Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLONG et al v. INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2005cv00756
Date Filed2005-04-14
Date Closed2006-09-12
JudgeJudge Henry H. Kennedy
PlaintiffSUSAN B. LONG
PlaintiffDAVID BURNHAM
DefendantINTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2005-04-141COMPLAINT against INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE (Filing fee $ 250) filed by SUSAN B. LONG, DAVID BURNHAM.(lc, ) (Entered: 04/15/2005)
2005-04-14SUMMONS (3) Issued as to INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (lc, ) (Entered: 04/15/2005)
2005-05-262ANSWER to Complaint by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE.(Role, Gerald) (Entered: 05/26/2005)
2005-09-013Order for Initial Scheduling Conference. Initial conference scheduled for December 12, 2005, at 2:00 p.m., before Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr., Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr., on September 1, 2005. (FL, ) (Entered: 09/01/2005)
2005-12-084MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Role, Gerald) (Entered: 12/08/2005)
2005-12-09MINUTE ORDER: The initial scheduling conference scheduled for December 12, 2005, at 2:00 P.M. is hereby CANCELLED. It is further ordered that the parties shall be governed by the deadlines they propose and set forth in their meet and confer statement docketed December 8, 2005.(Kennedy, Henry) (Entered: 12/09/2005)
2005-12-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Summary Judgment motions due by 1/27/2006. Plaintiff's Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 2/27/2006. Defendant's Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 3/24/2006. Plaintiff's Reply due by 4/24/2006. (rew, ) (Entered: 12/13/2005)
2006-01-195MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Role, Gerald) (Entered: 01/19/2006)
2006-01-20Minute order granting 5 defendant's motion for extension of time in which to file motion for summary judgment. Defendant shall have up to and including March 2, 2006, within which to file a motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr., on January 20, 2006. Official paperless order (FL, ) (Entered: 01/20/2006)
2006-01-20Modified Deadlines re 5 : Dispositive motions shall be filed on the following schedule: March 10, 2006 - Defendant's motion for summary judgment. April 10, 2006 - Plaintiffs' cross-motion for summary judgment and response to defendant's motion for summary judgment. May 8, 2006 - Defendant's reply in support of its motion for summary judgment and opposition to plaintiffs' cross-motion for summary judgment. June 5, 2006 -Plaintiffs' reply in support of their cross motion for summary judgment. (FL, ) Modified on 1/20/2006 (FL, ). (Entered: 01/20/2006)
2006-01-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Summary Judgment motions due by 3/2/2006. (rew, ) (Entered: 01/20/2006)
2006-01-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Summary Judgment motions due by 3/10/2006. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 5/8/2006. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 6/5/2006. (rew, ) (Entered: 01/20/2006)
2006-03-026Second MOTION for Extension of Time to file Motion for Summary Judgment by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Role, Gerald) (Entered: 03/02/2006)
2006-03-03Minute order granting 6 defendant's second motion for extension of time in which to file motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr., on March 3, 2006. Official paperless order (FL, ) (Entered: 03/03/2006)
2006-03-03Schedule for filing dispositve motions re 6 : April 10, 2006, defendant's motion for summary judgment; May 10, 2006 plaintiffs' cross-motion for summary judgment, and response to defendant's motion for summary judgment; June 8, 2006, defendant's reply in support of its motion for summary judgment,and opposition to plaintiffs' cross-motion for summary judgment; and July 5, 2006, plaintiffs' reply in support of their cross motion for summary judgment. (FL, ) Modified on 3/3/2006 (FL, ). Modified on 3/3/2006 (FL, ). (Entered: 03/03/2006)
2006-03-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Summary Judgment motions due by 5/10/2006. Plaintiff's Response and cross Motion for Summary Judgment due by 6/8/2006. Defendant's Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 7/5/2006. (rew, ) (Entered: 03/06/2006)
2006-05-267Third MOTION for Extension of Time to file motion for summary judgment by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Role, Gerald) (Entered: 05/26/2006)
2006-05-30Minute order granting 7 defendant's third motion for extension of time in which to file motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr., on May 30, 2006. Official paperless order (FL, ) (Entered: 05/30/2006)
2006-05-30Schedule for dispositive motions re 7 : July 28, 2006, defendant's motion for summary judgment. August 28, 2006, plaintiffs' cross-motion for summary judgment and response to defendant's motion for summary judgment. September 18, 2006, defendant's reply in support of its motion for summary judgment and opposition to plaintiffs' cross-motion for summary judgment. October 10, 2006, plaintiffs' reply in support of their cross motion for summary judgment. (FL, ) Modified on 5/31/2006 (lc, ). (Entered: 05/30/2006)
2006-05-30Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Summary Judgment motions due by 7/28/2006. Plaintiff's Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 8/28/2006. Defendant's Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 9/18/2006.Plaintiff's Reply due by 10/10/2006. (rew, ) (Entered: 05/30/2006)
2006-07-318MOTION for Extension of Time to file motion for summary judgment by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Role, Gerald) (Entered: 07/31/2006)
2006-07-31MINUTE ORDER granting 8 Motion to modify scheduling order. THe court adopts, and the parties shall be bound by, the deadlines set forth in the proposed order that accompanies the motion. (Kennedy, Henry) (Entered: 07/31/2006)
2006-07-31Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motions due by 9/6/2006. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 10/6/2006. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 10/27/2006. (clv, ) (Entered: 08/01/2006)
2006-09-059Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to file motion for summary judgment by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Role, Gerald) (Entered: 09/05/2006)
2006-09-05Minute order granting 9 defendant's fifth motion for extension of time in which to file motion for summary judgment. Defendant's motion for summary judgment shall be filed on or before September 13, 2006. The court makes no other modification to the briefing schedule adopted by order entered July 31, 2006. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr., on September 5, 2006. Official paperless order (FL, ) (Entered: 09/05/2006)
2006-09-07Reset Deadlines: Defendant's motion for summary judgment shall be filed on or before 9/13/2006. (tj ) (Entered: 09/07/2006)
2006-09-1110STIPULATION of Dismissal by SUSAN B. LONG, DAVID BURNHAM, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Nelson, Scott) (Entered: 09/11/2006)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff