Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleDetroit Free Press, Incorporated v. United States Department of Justice
DistrictEastern District of Michigan
CityDetroit
Case Number2:2005cv71601
Date Filed2005-04-25
Date Closed2005-10-07
JudgeDistrict Judge Anna Diggs Taylor
PlaintiffDetroit Free Press, Incorporated
DefendantUnited States Department of Justice
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2005-04-251COMPLAINT filed by Detroit Free Press, Incorporated against United States Department of Justice, Receipt No. 200524767.(NHoll, ) (Entered: 04/25/2005)
2005-04-272SUMMONS Returned Executed to U.S. Attorney, on behalf of United States Department of Justice served on 4/25/2005, answer due 6/24/2005 (Wassom, Brian) (Entered: 04/27/2005)
2005-05-023SUMMONS Returned Executed. U.S. Dept. of Justice served on 04/27/2005 (Wassom, Brian) (Entered: 05/02/2005)
2005-05-024(ERROR: summons served on U.S. Attorney General) SUMMONS Returned Executed to U.S. Attorney, on behalf of United States Department of Justice served on 4/27/2005, answer due 6/27/2005 (Wassom, Brian) Modified on 5/3/2005 (DPer, ). (Entered: 05/02/2005)
2005-05-255NOTICE of Appearance by Susan K. DeClercq on behalf of United States Department of Justice. (DeClercq, Susan) (Entered: 05/25/2005)
2005-05-256MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by United States Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits # 2 Exhibit A - Cunningham Declaration# 3 Exhibit B - Carbe v. ATF# 4 Exhibit C - Stewart v. Johnson# 5 Exhibit D - Thomas v. IRS)(DeClercq, Susan) (Entered: 05/25/2005)
2005-06-017RESPONSE to 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Detroit Free Press, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 # 2 # 3 )(Fink, Herschel) (Entered: 06/01/2005)
2005-06-068NOTICE of hearing on 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Motion Hearing set for 6/15/2005 02:00 PM before Honorable Nancy G Edmunds. (CHem, ) (Entered: 06/06/2005)
2005-06-109REPLY to Response re 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by United States Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Kristobans Declaration)(DeClercq, Susan) (Entered: 06/10/2005)
2005-06-1510AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Detroit Free Press, Incorporated against United States Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits # 2 Exhibit # 3 Exhibit # 4 Exhibit # 5 Exhibit)(Fink, Herschel) (Entered: 06/15/2005)
2005-06-15Minute Entry -Motion Hearing held on 6/15/2005 re 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by United States Department of Justice, before Honorable Nancy G Edmunds. (Court Reporter Suzanne Jacuqes) (CHem, ) (Entered: 06/17/2005)
2005-06-1611ORDER denying 6 Motion to Dismiss- Signed by Honorable Nancy G Edmunds. (CHem, ) (Entered: 06/16/2005)
2005-06-2712ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from Judge Nancy G Edmunds, Magistrate Judge Paul J Komives to Judge Anna Diggs Taylor and Magistrate Judge Steven D Pepe (ATee, ) (Entered: 06/28/2005)
2005-06-2913ANSWER to Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by United States Department of Justice.(DeClercq, Susan) (Entered: 06/29/2005)
2005-07-0714MOTION for Summary Judgment by Detroit Free Press, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits # 2 Exhibit 1 Order# 3 Exhibit 2 Sixth Circuit Opinion# 4 Exhibit 3 US FOIA Guide# 5 Exhibit 4 US Dept of Justice Response to FOIA request# 6 Exhibit 5 Detroit Free Press Article# 7 Exhibit 6 NY Times Article March 28 2005# 8 Exhibit 7 NY Times Article March 16 2005)(Fink, Herschel) (Entered: 07/07/2005)
2005-07-2117NOTICE of hearing on 14 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 8/2/2005. Replies due by 8/9/2005. Motion Hearing set for 9/19/2005 09:00 AM before Honorable Anna Diggs Taylor. (CCoh, ) (Entered: 08/05/2005)
2005-08-0215Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Brief in Support Thereof and in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff by United States Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits # 2 Exhibit 1- Auerbach Declaration# 3 Exhibit 2 - Cunningham Declaration)(DeClercq, Susan) (Entered: 08/02/2005)
2005-08-0316CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States Department of Justice re 15 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Brief in Support Thereof and in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff . (DeClercq, Susan) (Entered: 08/03/2005)
2005-08-2218NOTICE of hearing on 15 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Brief in Support Thereof and in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff . Responses due by 9/2/2005. Replies due by 9/9/2005. Motion Hearing set for 9/19/2005 09:00 AM before Honorable Anna Diggs Taylor. (ATee, ) (Entered: 08/23/2005)
2005-09-0119RESPONSE to 15 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Brief in Support Thereof and in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff filed by Detroit Free Press, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits # 2 Exhibit Ex 8: 1997 Policy# 3 Exhibit Ex 9: Aug. 10, 2005 Memo# 4 Exhibit Ex. 10: 1988 Testimony)(Fink, Herschel) (Entered: 09/01/2005)
2005-09-0220SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE to 15 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Brief in Support Thereof and in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Supplemental Response filed by Detroit Free Press, Incorporated. (Fink, Herschel) Modified on 9/6/2005 (DPer, ). (Entered: 09/02/2005)
2005-09-0921REPLY to Response re 15 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Brief in Support Thereof and in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff filed by United States Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A -- 8.10.2005 USMS Memorandum)(Bhattacharyya, Rupa) (Entered: 09/09/2005)
2005-09-19Minute Entry -Motion Hearing held on 9/19/2005 re 14 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Detroit Free Press, Incorporated, 15 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Brief in Support Thereof and in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff filed by United States Department of Justice, before Honorable Anna Diggs Taylor. Disposition: DENIED and GRANTED, RESPECTIVELY. Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees GRANTED.(Court Reporter Carol Sapala) (JCurr, ) (Entered: 09/20/2005)
2005-10-0722JUDGMENT. Signed by Honorable Anna Diggs Taylor. (DPer, ) (Entered: 10/12/2005)
2005-11-0423[FILING ERROR: exhibits not labeled in accordance with Rule 18 of Electronic Filing Policies and Procedures]PETITION for Attorney Fees by Detroit Free Press, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits # 2 Exhibit Dowd Opinion# 3 Exhibit Ex B# 4 Exhibit Ex C# 5 Exhibit Ex D# 6 Exhibit Ex E# 7 Exhibit Ex F# 8 Exhibit Ex G# 9 Exhibit Ex H# 10 Exhibit Ex I)(Fink, Herschel) Modified on 11/7/2005 (DPer, ). (Entered: 11/04/2005)
2005-11-0724DECLARATION by Herschel P. Fink re 23 Petition for Attorney Fees, Replacing Exhibit G of said Petition, filed by Detroit Free Press, Incorporated.(Wassom, Brian) (Entered: 11/07/2005)
2005-11-2225[FILING ERROR: RULE 11 PROPOSED ORDER, RULE 9 SIGNATURE BLOCK AND LR5.1 SPACING FORMAT] MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 23 Petition for Attorney Fees, (Unopposed) by United States Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Bhattacharyya, Rupa) Modified on 11/23/2005 (BSoc, ). (Entered: 11/22/2005)
2005-12-0126ORDER Granting 25 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to 23 Petition for Attorney Fees. Response due by 12/16/2005- Signed by Honorable Anna Diggs Taylor. (JCurr, ) (Entered: 12/01/2005)
2005-12-2027LETTER from Herschel P. Fink. (DPer, ) (Entered: 12/21/2005)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff