Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleReno Newspapers, Inc., et al. VS United States Department of Justice
DistrictDistrict of Nevada
CityReno
Case Number3:2005cv00263
Date Filed2005-05-04
Date Closed2006-08-18
JudgeJudge Brian E. Sandoval
PlaintiffMartha Bellisle
PlaintiffReno Newspapers, Inc.
DefendantUnited States Department Of Justice
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2005-05-041MISCELLANEOUS DOCUMENT Civil Cover Sheet (Entered: 05/05/2005)
2005-05-042COMPLAINT obo P (Entered: 05/05/2005)
2005-05-043SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Dept. of Justice (Entered: 05/05/2005)
2005-05-054CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Affidavit Srvd cpy of summns & Complnt by certif mail on 5/4/05 to Ds, USDC-Washington; Atty General-Washington; Executirve Offc of USA-USDJ-Washington DC: USA-Dan Bogden-Dist of Nevada obo Ps (m) (Entered: 05/06/2005)
2005-08-045MOTION FOR MISCELLANEOUS RELIEF Ps Req for entry of default obo Ps (m) (Entered: 08/05/2005)
2005-08-046CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Ps req for entry of default, obo P (Entered: 08/05/2005)
2005-08-048AFFIDAVIT of serv of Ps request for entry of default (#5) obo P (Entered: 08/17/2005)
2005-08-097ANSWER TO COMPLAINT to complnt (#2) obo D (m) (Entered: 08/12/2005)
2005-09-029SCHEDULING ORDER Did not req Discovery; Brfng on schdule of Mtns for S/J due by 10/7/05; Opp & X-Mtn for S/J due 11/7/05; Reply to X-Mtn due 11/28/05; D sh file reply in spt of its X-Mtn for S/J on or bef 12/16/05. PTO sh be due 30 days after decisn on M (Entered: 09/07/2005)
2005-10-0710MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT obo P (m) (Entered: 10/12/2005)
2005-11-0312DECLARATION of David Luczynski obo D (Entered: 11/04/2005)
2005-11-0411OPPOSITION to MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 10 and CROSS MOTION for S/J obo D (m) Modified on 7/18/2006 to add opposition to entry and link to motion (BLG). (Entered: 11/04/2005)
2005-11-2814RESPONSE/OPPOSITON to 11 Cross Motion for Summary Judgment, and reply in spt of 10 Motion for Summary Judgment; filed by Plaintiffs Martha Bellisle, Reno Newspapers, Inc.. Replies due by 12/12/2005. (WJ, ) (Entered: 12/12/2005)
2005-11-2913ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Brian E. Sandoval for all further proceedings. Judge Howard D. McKibben no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 11/29/5. (LG, ) (Entered: 11/29/2005)
2006-06-0115NOTICE of Change of Address by Scott A Glogovac. (Glogovac, Scott) (Entered: 06/01/2006)
2006-08-1816ORDER: ORD P's mtn for S/J 10 is denied. D's cross mtn for S/J 11 is granted. Signed by Judge Brian E. Sandoval on 8/16/06. (WJ, ) (Entered: 08/21/2006)
2006-08-2117JUDGMENT in favor of Defendant and against the Plaintiffs. Signed by Clerk Lance S Wilson. (WJ, ) (Entered: 08/21/2006)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff