Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleTAX ANALYSTS v. INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2005cv00934
Date Filed2005-05-01
Date Closed2006-02-27
JudgeJudge Ellen S. Huvelle
PlaintiffTAX ANALYSTS
DefendantINTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Opinion/Order [16]
Opinion/Order [24]
Opinion/Order [25]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2005-05-101COMPLAINT against INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE (Filing fee $ 250) filed by TAX ANALYSTS.(jf, ) (Entered: 05/11/2005)
2005-05-10SUMMONS (3) Issued as to INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jf, ) (Entered: 05/11/2005)
2005-05-102LCvR 7.1 - CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by TAX ANALYSTS (jf, ) (Entered: 05/11/2005)
2005-06-013SUMMONS Returned Executed by TAX ANALYSTS. INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE served on 5/16/2005, answer due 6/15/2005. (Hitchcock, Cornish) (Entered: 06/01/2005)
2005-06-134ANSWER to Complaint by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE.(Martineau, Michael) (Entered: 06/13/2005)
2005-06-135ORDER that defendant shall file a motion to dismiss or for summary judgment on or before July 13, 2005. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 6/13/05. (BL) (Entered: 06/13/2005)
2005-06-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Motion to dimiss due by 7/13/2005. Summary Judgment motions due by 7/13/2005. (gdf) (Entered: 06/27/2005)
2005-07-126Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct 5 Order, Set/Reset Deadlines by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Martineau, Michael) (Entered: 07/12/2005)
2005-07-13Minute ORDER granting 6 Motion to Amend/Correct 6/13/05 Order. Dispositive motion and report due 8/29/05. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 7/13/05. (BL) (Entered: 07/13/2005)
2005-07-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Dispositive Motions due by 8/29/2005. (gdf) (Entered: 07/20/2005)
2005-08-297STATUS REPORT by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Martineau, Michael) (Entered: 08/29/2005)
2005-08-29Minute ORDER approving briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 8/29/05. (BL) (Entered: 08/29/2005)
2005-11-098Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment and Response by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Martineau, Michael) (Entered: 11/09/2005)
2005-11-09Minute ORDER granting 8 Motion for Extension of Time to file dispositive motion. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 11/9/05. (BL) (Entered: 11/09/2005)
2005-11-229MOTION for Summary Judgment by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Butler Declaration - Part 1# 2 Affidavit Butler Declaration - Part 2# 3 Affidavit Butler Declaration - Part 3# 4 Affidavit Butler Declaration - Part 4# 5 Affidavit Butler Declaration - Part 5# 6 Affidavit Butler Declaration - Part 6# 7 Affidavit Drain Declaration# 8 Memorandum of Law# 9 Statement of Facts # 10 Text of Proposed Order)(Martineau, Michael) (Entered: 11/22/2005)
2005-11-2210MOTION for Summary Judgment by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Butler Declaration - Part 1# 2 Affidavit Butler Declaration - Part 2# 3 Affidavit Butler Declaration - Part 3# 4 Affidavit Butler Declaration - Part 4# 5 Affidavit Butler Declaration - Part 5# 6 Affidavit Butler Declaration - Part 6# 7 Affidavit Drain Declaration# 8 Memorandum Of Law# 9 Statement of Facts # 10 Text of Proposed Order)(Martineau, Michael) (Entered: 11/22/2005)
2005-12-0611MOTION for Vaughn Index by TAX ANALYSTS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hitchcock, Cornish) (Entered: 12/06/2005)
2005-12-0612NOTICE of Filing of Corrected Motion for a Vaughn Index by TAX ANALYSTS re 11 MOTION for Vaughn Index (Hitchcock, Cornish) (Entered: 12/06/2005)
2005-12-1913Memorandum in opposition to re 11 Plaintiff's Motion For A Vaughn Index filed by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Martineau, Michael) (Entered: 12/19/2005)
2005-12-2314REPLY to opposition to motion re 11 Vaughn index filed by TAX ANALYSTS. (Hitchcock, Cornish) (Entered: 12/23/2005)
2006-01-0915**ENTERED IN ERROR**ORDER denying 11 Motion for Vaughn Index . Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 1/9/06. (BL) Modified on 1/9/2006 (BL, ). (Entered: 01/09/2006)
2006-01-0916MEMORANDUM AND OPINION 11 Motion for Vaughn Index . Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 1/9/06. (BL) (Entered: 01/09/2006)
2006-01-0917ORDER 11 Motion for Vaughn Index . Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 1/9/06. (BL) (Entered: 01/09/2006)
2006-01-2318Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment with supporting memorandum and statement of material facts by TAX ANALYSTS. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Cornish F. Hitchcock# 2 Exhibit in support of Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment# 3 Appendix # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Hitchcock, Cornish) (Entered: 01/23/2006)
2006-01-2319Memorandum in opposition to re 10 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by TAX ANALYSTS. (Please see Document No. 18 for scanned image). (nmw, ) (Entered: 01/24/2006)
2006-02-0620NOTICE of In Camera Submission of Documents by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE re 16 Memorandum & Opinion, 17 Order (Martineau, Michael) (Entered: 02/06/2006)
2006-02-0721ENTERED IN ERROR.....Memorandum in opposition to re 18 Tax Analysts' Motion For Summary Judgment filed by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts)(Martineau, Michael) Modified on 2/8/2006 (jf, ). (Entered: 02/07/2006)
2006-02-0722Memorandum in opposition to re 18 Plaintiff's Cross Motion for Summary Judgment (refiled to add memorandum of law) filed by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts)(Martineau, Michael) (Entered: 02/07/2006)
2006-02-08NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re 21 Memorandum in Opposition was entered in error as a duplicate to No. 22 (jf, ) (Entered: 02/08/2006)
2006-02-2123REPLY to opposition to motion re 18 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment with supporting memorandum and statement of material facts , 22 Memorandum in Opposition filed by TAX ANALYSTS. (Hitchcock, Cornish) (Entered: 02/21/2006)
2006-02-2724ORDER granting in part and denying in part 9 Motion for Summary Judgment, granting in part and denying in part 10 Motion for Summary Judgment, granting in part and denying in part 18 Motion for Summary Judgment . Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 2/27/06. (BL) (Entered: 02/27/2006)
2006-02-2725MEMORANDUM AND OPINION re Motions for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 2/27/06. (BL) (Entered: 02/27/2006)
2006-03-0626STIPULATION re application for application for fees and costs by TAX ANALYSTS. (Hitchcock, Cornish) (Entered: 03/06/2006)
2006-03-06MINUTE ORDER approving 26 Stipulation filed by TAX ANALYSTS, . Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 3/6/06. (BL) (Entered: 03/06/2006)
2006-04-2727NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 24 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment entered on 2/27/06 by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. No fee/U.S. Government. (jf, ) (Entered: 05/01/2006)
2006-05-01Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re 27 Notice of Appeal (jf, ) (Entered: 05/01/2006)
2006-05-12USCA Case Number 06-5136 for 27 Notice of Appeal filed by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE,. (jf, ) (Entered: 05/15/2006)
2007-07-2428OPINION from USCA 27 Notice of Appeal filed by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (erd) (Entered: 07/26/2007)
2007-09-2032MANDATE of USCA (certified copy) as to 27 Notice of Appeal filed by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE that the judgment of the District Court appealed from in this cause is hereby affirmed. (Attachments: # 1 USCA Opinion dated 7/24/2007)(kb) (Entered: 10/26/2007)
2007-09-2629NOTICE of Change of Address by Cornish F. Hitchcock (Hitchcock, Cornish) (Entered: 09/26/2007)
2007-10-1130STIPULATION AND ORDER by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Martineau, Michael) (Entered: 10/11/2007)
2007-10-1231STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 10/11/07. (gdf) (Entered: 10/12/2007)
2007-12-2133STATUS REPORT OF THE PARTIES by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 October 22, 2007, letter)(Martineau, Michael) (Entered: 12/21/2007)
2008-03-2634STATUS REPORT OF THE PARTIES by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Martineau, Michael) (Entered: 03/26/2008)
2008-07-1435STIPULATION re 34 Status Report STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO FILE JOINT STATUS REPORT by TAX ANALYSTS, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Martineau, Michael) (Entered: 07/14/2008)
2008-07-1536ORDER approving re 35 Stipulation extending time filed by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, TAX ANALYSTS. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 7/14/08. (gdf) (Entered: 07/17/2008)
2008-07-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 8/29/2008 (gdf) (Entered: 07/17/2008)
2008-08-2937STATUS REPORT OF THE PARTIES by TAX ANALYSTS, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Martineau, Michael) (Entered: 08/29/2008)
2008-09-0338ORDER re 37 Status Report filed by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, TAX ANALYSTS. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 9/2/08. (gdf) (Entered: 09/04/2008)
2008-11-2039STIPULATION re 38 Order STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO FILE JOINT STATUS REPORT by TAX ANALYSTS, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Martineau, Michael) (Entered: 11/20/2008)
2008-11-2440ORDER approving 39 Stipulation filed by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, TAX ANALYSTS. Joint Status Report due by 12/15/2008. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 11/20/08. (gdf) (Entered: 11/24/2008)
2008-12-1541STATUS REPORT and Stipulation by TAX ANALYSTS, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Hitchcock, Cornish) (Entered: 12/15/2008)
2008-12-1642ORDER approving 41 Status Report filed by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, TAX ANALYSTS. Status Report due by 1/30/2009. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 12/15/08. (gdf) (Entered: 12/19/2008)
2009-01-2943STIPULATION re 42 Order, Set Deadlines STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO FILE JOINT STATUS REPORT by TAX ANALYSTS, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Martineau, Michael) (Entered: 01/29/2009)
2009-02-0244ORDER granting 43 Stipulation Extending Time to File Joint Status Report filed by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, TAX ANALYSTS. Joint Status Report due by 3/2/2009.Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 1/30/09. (gdf) (Entered: 02/03/2009)
2009-02-2745STIPULATION re 44 Order, Set Deadlines Stipulation Extending Time To File Joint Status Report by TAX ANALYSTS, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Martineau, Michael) (Entered: 02/27/2009)
2009-02-2746ORDER granting 45 Stipulation Extending Time to File Joint Status Report filed by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, TAX ANALYSTS. Joint Status Report due by 3/17/2009). Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 2/27/09. (rje) (Entered: 03/02/2009)
2009-03-1747STIPULATION re 46 Order, Set Deadlines Stipulation Extending Time To File Joint Status Report by TAX ANALYSTS, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Martineau, Michael) (Entered: 03/17/2009)
2009-03-18MINUTE ORDER approving 47 the parties' Stipulation Extending Time to File Joint Status Report. The date for filing the joint status report shall be extended up to and including March 20, 2009. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 3/18/2009. (VT) (Entered: 03/18/2009)
2009-03-18Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/20/2009. (gdf) (Entered: 03/18/2009)
2009-03-2048NOTICE of Proposed Order of final judgment, with exhibit, filed jointly by TAX ANALYSTS, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit cover sheet, # 2 Exhibit 1 -- PPT training materials)(Hitchcock, Cornish) (Entered: 03/20/2009)
2009-03-2649STIPULATED ORDER OF FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 3/25/09. (gdf) (Entered: 03/27/2009)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff