: 11/06/2006)
2006-11-0723RESPONSE to Defendant's Motion for Enlargement of Time filed by CENTER FOR PUBLIC INTEGRITY. (Smith, Peter) (Entered: 11/07/2006)
2006-11-08MINUTE ORDER granting 22 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to supplement the record regarding FOIA Exemption 7(F). Defendant shall supplement the record with information regarding the documents withheld pursuant to Exemption 7(F) by no later than November 13, 2006. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on November 8, 2006. (lcegs2) (Entered: 11/08/2006)
2006-11-08Set/Reset Deadlines: Supplemental Memorandum due by 11/13/2006. (clv, ) (Entered: 11/08/2006)
2006-11-1324NOTICE OF FILING OF SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT?S ASSERTION OF FOIA EXEMPTION (b)(7)(F) by FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Johnson, Madelyn) (Entered: 11/13/2006)
2007-06-07MINUTE ORDER. The parties are directed to file a joint report by June 20, 2007 advising the Court of what matters remain in dispute, if any, and recommending further proceedings. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on June 7, 2007. (lcegs2) (Entered: 06/07/2007)
2007-06-07Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 6/20/2007. (clv, ) (Entered: 06/07/2007)
2007-06-1525MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report by FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION (Johnson, Madelyn) (Entered: 06/15/2007)
2007-06-18MINUTE ORDER granting 25 Defendant's Motion for Enlargement of Time to file joint status report. The parties' joint status report advising the Court what matters remain in dispute, if any, and recommending further proceedings is due no later than July 16, 2007. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on June 18, 2007. (lcegs2) (Entered: 06/18/2007)
2007-06-18Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 7/16/2007. (clv, ) (Entered: 06/18/2007)
2007-07-1626STIPULATION of Dismissal of remaining claims by CENTER FOR PUBLIC INTEGRITY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order setting schedule on fees motion)(Smith, Peter) (Entered: 07/16/2007)
2007-07-1727ORDER DISMISSING CASE and setting briefing schedule for motion for attorneys' fees and costs. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on July 17, 2007. (lcegs2) (Entered: 07/17/2007)
2007-07-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 8/21/2007.,Responses due by 9/21/2007,Replies due by 10/5/2007. (clv, ) (Entered: 07/17/2007)
2007-08-2228MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs by CENTER FOR PUBLIC INTEGRITY (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Peter Newbatt Smith# 2 Exhibit Time Record# 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Peter) (Entered: 08/22/2007)
2007-09-2129Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 28 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs by FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION (Johnson, Madelyn) (Entered: 09/21/2007)
2007-09-24MINUTE ORDER granting 29 Defendant's Consent Motion for Enlargment of Time to File response re 28 Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs. Defendant's response is due by no later than October 5, 2007. Plaintiff's reply, if any is due by no later than October 19, 2007. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on September 24, 2007. (lcegs2) (Entered: 09/24/2007)
2007-09-25Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 10/5/2007,Replies due by 10/19/2007. (clv, ) (Entered: 09/25/2007)
2007-10-0530Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Fee Petition by FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION (Johnson, Madelyn) (Entered: 10/05/2007)
2007-10-09MINUTE ORDER granting 30 Defendant's Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Fee Petition. Defendant shall file its response by no later than October 9, 2007. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on October 9, 2007.(lcegs2) (Entered: 10/09/2007)
2007-10-0931STIPULATION of Settlement and Dismissal by FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION. (Johnson, Madelyn) (Entered: 10/09/2007)
2007-10-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 10/9/2007 (clv, ) (Entered: 10/10/2007)
2007-11-2832STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT AND DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 11/27/07. (clv, ) (Entered: 11/28/2007)
2007-12-17MINUTE ORDER withdrawing 28 Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs, pursuant to the Stipulation of Settlement and Dismissal approved by the Court on November 29, 2007. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on December 17, 2007.(AS) (Entered: 12/17/2007)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff