Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWASHINGTON POST v. TRANSPORTATION SECURITY ADMINISTRATION et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2005cv01481
Date Filed2005-07-28
Date Closed2006-05-31
JudgeJudge Emmet G. Sullivan
PlaintiffWASHINGTON POST
DefendantTRANSPORTATION SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2005-07-281COMPLAINT against TRANSPORTATION SECURITY ADMINISTRATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Filing fee $ 250) filed by WASHINGTON POST. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H# 9 Exhibit I# 10 Exhibit J# 11 Exhibit K)(jf, ) (Entered: 08/01/2005)
2005-07-28SUMMONS (4) Issued as to TRANSPORTATION SECURITY ADMINISTRATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jf, ) (Entered: 08/01/2005)
2005-07-282LCvR 7.1 - CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by WASHINGTON POST (jf, ) (Entered: 08/01/2005)
2005-08-123RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General 08/01/2005. (Curley, Thomas) (Entered: 08/12/2005)
2005-08-124SUMMONS Returned Executed by WASHINGTON POST. TRANSPORTATION SECURITY ADMINISTRATION served on 7/29/2005, answer due 8/29/2005. (Curley, Thomas) (Entered: 08/12/2005)
2005-08-125SUMMONS Returned Executed by WASHINGTON POST. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 8/3/2005, answer due 9/2/2005. (Curley, Thomas) (Entered: 08/12/2005)
2005-08-186RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the US Attorney. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 8/1/2005, answer due 9/30/2005 (Curley, Thomas) (Entered: 08/18/2005)
2005-08-187NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Freeborne on behalf of all defendants (Freeborne, Paul) (Entered: 08/18/2005)
2005-08-188NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan E Siegel on behalf of WASHINGTON POST (Siegel, Nathan) (Entered: 08/18/2005)
2005-08-319Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint For Declaratory and Injunctive Relief by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Correspondence)(Freeborne, Paul) (Entered: 08/31/2005)
2005-09-0710ORDER Initial Conference set for 10/28/2005 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. Setting forth further instruction to counsel.. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 9/7/05. (clv, ) (Entered: 09/07/2005)
2005-10-2111MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting)(Curley, Thomas) (Entered: 10/21/2005)
2005-10-28Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan : Meet and Confer Hearing. Status Conference set for 5/4/2006 10:30 AM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. Counsel to submit scheduling order.(Court Reporter Elaine Merchant.) (clv, ) (Entered: 10/28/2005)
2005-11-0812ORDER adopting the parties' Joint Proposed Scheduling Order submitted on November 3, 2005. Discovery will close April 28, 2006. A Status Hearing will be held on May 4, 2006 at 10:30 a.m. Dispositive motions should be filed by May 30, 2006. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on November 8, 2005. (lcegs1) (Entered: 11/08/2005)
2005-11-2813STATUS REPORT Parties' Joint Status Report by WASHINGTON POST. (Curley, Thomas) (Entered: 11/28/2005)
2006-01-0614STATUS REPORT Parties' Second Joint Status Report by WASHINGTON POST. (Curley, Thomas) (Entered: 01/06/2006)
2006-05-03MINUTE ORDER. The Status Conference scheduled for May 4, 2006 is continued to June 20, 2006 at 11:00 a.m. The May 30 deadline to file dispostive motions is VACATED. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on May 3, 2006. (lcegs1) (Entered: 05/03/2006)
2006-05-04Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 6/20/2006 11:00 AM in Courtroom 24A before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (clv, ) (Entered: 05/04/2006)
2006-05-18Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference is now set for 7/18/2006 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24A before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. THE STATUS HEARING PREVIOUSLY SET FOR 6/20/06 IS CANCELLED. STATUS HEARING IS NOW SET FOR 7/18/06 (clv, ) (Entered: 05/18/2006)
2006-05-3015STIPULATION of Dismissal by the parties by WASHINGTON POST. (Curley, Thomas) (Entered: 05/30/2006)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff